Elam v. Harpeth Valley Utilities District of Davidson and Williamson Counties
Federal Civil Lawsuit Tennessee Middle District Court, Case No. 3:11-cv-01231
District Judge Aleta A. Trauger, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 16, 2018 at 12:34 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Diana Hawkins, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Elizabeth L. Murphy +1 615 327 0404 elizmurphy966@msn.com
No Logo Ira Vaughn, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Elizabeth L. Murphy +1 615 327 0404 elizmurphy966@msn.com
No Logo Kenneth Elam, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Elizabeth L. Murphy +1 615 327 0404 elizmurphy966@msn.com
No Logo Lisa Elam, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Elizabeth L. Murphy +1 615 327 0404 elizmurphy966@msn.com
No Logo Steve Hawkins, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Elizabeth L. Murphy +1 615 327 0404 elizmurphy966@msn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lathrop & Gage, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Rebecca J. McMahon +1 816 460 5542 +1 816 292 2001 rmcmahon@lathropgage.com
No Logo Victoria Hawkins, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Elizabeth L. Murphy +1 615 327 0404 elizmurphy966@msn.com
v.
No Logo Harpeth Valley Utilities District of Davidson and Williamson Counties, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Leitner, Williams, Dooley, and Napolitan (Nashville)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Scott Bennett +1 423 265 0214 +1 423 266 5490 scott.bennett@leitnerfirm.com
Space James F. Exum, III +1 423 424 3944 +1 423 308 0937 james.exum@leitnerfirm.com
No Logo Smith Seckman Reid, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence Charles Maxwell +1 615 726 5600 lmaxwell@bakerdonelson.com
No Logo W. L. Hailey & Company, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Thomas Matthew Miller

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lela Hollabaugh +1 615 252 2348 lhollabaugh@bradley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Thomason, King, Krieg & Waldrop, P.C. (Knoxville)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary Beth Haltom +1 615 259 1366 mbwhite@lewisthomason.com
Space John Roy Tarpley +1 615 259 1366 +1 615 259 1389 jtarpley@lewisthomason.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stinson Morrison Hecker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stacy J. Stotts +1 816 691 3363 +1 816 691 9326 sstotts@stinson.com
Space Joy C. Syrcle +1 314 259 4537 jsyrcle@stinson.com
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU of New Mexico

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Alexandra Freedman Smith +1 505 266 5915 +1 505 266 5916 asmith@aclu-nm.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Brent A Whittlesey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Brent A Whittlesey

Toggle Switch Represented by Civil Division, Federal Programs Branch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Terry M. Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470
, , , , , , , Joseph H. Hunt +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470
, , , , , , , Elizabeth Shapiro +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470

Toggle Switch Represented by Executive Office For Us Attorneys

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Roscoe Howard, Jr. +1 202 307 3569

Toggle Switch Represented by Justice Management Division

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Stuart Frisch +1 202 514 4317

Toggle Switch Represented by KING & SPALDING (GA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , TERMINATED: 11/06/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/06/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/06/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/06/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/06/ Alexander Kenneth Haas , +1 202 626 5502 ahaas@kslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Niall E Lynch +1 415 391 0600 +1 415 395 8095 niall.lynch@lw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Noticing INS Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Noticing INS Attorney

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of General Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Gerald Auerbach +1 202 307 3569

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the General Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Ed Williams +1 202 278 2478

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins Kaplan - Minneapolis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/20/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/20/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/20/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/20/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Tai Snow Milder +1 650 784 4024 +1 510 637 3724 tmilder@robinskaplan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Thomas E. Haroldson +1 213 687 5000 +1 213 687 5600 thomas.haroldson@skadden.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , John Fulton Gianola +1 304 291 6300 +1 304 291 6307 john.gianola@gbbjlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Jay D. Adelstein +1 202 514 3749 +1 202 514 1005 jay.d.adelstein@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Linda Anderson +1 559 498 7272 +4987 498 498 7432
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Peter Max Aronoff +1 212 637 2697 +1 212 637 2686 peter.aronoff@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , U. S. Attorney - Criminal +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 7695 usamoe.crimdock@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Wyn Dee Baker +1 918 382 2700 +1 918 560 7939 wyndee.baker@usdoj.gov
Space Laura Beckerman +1 202 307 6560 +1 202 514 5238 Laura.C.Beckerman@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Jacob Max Bergman +1 212 637 2776 jacob.bergman@usdoj.gov
, Julia A. Berman +1 202 616 8480 +1 202 307 0442 julia.berman@usdoj.gov
, Andrew Marshall Bernie +1 202 616 8488 +1 202 616 8470 andrew.m.bernie@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , Benjamin Leon Berwick +1 202 305 8573 +1 202 616 8470 benjamin.l.berwick@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Benjamin Leon Berwick +1 202 305 8573 +1 202 616 8470 benjamin.l.berwick@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James O. Bickford +1 202 305 7632 +1 202 616 8470 james.bickford@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY James O. Bickford +1 202 305 7632 +1 202 616 8470 james.bickford@usdoj.gov
