Arega v. DHS/ICE
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Southern District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-01714

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 17, 2019 at 3:41 PM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Tizazu F. Arega, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by A658104

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tizazu F. Arega
v.
No Logo DHS/ICE, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: None Docket Annotation
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None Judgment - Clerk
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None Writ of Mandamus
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/29/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Related Case Memorandum
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/31/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Notice - other
                      CLERK'S DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Plaintiff. (Blank Summons and Marshal forms included) (er)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Appoint Counsel
                        MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Tizazu F. Arega. (er)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                          MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The following document(s) were not submitted to the Office of the Clerk: Marshal forms and summons forms) by Plaintiff Tizazu F. Arega. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint, # 2 Complaint- Exhibits) (er)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 4 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?