Bennett v. Southern California Company

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Riverside, Case No. RIC400502
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 14, 2018 at 10:11 PM EST (6.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Jon Bennett Sr, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rutan & Tucker Llp
No Logo Judith Bennett, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rutan & Tucker Llp
No Logo Kimberli Summers, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rutan & Tucker Llp
v.
No Logo Southern California Edison Company, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Southern California Edison NUC +1 626 302 6931
Space Redd, Donald A +1 626 302 6945
Other Parties
No Logo Michael Summers, Minor/plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rutan & Tucker Llp
No Logo Robert Bennett, Minor/plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rutan & Tucker Llp
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (72) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 72 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Paper Records Destroyed/digitally Archived. Paper Documents/file Destroyed In Accordance With Administrative Policy/records Management A.10.400.1, Paper Records Retention And Destruction Schedule.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request For Dismissal With Prejudice Entire Action Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Receipt And Acknowledgment Of Order For The Deposit Of Money Into Blocked Account Filed By Jon Bennett Sr, Judith Bennett, Kimberli Summers, Michael Summers, Robert Bennett
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Receipt And Acknowledgment Of Order For The Deposit Of Money Into Blocked Account Filed By Jon Bennett Sr, Judith Bennett
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Order For Minor Compromise Is Gra And Filed; Honorable Judge E. Michael Kaiser.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Order For Deposit Money Is Gra And Filed; Honorable Judge E. Michael Kaiser.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Continued Status Conference By Jon Bennett Sr, Judith Bennett, Kimberli Summers, Michael Summers, Robert Bennett Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 65 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Hearing Re: Petition For Compromise Of Claim Set For 12/18/06 At 10:00 In Department 10
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Petition To Approve Compromise Of Claim Of Judith Bennett, Michael Summers Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Stipulation And Order For Continuance Of Mandatory Settlement Conference Is Gra; Honorable Judge Thomas Cahraman.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 62 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Motion Fee Posted By Jon Bennett Sr, Judith Bennett
Request RequestSpace
Blank 61 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Ex Parte Hearing Set On 8/29/06 At 8:30 In Dept 08
Request RequestSpace
Blank 60 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Hearing Set 10/05/06 At 8:30 In Department 08
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Motion To/for Judgment On The Pleadings Memo Of Points And Authorities By Southern Californiaedison Company Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 58 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Change Attorney On Southern Californiaedison Company From Kinglsey Hines To Southern Californiaedison Co-legal Dept On All Complaints.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/9/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Order Of The Court Hearing On 09/02/04 Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/9/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Declaration Of Of Laura Meyerson Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 55 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proposed Order Granting Souther Ca Edison Msj Rec'd & Forwd To Dept. 08
Request RequestSpace
Blank 54 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Rejected Document: Proposed Order Submitted By Southern Californiaedison Company.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Stipulation And Order For Appointment Of Judge Pro Tem.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/26/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Reply To Opp To Msj; Mp&a By Southern Californiaedison Company Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 51 Filed: 8/26/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Southern California Edison Cos Mediation Brief Rec'd & Forwd To Dept. 8
Request RequestSpace
Blank 50 Filed: 8/20/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Plaintiffs Mediation Brief Rec'd & Forwd To Dept. 08
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Declaration Of Of J Bennett & T Litfin In Support Of Oppo To Msj Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Separate Statement Of Undisputed Aterial Facts
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Memo Of Points & Authorities In Oppo Of/to Motion For Summary Adjudication By Jon Bennett Sr Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Stipulation And Order For To Reschedule Mediation Is Gra; Honorable Pro Tem John J Higgins.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Re-assignment By Jon Bennett Sr, Judith Bennett, Kimberli Summers, Michael Summers Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 44 Filed: 8/13/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Stip And Order To Reschedule Mediation Rec'd & Forwd To Dept. 08
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/15/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service By Mail Of Ntc Of Court Mediation Date On All Parties With A Mailing Date Of 07/14/04 Filed. (non-complaint)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/13/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Court Mediation Date Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 41 Filed: 7/13/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
County Mediation Hearing Set 8/24/04 At 8:30 In Dept. 08