, , Brigham John Bowen +1 202 514 6289 +1 202 616 8470 Brigham.Bowen@usdoj.gov
Space Kate R. Bowers, GOVT +1 202 307 0930 kate.bowers@usdoj.gov
, Kate R. Bowers, GOVT +1 202 307 0930 kate.bowers@usdoj.gov
, , , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Steven Yale Bressler +1 202 305 0167 +1 202 616 8470 steven.bressler@usdoj.gov
, Helen J Brunner +1 206 553 7970 Micki.Brunner@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Lonnie F Bryan +1 612 664 5600 +1 612 664 5788 lonnie.bryan@usdoj.gov
, Cathy Jo Burdette +1 202 616 2316 +1 202 514 9163 cathy.burdette@usdoj.gov
, , , Michael J. Byars +1 212 225 2524 +1 212 225 3999 michael.byars@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Shane Patrick Cargo +1 212 210 9460 +1 212 922 3860 shane.cargo@usdoj.gov
Space Lucy G Carlson +1 202 514 4713 lucy.carlson@usdoj.gov
, William S.W. Chang +1 202 320 0048 William.Chang@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Arastu Kabeer Chaudhury +1 212 637 2633 +1 212 637 2750 arastu.chaudhury@usdoj.gov
, , , , Varudhini Chilakamarri +1 202 616 8489 varudhini.chilakamarri@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , James R. Cho +1 718 254 6519 +1 718 254 7489 james.cho@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , John Dalton Clopper +1 212 637 2716 +1 212 637 0033 john.clopper@usdoj.gov
, , , Jacqueline E. Coleman Snead +1 202 514 3418 +1 202 616 8470 jacqueline.snead@usdoj.gov
, , James Edward Cox, Jr. +1 202 305 8629 +1 503 727 1117 jim.cox2@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Megan Anne Crowley +1 202 305 0754 megan.a.crowley@usdoj.gov
Space Mark Thomas D'Alessandro +1 614 469 5715 mark.dalessandro@usdoj.gov
Space Emily Ewell Daughtry +1 212 637 2717 emily.daughtry@usdoj.gov
, , , Ila Casy Deiss +1 415 436 7124 +1 415 436 7169 ila.deiss@usdoj.gov
, , John Docherty +1 612 664 5600 john.docherty@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Samuel Hilliard Dolinger +1 212 637 2677 samuel.dolinger@usdoj.gov
, Silvia Dominguez +1 202 616 8547 +1 202 514 4883 Silvia.Dominguez@usdoj.gov
, , BRIAN G. DONOHUE +1 202 514 5413 +1 202 616 2427 brian.donohue@usdoj.gov
, Timothy Michael Durkin +1 509 353 2767 +4623 462 462 3866 USAWAE.TDurkinECF@usdoj.gov
, Christine Wild Ennis +1 202 616 9473 +1 202 514 4231 christine.ennis@usdoj.gov
, , Lily Sara Farel +1 202 353 7633 +1 202 616 8460 lily.farel@usdoj.gov
, , , Ellen FitzGerald +1 415 436 7314 +1 415 436 6748 ellen.fitzgerald@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Victoria L. Francis +1 406 657 6101 +1 406 657 6058 victoria.francis@usdoj.gov
, Gerald S Frank +1 520 620 7300 +1 520 620 7138 gerry.frank@usdoj.gov
, Ronald Ray Gallegos - Inactive +1 602 514 7500 +1 602 514 7760 USAAZ.DepartedAUSAs@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Ronald Ray Gallegos - Inactive +1 602 514 7500 +1 602 514 7760 USAAZ.DepartedAUSAs@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Ronald Ray Gallegos - Inactive +1 602 514 7500 +1 602 514 7760 USAAZ.DepartedAUSAs@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , Arjun Garg +1 202 305 8613 +1 202 616 8470 arjun.garg@usdoj.gov
Space JENIGH J GARRETT +1 202 305 4777 +1 202 307 3961 jenigh.garrett@usdoj.gov
Space Abel Gomez +1 202 305 1582 abel.gomez@usdoj.gov
, Gregory Gonzalez +1 202 305 2941 +1 202 514 6903 gregory.gonzalez@usdoj.gov
, , , , , John R. Griffiths +1 202 514 4652 +1 202 616 8470 john.griffiths@usdoj.gov
, Judith B. Harvey +1 202 514 3932 judith.harvey@usdoj.gov
, Judy B Harvey +1 202 514 3932 +1 202 514 4231
Space Gary L Hayward - +1 515 473 9300 +1 515 473 9282 usaias.nefcivil@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Julia Alexandra Heiman +1 949 350 8719 julia.heiman@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Kimberly Lynn Herb +1 202 305 8356 +1 202 616 8470 kimberly.l.herb@usdoj.gov
Space Vincent Herman +1 202 305 3318 +1 202 514 0212 vincent.herman@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED May Lee Heye +1 415 436 6660 +1 415 436 6687 may.heye@usdoj.gov
, David H Hoff +1 217 373 5875 +1 217 373 5891 david.hoff@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Stephen M. Horn +1 304 345 2200 +1 304 347 5443 Steve.Horn@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Carolyn Aiko Ikari +1 860 760 7953 +1 860 760 7979 carolyn.ikari@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Michael James +1 919 856 4530 Mike.James@usdoj.gov
, , , , Jennifer Ann Jude +1 212 637 2663 +1 212 637 2686 jennifer.jude@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Ameet B. Kabrawala +1 718 254 6001 +1 718 254 7489 ameet.kabrawala@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Laurie Kathleen Kahrs +1 316 269 6481 +1 316 269 6484 laurie.kahrs@usdoj.gov
, Kerry Jane Keefe +1 206 553 2640 kerry.keefe@usdoj.gov
, , Diane Kelleher +1 202 514 4775 +22616820 226 616 8202 Diane.Kelleher@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Anoiel Khorshid +1 213 894 6086 +1 213 894 7819 anoiel.khorshid@usdoj.gov
, , Adam Kirschner +1 202 249 0920 adam.kirschner@usdoj.gov
Space Matthew Alexander Klecka +1 202 307 1309 +1 202 514 0152 Matthew.Klecka@usdoj.gov
, Jennie Leah Kneedler +1 202 305 8662 +1 202 616 8150 Jennie.L.Kneedler@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, (Inactive) Lara Meredith Kroop, GOVT +1 415 436 6660 +1 415 436 6687 lara.kroop@usdoj.gov
, Tara Marie La Morte +1 212 637 2746 +1 212 637 2730 tara.lamorte2@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Peter Michael Lantka +1 602 514 7739 +1 602 514 7760 peter.lantka@usdoj.gov
Space Christian Russell Larsen +1 414 297 1581 +1 414 297 4394 chris.larsen@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Peter Decklin Leary +1 202 514 3313 +1 202 616 8470 peter.leary@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , Jason Lee +1 202 514 3367 +1 202 616 8470 Jason.Lee3@usdoj.gov
, Jonathan Unruh Lee +1 415 436 6909 +1 415 436 6748 jonathan.lee@usdoj.gov
, , , Karen Folster Lesperance +1 518 431 0247 +1 518 431 0249 karen.lesperance@usdoj.gov
Space Judith E. Levy +1 313 226 9100 judith.levy@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sheila Lieber +1 202 514 3259 +1 202 616 8470 sheila.lieber@usdoj.gov
, Andrew J. Lievense +1 313 226 9665 +1 313 226 3271 andrew.lievense@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Irene Inkyong Liu , +1 415 436 6704 +1 415 436 6687 irene.liu@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michelle Lo +1 202 514 5134 +1 202 514 8780 Michelle.Lo2@usdoj.gov
