Ayers v. State of Ohio
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-02890

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 10, 2020 at 3:27 PM DT (9 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Adrian Ayers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by #0115625

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adrian Ayers
v.
No Logo Clifford Pinkney, Defendant
No Logo Eric Ivey, Defendant
No Logo Fallon Radigan, Defendant
No Logo Jane Doe, Defendant
No Logo John Doe, Defendant
No Logo Michael DeWine, Defendant
No Logo Michael O'Malley, Defendant
No Logo State of Ohio, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None Appeal In Forma Pauperis
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/24/2020, Entered: None Enforce
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/8/2020, Entered: None Compel Discovery
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/8/2020, Entered: None Leave
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/10/2020, Entered: None Appointment of Counsel
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/10/2020, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/8/2020, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/12/2020, Entered: None Extension (Other)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: None Supplement
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: None Strike
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: None Extension (of deadlines)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: None Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: None Minute Order _ Case Management Conference
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None Continue
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None Case Management Conference Scheduling Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: None memorandum opinion and order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: None Dismiss Case as Frivolous
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: None memorandum opinion and order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None Amend Complaint
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                                  Affidavit of prisoner filed by Plaintiff Adrian Ayers. (Attachments: # 1 Trust Account)(S,SR)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Complaint
                                                                    Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Adrian Ayers. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Notices of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, # 3 envelope) (S,SR)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case, (S,SR)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (S,SR)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 17 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?