Palmer-Tate v. Sheriff
Federal Civil Lawsuit Indiana Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-00420

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 19, 2019 at 1:41 PM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Markel Palmer-Tate, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Pulaski County Jail

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Markel Palmer-Tate +1 800 283 3341
v.
No Logo Sheriff, Respondent
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: None Clerks Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None Letter
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Letter
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Letter
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Letter
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - court user
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - court user
                PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Markel Palmer-Tate. (No filing fee or IFP received)(Returned file stamped copy with case number to Palmer-Tate)(nae) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 6 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?