, Ellen London +1 212 637 2737 +1 212 637 2702 ellen.london@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 08/20/2009 Lidia Maher +1 415 436 6660 +1 415 436 6687 Lidia.Maher@usdoj.gov
, Amanda L. Maisels +1 202 305 8454 +3059 305 305 9775 amanda.maisels@usdoj.gov
, Sameena Shina Majeed +1 202 305 1311 sameena.majeed@usdoj.gov
, , , Pamela Marentette +1 612 664 5652 Pamela.Marentette@usdoj.gov
, Owen Peter Martikan +1 415 436 7241 +1 415 436 6748 CaseView.ECF@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kevin William McArdle +1 202 353 7977 +1 202 353 7988 kevin.mcardle2@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Joel Lunsford McElvain +1 202 514 2988 +1 202 616 8202 joel.mcelvain@usdoj.gov
, , , , Victor M. Mercado-Santana +1 202 305 7001 victor.m.mercado-santana@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Emily B. Metzger +1 316 269 6484 emily.metzger@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Tamra Tyree Moore +1 202 514 8095 +1 202 616 8460 tamra.moore@usdoj.gov
, Ross Eric Morrison +1 212 637 2200 ross.morrison@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Emily B Nestler +1 202 616 8489 emily.b.nestler@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Dara A Olds +1 718 254 6148 +1 718 254 6082 dara.olds@usdoj.gov
Space Jack B. Patrick +1 202 514 9482 +5140 514 514 0152 jack.patrick2@usdoj.gov
, Rodney Patton +1 202 305 7919 +1 202 305 2685 rodney.patton@usdoj.gov
Space Paul E Pelletier +1 202 353 7693 +1 202 514 7021
, Brian Perez-Daple +1 617 748 3318 brian.perez-daple@usdoj.gov
, Frederick S Phillips +1 202 305 0439 +1 202 514 4180 frederick.phillips@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Sara C. Porsia +1 202 305 0503 +1 202 305 0506 sara.porsia@usdoj.gov
, , Amy Powell +1 202 514 9836 +1 202 616 8202 amy.powell@usdoj.gov
, Amy Powell +1 202 514 9836 +1 202 616 8202 amy.powell@usdoj.gov
, Debra Jean Prillaman +1 804 819 5400 debra.prillaman@usdoj.gov
Space Susan Begesse Prose +1 303 454 0100 +1 303 454 0408 susan.prose@usdoj.gov
, J. Eric Rich +1 202 305 4196 +1 202 307 3961 j.rich@usdoj.gov
, , , Scott Risner +1 202 514 2395 +1 202 616 8470 scott.risner@usdoj.gov
, , Scott Risner +1 202 514 2395 +1 202 616 8470 scott.risner@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Brad P. Rosenberg +1 202 514 3374 +1 202 616 8460 brad.rosenberg@usdoj.gov
, John Albert Russ, IV +1 202 353 7738 john.russ@usdoj.gov
, Justin Michael Sandberg +1 202 514 5838 +1 202 616 8202 justin.sandberg@usdoj.gov
, , , James A. Scharf +1 408 535 5044 +1 408 535 5081 james.scharf@usdoj.gov
, , , Scott Schools +1 415 436 6968 +1 415 436 7253 scott.schools2@usdoj.gov
, , , , Carlton Frederick Sheffield +1 202 532 4737 carlton.f.sheffield@usdoj.gov
, Steve A Sherman +1 202 307 6404 stephen.a.sherman@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Charles Ray Shockey +1 916 930 2203 +1 916 930 2210 charles.shockey@usdoj.gov
, Benjamin D. Singer +1 202 307 2005 benjamin.singer@usdoj.gov
, , Samuel M. Singer +1 202 616 8014 +1 202 616 8470 samuel.m.singer@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Adam Ryan Smart +1 602 514 7500 +1 602 514 7760 adam.smart@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jeffrey Michael Smith +1 202 514 5751 +1 202 616 8202 jeffrey.smith5@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Sekret T Sneed +1 213 894 3551 +1 213 894 7819 sekret.sneed@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 08/24/2017, TERMINATED: 08/24/2017, TERMINATED: 08/24/2017, TERMINATED: 08/24/2017 Eric J. Soskin +1 202 353 0533 eric.soskin@usdoj.gov
, Eric J. Soskin +1 202 353 0533 eric.soskin@usdoj.gov
, , , Marcia Kay Sowles +1 202 514 4960 +1 202 616 8470 marcia.sowles@usdoj.gov
Space Sandra Peavler Spooner +1 202 514 7195 +1 202 514 9163 sandra.spooner@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , John J Stark +1 614 469 5715 john.stark@usdoj.gov
, , , , Gladys M. Steffens Guzman +1 202 305 7181 Gladys.Steffens-Guzman@usdoj.gov
, , , Erik Kenneth Stegeby +1 202 616 4119 +1 813 274 6200 kenneth.stegeby@usdoj.gov
, William Stellmach +1 202 514 7023 +1 214 514 0152 William.Stellmach2@usdoj.gov
Space Benjamin O Tayloe, Jr. +1 202 514 8103 +1 202 514 0212 benjamin.tayloe@usdoj.gov
Space Galen Nicholas Thorp +1 202 514 4781 +1 202 616 8460 galen.thorp@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Rebecca Sol Tinio +1 212 637 2774 +1 212 637 2702 rebecca.tinio@usdoj.gov
, Benjamin H. Torrance +1 212 637 2703 +1 212 637 2702 benjamin.torrance@usdoj.gov
, , , , Neill Tai Tseng +1 415 436 7155 +1 415 436 6927 neill.tseng@usdoj.gov
, Tamara Lynn Ulrich +1 202 305 1432 +1 202 616 8460 tamara.ulrich@usdoj.gov
, Henry Parker Van Dyck +1 202 514 1721 henry.van.dyck@usdoj.gov
Space Jeannette Anne Vargas +1 212 637 2000 +1 212 637 2730 Jeannette.Vargas@usdoj.gov
, , , Ana H Voss +1 612 664 5600 +1 612 664 5788 ana.voss@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin Michael Wall +1 415 436 7071 +1 415 436 6748 robin.wall@usdoj.gov
, Thomas P. Walsh +1 312 353 5300 thomas.walsh2@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Brandon Matthew Waterman +1 212 637 2741 brandon.waterman@usdoj.gov
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/06/2017 Seth Wayne +1 202 532 3929 +1 202 514 0212 seth.wayne@usdoj.gov
, Daniel Herman Weiss +1 202 616 6594 +1 202 616 0372 Daniel.Weiss@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Gisela Ann Westwater +1 202 532 4174 gisela.westwater@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Spencer Elijah Wittman Amdur +1 202 616 7420 spencer.amdur@usdoj.gov
, , , Michael Andrew Zee +1 202 305 8648 +1 202 616 8470 m.andrew.zee@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 33 U.S.C. § 1365
Nature of Suit 893 - Environmental Matters
