GONCAROVS v. DAY, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-04915-SSB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ARTURS GONCAROVS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ROBERT ALAN FINEBERG +1 609 463 0055 fineberg@verizon.net
v.
No Logo TIMOTHY G. DAY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GREEN, LUNDGREN & RYAN, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM LEO LUNDGREN, III +1 856 428 5800 lundgren@glrlaw.com
No Logo WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE, Arbitrator

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
Office Camden
Filed 10/23/2001
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 350 - Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Cape May
Terminated 1/27/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BG, CLOSED, SCHEDO
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice as to defendants TIMOTHY G. DAY and FRED D. LAYTON, without costs against any party, (NM) (er) Modified on 02/04/2003
    LREF
    Blank 15 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER, dismissing the case as settled, without costs or prejudice within 60 days if the settlment is not consumattted. ( signed by Judge Stanley S. Brotman ) (NM) (dt)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003 Terminated Case
      Case closed (dt)
        LREF
        Blank 14 Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: 11/7/2002 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
        STIPULATION and ORDER, dismissing action without prejudice & without costs as to deft. Fred D. Layton, only ( signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez for Judge Stanley S. Brotman) (NM) (bf)
          LREF
          Blank 13 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: 10/31/2002 Order Referring Case to ArbitrationCourt Filing
          ORDER Appointing Arbitrator WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE Arbitration hearing set for 2:00 12/17/02 ( Signed by Chief Judge John W. Bissell ) (AC)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/16/2002 Status Conference
            Status conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 10/15/02. (js)
              LREF
              Blank 12 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/17/2002 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
              SCHEDULING ORDER IN ARBITRATION CASE setting Discovery cutoff 10/31/02; Status conference for 2:00PM on 10/15/02. By copy of this Order, the Clerk will be requested to schedule the Arbitration for a date on or after the status conference. (signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen)(NM) (er)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 6/14/2002, Entered: 6/14/2002 Status Conference
                Status conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 6/13/02. (sb)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 Scheduling Conference
                  Scheduling conference resetting to 2:00 6/13/02 before Mag. Rosen . (bf)
                    LREF
                    Blank 11 Filed: 4/4/2002, Entered: 4/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER, setting scheduling conference for 11:30AM on 5/15/02. (signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen) (NM) (er)
                      LREF
                      Blank 10 Filed: 4/4/2002, Entered: 4/4/2002, Terminated: 1/27/2003 Answer
                      ANSWER to Complaint by TIMOTHY G. DAY, FRED D. LAYTON; jury demand; Proof of mailing annexed. (er)
                        LREF
                        Blank 9 Filed: 4/1/2002, Entered: 4/2/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting [5-1] motion to vacate default and allow filing of answer out of time within (10) days from date of this Order ( signed by Judge Stanley S. Brotman ) (NM) (bf)
                          LREF
                          Blank 8 Filed: 4/1/2002, Entered: 4/2/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                          OPINION ( signed by Judge Stanley S. Brotman ) (bf)
                            LREF
                            Blank 7 Filed: 4/1/2002, Entered: 4/2/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                            Minute entry: Minutes of: 04/1/02; The following actions were taken, By Judge Stanley S. Brotman - See pleading #5, GRANTED; Opinion & Order to be entered. (bf)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002 Motion Hearing
                              Motion hearing re: [5-1] motion to vacate default and allow filing of answer out of time at 4/5/02 (bf)
                                LREF
                                Blank 6 Filed: 2/15/2002, Entered: 2/15/2002 Certification
                                CERTIFICATION of WILLIAM L. LUNDGREN, III, ESQ. on behalf of TIMOTHY G. DAY, FRED D. LAYTON Re: [5-1] motion to vacate default and allow filing of answer out of time (er)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 5 Filed: 2/15/2002, Entered: 2/15/2002, Terminated: 4/1/2002 Motion to Vacate
                                  Notice of MOTION to vacate default and allow filing of answer out of time by TIMOTHY G. DAY, FRED D. LAYTON, Motion set for 3/15/02 on [5-1] motion Certificate of mailing annexed. (Brief and certification/PO Subm) (er)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/9/2002, Entered: 1/9/2002 Clerks Entry of Default*
                                    DEFAULT ENTERED as to TIMOTHY G. DAY, FRED D. LAYTON for failure to plead or defend (bf)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 4 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/9/2002 Affidavit
                                      AFFIDAVIT of Robert A. Fineberg, Esq. on behalf of ARTURS GONCAROVS showing personal service of summons & complaint upon defts. on 10/31/01 Re: [3-1] default requested (bf)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 3 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/9/2002 request for default
                                        REQUEST BY pltf. ARTURS GONCAROVS FOR entry of DEFAULT AGAINST defts. TIMOTHY G. DAY and FRED D. LAYTON for failure to plead or defend. (bf)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/25/2001, Entered: 10/25/2001 Summons Issued
                                          SUMMONS(ES) issued for TIMOTHY G. DAY, FRED D. LAYTON ( 20 Days) (Mailed to Counsel) (mfs)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 2 Filed: 10/24/2001, Entered: 10/24/2001, Terminated: 1/27/2003 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                            NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate Judge Joel B. Rosen (mfs)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/24/2001, Entered: 10/24/2001 Case Referred to Arbitration
                                              CASE REFERRED to arbitration (mfs)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 1 Filed: 10/23/2001, Entered: 10/24/2001 Complaint
                                                COMPLAINT filed; jury demand; FILING FEE $150.00; RECEIPT #296200 (mfs)
                                                  LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 63 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?