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service Of Mtn Sum Judgment/ps/rutan & Tucker/061804 Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 39 Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Rejected Document: Proof Of Service Of Mtn For Summary Judgment Submitted By Southern Californiaedison Company.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request For Judicial Notice Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Separate Statement Of Undisputed Aterial Facts
Request RequestSpace
Blank 36 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Motion For Summary Judgment Fax Filed By Law Offices Of Donald A Redd
Request RequestSpace
Blank 35 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Hearing On Motion For Summary Judgment Set For 9/02/04 @ 8:30 In Department 08
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Motion For Summary Judgment On 1st Amended Complaint Of Jon Bennett By Southern Californiaedison Company Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Of Jon Bennett By Southern Californiaedison Company Represented By Law Offices Of Donald A Redd Filed. (over $25,000.00)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/22/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Ruling Re: 4/20/04 Demurrer & Mtn To Strike Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/20/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Stipulation To Participate In Court Mediation; Acknowledgment Of Receipt; Order Thereon Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Reply To Oppo To Notice Of Mtn To Strike Claim By Southern Californiaedison Company Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Reply To Pltfs Oppo To Demurrer By Southern Californiaedison Company Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Opposition To Defendants Motion To Strike Plaintiffs Claim By Jon Bennett Sr Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Opposition To Defendants Demurrer To Fourth Cause Of Action By Jon Bennett Sr Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/2/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Stipulation For Appointment Of Judge Pro Tempore Robert Schnabel.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 25 Filed: 3/26/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Hearing Re: Motion To Strike Set 4/20/04 At 8:30 In Department 08
Request RequestSpace
Blank 24 Filed: 3/26/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Hearing Re: Demurrer Set 4/20/04 At 8:30 In Department 08
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/26/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request For Judicial Notice Filed
Request RequestSpace
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/26/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Motion To Strike Claim For Punitive Damages By Southern Californiaedison Company Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/26/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Demurrer To 1st Amended Complaint Of Jon Bennett By Southern Californiaedison Company Represented By Law Offices Of Donald A Redd Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 20 Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Management Statement Received And Forwarded To Department 8
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Management Statement Filed By Jon Bennett Sr, Judith Bennett, Kimberli Summers, Michael Summers, Robert Bennett
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/16/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Management Statement Filed By Southern Californiaedison Company
Request RequestSpace
Blank 17 Filed: 3/16/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Management Statement Received And Forwarded To Department 8
Request RequestSpace
Blank 16 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service By Mail On The 1st Amended Complaint Of Jon Bennett Served On Southern Californiaedison Company Filed; Date Of Mailing 02/23/04
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
1st Amended Complaint Of Jon Bennett Filed. (amended Complaint - Superior Court)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Reply To Opposition To Mtn To Strike Claim Punitive Damages By Southern Californiaedison Company Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 13 Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
On Complaint Filed 09/26/2003 Of Jon Bennett As To Southern Californiaedison Company Attorney Kinglsey Hines Added.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/16/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Opposition To Defts Mtn To Strike Claim For Punitive Damages By Jon Bennett Sr, Judith Bennett Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 11 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Hearing Set 1/26/04 At 8:30 In Department 08
Request RequestSpace
Blank 10 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
First Appearance Posted By Southern Californiaedison Company
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Motion To/for Strike Claim For Punitive Damages By Southern Californiaedison Company Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service On The Complaint Filed 09/26/2003 Of Jon Bennett Served On Southern Californiaedison Company With Service Date Of 11/05/03 Filed.(personal Service)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Original Summons On Complaint Filed 09/26/2003 Of Jon Bennett Returned And Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 6 Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem On Complaint Filed 09/26/2003 Of Jon Bennett For Michael Summers Appointing Judith Bennett As Guardian; Honorable Judge Robert G. Spitzer.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Application And Order For Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Certified Copy(s) Made.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 3 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Non Proof Of Service Hearing Set For 12/16/03 At 8:00 In Dept Clerk
Request RequestSpace
Blank 2 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Directly Assigned To Department 08 For All Purposes
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Complaint Filed Fast Track - Summons Issued.
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 0 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?