  Entries (111) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint by Kenneth Elam, Lisa Elam, Harpeth Valley Utilities District of Davidson and Williamson Counties, Diana Hawkins, Steve Hawkins, Victoria Hawkins. (Murphy, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE by United States Department of Justice re 108 Order, 109 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File of the United States' Comments on the Consent Judgment (Turner, Frederick) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER granting 106 Motion for Extension of Time to File and Request for Approval of Consent Decree. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/10/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Settlement Agreement) (eh) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        CONSENT DECREE. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/10/2013. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE of Filing by Kenneth Elam, Lisa Elam, Harpeth Valley Utilities District of Davidson and Williamson Counties, Diana Hawkins, Steve Hawkins, Victoria Hawkins re 106 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Request for Approval of Consent Decree (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Consent Decree, # 2 Attachment Excecuted Settlement Agreement)(Bennett, D.) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Request for Approval of Consent Decree by Kenneth Elam, Lisa Elam, Harpeth Valley Utilities District of Davidson and Williamson Counties, Diana Hawkins, Steve Hawkins, Victoria Hawkins. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2)(Bennett, D.) (Entered: 10/07/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER: In accord with the order entered September 24, 2013 (Docket Entry No. 103), the parties filed a joint report of settlement on September 30, 2013 (Docket Entry No. 104), in which they advised that they have reached a full settlement in this case, and will file a proposed consent decree before October 4, 2013. However, the parties ask the Court to approve the consent decree but defer dismissal of this case until the Department of Justice reviews the settlement agreement, and the parties represent that such review will be completed no later November 12, 2013, at which time the parties will file an agreed order of dismissal. As a result of the settlement in this case, the plaintiffs' motions to compel and for sanctions (Docket Entry Nos. 84 and 92 ) are rendered MOOT, and the Clerk is directed to terminate those motions as pending. Also as a result of the settlement, unless otherwise directed by the Court, there will be no further proceedings before the Magistrate Judge in this case.It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 9/30/2013. (eh) Modified on 10/1/2013 (eh). (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE of Settlement /Joint Report by Harpeth Valley Utilities District of Davidson and Williamson Counties (Bennett, D.) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER: Pursuant to the order entered July 15, 2013 (Docket Entry No. 89), a hearing was held on August 15, 2013, to address the plaintiffs' pending motions (Docket Entry Nos. 84, 91, and 92). During the August 15, 2013, hearing, the parties entered into an agreed order (Docket Entry No. 98), addressing the plaintiff's motion for a protective order. Therefore, the motion (Docket Entry No. 91 ) is rendered MOOT and the Clerk is directed to terminate that motion as pending. The parties were directed to file a joint proposed order reflecting the order matters addressed on August 15, 2103, and a further hearing was scheduled on September 4, 2013, to address the remaining pending issues. However, by agreed order entered September 5, 2013 (Docket Entry No. 102), the September 4, 2013, hearing was continued because the parties were in the midst of settlement discussions. A date for the rescheduled hearing was not established, but, by the agreed order, the parties were directed to report to the Court not later than September 16, 2013, regarding the status of the case. The parties have not reported on the status of the case. Therefore, by September 30, 2013, the parties shall file a joint status report, indicating whether the parties have been able to reach a resolution of this case and, if so, when they will file an agreed order or stipulation of dismissal and, if not, whether the parties remain in settlement negotiations and/or whether the hearing on the pending motions should be rescheduled. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 9/24/2013. (eh) Modified on 9/25/2013 (eh). (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    AGREED ORDER: Counsel for the parties report to this Court that they are in the midst of settlement negotiations such that the hearing scheduled for September 4, 2013 at 3:00 pm central time can and should be continued until some later date. Counsel will report to the Court not later than September 16, 2013, regarding the status of this matter. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 9/5/2013. (eh) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE by Harpeth Valley Utilities District of Davidson and Williamson Counties of Proposed Agreed Order of Sept. 4, 2013 Hearing to be Rescheduled (Bennett, D.) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        AGREED ORDER: Came the parties on August 12, 2013 by telephone conference with the Court to discuss outstanding issues in this matter. It was agreed to and consented to by the Court that the following segments of the current Scheduling Order be altered: 1. The current discovery date of August 16, 2013 for the parties to conduct written discovery and depose all fact witnesses is hereby amended and moved to October 18, 2013. 2. The defendant's Expert Disclosure deadline is moved to September 13, 2013. It is hereby ORDERED that the above changes be incorporated by reference to the Amended Scheduling Order. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/22/2013. (eh) Modified text on 8/22/2013 (eh). (Entered: 08/22/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AGREED ORDER filed by Harpeth Valley Utilities District of Davidson and Williamson Counties. (Exum, James) (Entered: 08/21/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            AGREED ORDER: Pursuant to the Agreement of the parties, no one from the HVUD (District), including any company or person retained by or on behalf of the District, shall enter the properties of the plaintiffs without the express agreement of plaintiffs' counsel, evidenced in writing, and if agreement cannot be reached, the District may seek relief from the Court. It is so ORDERED this 15th day of August 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 8/15/2013. (eh) Modified text on 8/15/2013 (eh). (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              RESPONSE to Motion re 91 MOTION for Protective Order and Sanctions filed by Harpeth Valley Utilities District of Davidson and Williamson Counties. (Bennett, D.) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                RESPONSE to Motion re 92 First MOTION for Sanctions filed by Harpeth Valley Utilities District of Davidson and Williamson Counties. (Bennett, D.) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  ORDER: At the request of the plaintiffs, the Motion For Protective Order 91 and Motion For Sanctions 92 filed by the plaintiffs are hereby REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Griffin for consideration at the hearing she has scheduled for 8/15/2013. The defendant has represented that responses will be filed by 8/13/2013. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/12/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER: At the request of the parties, it is ORDERED that the discovery dispute telephone conference scheduled for Monday, August 12, 2013, at 10:00 a.m., is RESET for the same day at 1:30 p.m. CST. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/5/2013. (eh) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER: It is ORDERED that a discovery dispute telephone conference shall be held on Monday, August 12, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. It is so ORDERED. ENTER this 5th day of August 2013. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/5/2013. (eh) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        First MOTION for Sanctions by Kenneth Elam, Lisa Elam, Diana Hawkins, Steve Hawkins, Victoria Hawkins, Ira Vaughn. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Affid,CounselFees)(Murphy, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          MOTION for Protective Order by Kenneth Elam, Lisa Elam, Diana Hawkins, Steve Hawkins, Victoria Hawkins, Ira Vaughn. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit SSRMtgMins, # 2 Exhibit Email,Consult on land, # 3 Exhibit DistrictclaimsCondemntn)(Murphy, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 84 First MOTION to Compel Documents filed by Harpeth Valley Utilities District of Davidson and Williamson Counties. (Exum, James) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              ORDER: The defendant's motion to continue (Docket Entry No. 83 ) is GRANTED. The hearing, scheduled by order entered July 5, 2013 (Docket Entry No. 82), on July 18, 2013, is RESCHEDULED to Thursday, August 15, 2013, at 11:00 a.m., central time, in Courtroom 764, U.S. Courthouse, 801 Broadway, Nashville, TN, to address the plaintiffs' motion to compel and accompanying documents (Docket Entry No. 84-88), which were filed on July 13, 2013. As a housekeeping matter, the Clerk is directed to terminate as a pending motion the plaintiffs' memorandum (Docket Entry No. 85 ) in support of their motion. The plaintiffs mislabeled the memorandum as a motion when it was filed. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 7/15/2013. (eh) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE of Filing by Kenneth Elam, Lisa Elam, Diana Hawkins, Steve Hawkins, Victoria Hawkins, Ira Vaughn re 85 First MOTION to Compel Memo in Support, 84 First MOTION to Compel Documents Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J Expedit2ndReqst, # 2 Exhibit K 1, CoverRespnExpedRqat, # 3 Exhibit K 2, ExpRespPrivlLog)(Murphy, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/13/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  NOTICE of Filing by Kenneth Elam, Lisa Elam, Diana Hawkins, Steve Hawkins, Victoria Hawkins, Ira Vaughn Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E RespMtConfer, # 2 Exhibit F TTl Parial 52 pge, # 3 Exhibit H SSR March2013, # 4 Exhibit I TTL ExcavMemo)(Murphy, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/13/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    NOTICE of Filing by Kenneth Elam, Lisa Elam, Diana Hawkins, Steve Hawkins, Victoria Hawkins, Ira Vaughn re 85 First MOTION to Compel Memo in Support Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B ResponRFP, # 2 Exhibit C First MeetConfer, # 3 Exhibit D 2ndMeetConfer)(Murphy, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/13/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Memo in Support of 84 by Kenneth Elam, Lisa Elam, Diana Hawkins, Steve Hawkins, Victoria Hawkins, Ira Vaughn. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Originl RFProd)(Murphy, Elizabeth) Modified text on 7/15/2013 (eh). (Entered: 07/13/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        First MOTION to Compel Documents by Kenneth Elam, Lisa Elam, Diana Hawkins, Steve Hawkins, Victoria Hawkins, Ira Vaughn. (Murphy, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/13/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          MOTION to Continue Magistrate's Hearing by Harpeth Valley Utilities District of Davidson and Williamson Counties. (Exum, James) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/5/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER: By order entered June 14, 2013 (Docket Entry No. 79), the Court permitted the plaintiffs to file discovery motions, which were referred to the Magistrate Judge, with the suggestion that a hearing be held on those motions. No motions have been filed. However, a hearing is scheduled on Thursday, July 18, 2013, at 11:00 a.m., in Courtroom 764, U.S. Courthouse, 801 Broadway, Nashville, TN. As a housekeeping matter, the motion for summary judgment filed by defendant W.L. Hailey & Company, Inc. (Docket Entry No. 67 ) is now MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 7/5/2013. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh) (Entered: 07/05/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              Agreed ORDER of Dismissal as to W.L. Hailey & Company, Inc. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/24/2013. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL Agreed Order filed by Kenneth Elam, Lisa Elam, Diana Hawkins, Steve Hawkins, Victoria Hawkins, Ira Vaughn. (Murphy, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER: The court has held two lengthy telephonic conferences with counsel for the parties concerning discovery issues. The court has now given the plaintiffs permission to file discovery motions, which are hereby REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for disposition under 28 U.S.C. ?? 636(b)(1) and Rule 72, FED.R.CIV.P. Given the dynamic between counsel for the plaintiffs and counsel for defendant Harpeth Valley Utilities District, the court encourages the Magistrate Judge to hold a hearing, at which counsel will appear. This court is of the opinion that that process is more likely to resolve the pending issues than simply having their positions presented on paper. It is so ORDERED. ENTER this 14th day of June 2013. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/14/2013. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that a discovery dispute telephone conference will be held on Friday, June 14, 2013, at 10:30 a.m. All parties should call (615) 695-2858 in order to participate in the call. It is so ORDERED. ENTER this 11th day of June 2013. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/11/2013. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh) (Entered: 06/11/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      AGREED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/5/2013. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting 75 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/5/2013. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Joint with W.L. Hailey by Lisa Elam, Diana Hawkins, Steve Hawkins, Victoria Hawkins, Ira Vaughn. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Agreed Order, Exh A)(Murphy, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER: A discovery dispute telephone conference was held with counsel for the parties on May 28, 2013. It is hereby ORDERED that defendant Harpeth Valley Utilities will respond to new, detailed discovery requests to be propounded by the plaintiff within fifteen (15) calendar days of service. The plaintiff will withhold the filing of a motion to compel and/or for sanctions until receipt of the new discovery responses, not having waived the right to raise issues related to discovery and sanctions that preceded the telephone conference on May 28, 2013. It is so ORDERED. ENTER this 28th day of May 2013. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/28/2013. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED a discovery dispute telephone conference will be held with counsel for the parties on Tuesday, May 28, 2013, at 2:00 p.m. It is so ORDERED. ENTER this 22nd day of May 2013. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/22/2013. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting 71 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion for Summary Judgment, extension to 6/5/2013. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/14/2013. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh) Modified on 5/14/2013 (eh). (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 67 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Kenneth Elam, Lisa Elam, Diana Hawkins, Steve Hawkins, Victoria Hawkins, Ira Vaughn. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order Extending Time)(Murphy, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing by W. L. Hailey & Company, Inc. re Docket Annotation, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Kent Depo Excerpts, # 2 Exhibit Smith Depo Excerpts, # 3 Exhibit Elam Response to Request to Admit, # 4 Exhibit Vaughn Response to Request to Admit, # 5 Exhibit Hawkins Response to Request to Admit, # 6 Exhibit Elam Response to Interrogatories, # 7 Exhibit Hawkins Response to Interrogatories, # 8 Exhibit Vaughn Response to Interrogatories)(Haltom, Mary Beth) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      STATEMENT of facts filed by W. L. Hailey & Company, Inc. in support of 67 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Haltom, Mary Beth) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support of 67 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by W. L. Hailey & Company, Inc. . (Haltom, Mary Beth) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment by W. L. Hailey & Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Haltom, Mary Beth) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 8/16/2013, Motions due by 11/20/2013. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/20/2013. (SEE ORDER FOR OTHER DEADLINES) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER RESETTING JURY TRIAL: Jury Trial set for 4/22/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 873 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger, Pretrial Conference set for 4/18/2014 01:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger,Exhibit List due by 4/15/2014, Witness List due by 4/15/2014, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/15/2014. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/20/2013. (SEE ORDER FOR OTHER DEADLINES) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Amended filed by Kenneth Elam, Lisa Elam, Diana Hawkins, Steve Hawkins, Victoria Hawkins, Ira Vaughn. (Murphy, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER: A case management conference was held with counsel for the parties on January 25, 2013. It is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiff's Motion to Amend Case Management Order (Docket No. 49) is GRANTED. The parties shall confer on new deadlines and file a proposed, revised case management order by February 8, 2013, based upon which the court will reset the trial. The trial presently scheduled for October 22, 2013 and the pretrial conference presently scheduled for October 18, 2013 are CANCELLED. It is so ORDERED. ENTER this 25th day of January 2013. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/25/2013. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    REPLY filed by Kenneth Elam, Lisa Elam, Diana Hawkins, Steve Hawkins, Victoria Hawkins, Ira Vaughn re 58 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by W. L. Hailey & Company, Inc., 57 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Harpeth Valley Utilities District of Davidson and Williamson Counties. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment State Request)(eh) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting 59 Motion for Leave to to File Reply and Supplement Motion to Amend Case Management Order. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/25/2013. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        NOTICE by W. L. Hailey & Company, Inc. of Initial Disclosures (Haltom, Mary Beth) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Reply by Kenneth Elam, Lisa Elam, Diana Hawkins, Steve Hawkins, Victoria Hawkins, Ira Vaughn. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment ReplyBrief, # 2 Attachment State Request)(Murphy, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 49 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Case management order filed by W. L. Hailey & Company, Inc.. (Haltom, Mary Beth) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 49 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Case management order Objection filed by Harpeth Valley Utilities District of Davidson and Williamson Counties. (Exum, James) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for January 25, 2013 at 4:00 p.m. is RESET for the same day at 2:00 p.m. It is so ORDERED. ENTER this 16th day of January 2013. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/16/2013. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by W. L. Hailey & Company, Inc.. (Haltom, Mary Beth) (Entered: 01/16/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that a discovery dispute telephone conference shall be held on Wednesday, January 16, 2013, at 11:00 a.m. The parties should call (615) 695-2858 at the scheduled time in order to participate in the telephone conference. It is so ORDERED. ENTER this 15th day of January 2013. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/15/2013. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER: This cause came before this Honorable Court upon the motion of Lela M. Hollabaugh of Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, LLP; Stacy Stotts and Joy Syrcle of Stinson Morrison Hecker, LLP; and John R. Tarpley and Mary Beth Haltom of Lewis, King, Krieg & Waldrop, requesting that attorneys Hollabaugh, Stotts, and Syrcle be allowed to withdraw as counsel of record for defendant W.L. Hailey & Company, Inc. (Defendant) and that attorneys Tarpley and Haltom be substituted as counsel of record for Defendant. For good cause shown, the Court finds that the Motion is well taken and shall be granted. It is therefore, ORDERED that attorneys Hollabaugh, Stotts, and Syrcle shall be allowed to withdraw as counsel of record for defendant W.L. Hailey & Company, Inc. and that attorneys Tarpley and Haltom shall be substituted as counsel of record for defendant W.L. Hailey & Company, Inc. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/10/2013. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh) (Entered: 01/10/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 50 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/10/2013. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh) (Entered: 01/10/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that a case management conference will be held in Judge Trauger's chambers on Friday, January 25, 2013, at 4:00 p.m. It is so ORDERED. ENTER this 10th day of January 2013. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/10/2013. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh) (Entered: 01/10/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and for Substitution of Counsel by W. L. Hailey & Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Haltom, Mary Beth) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              First MOTION to Amend/Correct Case management order by Kenneth Elam, Lisa Elam, Diana Hawkins, Steve Hawkins, Victoria Hawkins, Ira Vaughn. (Murphy, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kenneth Elam, Lisa Elam, Diana Hawkins, Steve Hawkins, Victoria Hawkins, Ira Vaughn as to defendant Smith, Seckman, Reid only. (Murphy, Elizabeth) Modified on 8/27/2012 (kb). (Entered: 08/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 20 Amended Complaint, by W. L. Hailey & Company, Inc..(Hollabaugh, Lela) Modified Text on 8/20/2012 (dt). (Entered: 08/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    Certified return receipt card to Stacy Stotts returned 7/18/12 as to DE# 38; signed by B. Lochman on 7/16/12. (rd) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      Certified return receipt card to Elizabeth L. Murphy returned 7/16/12 as to DE# 38; signed by P. Broadway on (no date specified). (rd) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        Certified return receipt card to D. Scott Bennett returned 7/16/12 as to DE# 38; signed by David Goldman on 7/13/12. (rd) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          Certified return receipt card to Lawrence Charles Maxwell returned 7/16/12 as to DE# 38; signed by Herb McGehee on 7/13/12. (rd) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            Certified return receipt card to Lela M. Hollabaugh returned 7/16/12 as to DE# 38; signed by Andrew Clove on 7/13/12. (rd) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              Certified return receipt card to James F. Exum, III returned 7/16/12 as to DE# 38; signed by David Goldman on 7/13/12. (rd) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 34 Motion for Joy Syrcle to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/12/2012. (eh) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT re 38 Appear Pro Hac Vice. (la) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: Having considered Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Stacy Stotts, said Motion is hereby GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Stacy Stotts is admitted as counsel, pro hac vice, for Defendant in the above-styled matter. The Clerk of this Court is directed to send certified copies of this Order to all counsel of record. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/11/2012. (xc: cert copies to counsel of record) (eh) (Entered: 07/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      RECEIPT #34675022411 and 34675022412 in the amount of $75 each for re 33 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (eh) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Joy Syrcle from the United States District Court for the Eastern of Missouri filed by W. L. Hailey & Company, Inc.. (Hollabaugh, Lela) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Stacy Stotts from the United States District Court of Kansas filed by W. L. Hailey & Company, Inc.. (Hollabaugh, Lela) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for attorney(s) Joy Syrcle to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 20 days) by W. L. Hailey & Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order for Admission)(Hollabaugh, Lela) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for attorney(s) Stacy Stotts to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 20 days) by W. L. Hailey & Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order for Admission)(Hollabaugh, Lela) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                AGREED ORDER: As evidenced by the signatures of the parties set forth below, by and through counsel the parties agree to stay all proceedings in the case including discovery. Such stay shall remain in effect from entry of this order until sixty (60) days thereafter. The parties wish to use the time to engage in an informal process to assess resolution options, exchange information confidentially and avoid unnecessary litigation expense. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/21/2012. (eh) (Entered: 06/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 30 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/21/2012. (eh) (Entered: 06/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings for Sixty Days by Kenneth Elam, Lisa Elam, Harpeth Valley Utilities District of Davidson and Williamson Counties, Diana Hawkins, Steve Hawkins, Victoria Hawkins, Smith Seckman Reid, Inc., Ira Vaughn, W. L. Hailey & Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Agreed Order 60 Day Stay)(Murphy, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 27 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer W. L. Hailey & Company, Inc. answer due 7/6/2012. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/7/2012. (eh) (Entered: 06/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 26 Motion For Entry of Agreed Order. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/7/2012. (eh) (Entered: 06/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint by W. L. Hailey & Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hollabaugh, Lela) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION For Entry of Agreed Order by Smith Seckman Reid, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order - Agreed Order for Extension)(Maxwell, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 20 Amended Complaint by Harpeth Valley Utilities District of Davidson and Williamson Counties.(Exum, James) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence Charles Maxwell on behalf of Smith Seckman Reid, Inc. (Maxwell, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 2/8/2013, Dispositive Motions due by 6/1/2013. A pre-trial conference is set for October 18, 2013 at 1:30. Trial is set for October 22, 2013. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/23/2012. (SEE ORDER FOR OTHER DEADLINES)(eh) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Kenneth Elam, Lisa Elam, Harpeth Valley Utilities District of Davidson and Williamson Counties, Diana Hawkins, Steve Hawkins, Victoria Hawkins, Ira Vaughn. (Murphy, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons issued as to Smith Seckman Reid, Inc., W. L. Hailey & Company, Inc.. (eh) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ira Vaughn, Kenneth Elam, Lisa Elam, Diana Hawkins, Victoria Hawkins, Steve Hawkins.(Murphy, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          AGREED ORDER: Pursuant to the agreement of the parties, as evidenced by the signature of counsel below, Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint is to be filed and served according to Rule 15(a)(2). Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/11/2012. (eh) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 17 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/11/2012. (eh) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Kenneth Elam, Lisa Elam, Diana Hawkins, Steve Hawkins, Victoria Hawkins, Ira Vaughn. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Agreed Order)(Murphy, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 15 Motion to Expedite. Response to DE# 14 due by 5/11/2012. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/4/2012. (eh) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Expedite re Amendment by Kenneth Elam, Lisa Elam, Diana Hawkins, Steve Hawkins, Victoria Hawkins, Ira Vaughn. (Murphy, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Kenneth Elam, Lisa Elam, Diana Hawkins, Steve Hawkins, Victoria Hawkins, Ira Vaughn. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Proposed Amended Complaint)(Murphy, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Exhibit List due by 10/15/2013,Witness List due by 10/15/2013, Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/15/2013, Jury Trial set for 10/22/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 873 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger, Pretrial Conference set for 10/18/2013 at 01:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/2/2012.(SEE ORDER FOR OTHER DEADLINES) (eh) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Refiled filed by All Plaintiffs. (Murphy, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by All Plaintiffs. (Murphy, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            DEFENDANT'S PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Harpeth Valley Utilities District of Davidson and Williamson Counties. (Exum, James) Modified on 3/29/2012 (eh). (Entered: 03/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by Harpeth Valley Utilities District of Davidson and Williamson Counties.(Exum, James) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 5 Motion for D. Scott Bennett to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/16/2012. (eh) (Entered: 02/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RECEIPT #34675020483 in the amount of $75 re 5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (eh) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney D. Scott Bennett from the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee filed by Harpeth Valley Utilities District of Davidson and Williamson Counties. (eh) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for attorney D. Scott Bennett to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Harpeth Valley Utilities District of Davidson and Williamson Counties. (eh) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Harpeth Valley Utilities District of Davidson and Williamson Counties re 3 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response (Exum, James) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***WITHDRAWN***First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Harpeth Valley Utilities District of Davidson and Williamson Counties. (Exum, James) Modified on 1/25/2013 (eh). (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for Friday, 3/30/2012 at 03:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (hb) (Entered: 12/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against Harpeth Valley Utilities District of Davidson and Williamson Counties, filed by Ira Vaughn, Kenneth Elam, Lisa Elam, Diana Hawkins, Victoria Hawkins, Steve Hawkins. (filing fee $350) (summons issued) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(hb) (Entered: 12/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 24 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?