RODRIGUEZ v. NATL HEALTHCARE SVC
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-05298-JEI

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo ROSA RODRIGUEZ, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space F. MICHAEL DAILY, JR. +1 856 833 0006 dailyfm@hotmail.com
v.
No Logo National Healthcare Services, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MATTHEW V. DELDUCA +1 609 620 3200 mdelduca@dechert.com
Space CHRISTOPHER JAMES KELLY +1 609 620 3200 christopher.kelly@dechert.com
Office Camden
Filed 11/15/2001
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 623 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Camden
Terminated 4/29/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case {}
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BP, CLOSED, SCHEDO
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 24 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting [10-1] dispositive motion for summary judgment. (signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas) (NM) (er)
    LREF
    Blank 23 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 OrderCourt Filing
    OPINION, filed. (signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas) (er)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
      Deadline updated; terminating [10-2] hearing Motion set for 12/20/02 on [9-1] dispositive motion notice for summary judgment terminating [9-1] dispositive motion notice for summary judgment (er)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Terminated Case
        Case closed (er)
          LREF
          Blank 22 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 ~Notice (other)
          NOTICE of change of address of attorney, F. Michael Daily, Jr. for plaintiff, ROSA RODRIGUEZ (er)
            LREF
            Blank 21 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 12/3/2002 Certification
            SUPPLEMENTAL CERTIFICATION of Christopher J. Kelly on behalf of deft. NATL HEALTHCARE SVC in support of [10-1] dispositive motion for summary judgment (js)
              LREF
              Blank 20 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 12/3/2002 Certification
              SUPPLEMENTAL CERTIFICATION of Jill Adams on behalf of deft. NATL HEALTHCARE SVC in support of [10-1] dispositive motion for summary judgment (js)
                LREF
                Blank 19 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 12/3/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by deft. NATL HEALTHCARE SVC, Re: Reply Brief. (js)
                  LREF
                  Blank 18 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 12/3/2002 Affidavit
                  AFFIDAVIT CERTIFYING DOCUMENTS RELIED UPON BY PLTF. ROSA RODRIGUEZ IN OPPOSITION TO [10-1] dispositive motion for summary judgment (js)
                    LREF
                    Blank 17 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 12/3/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                    STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS by pltf. ROSA RODRIGUEZ in opposition to deft's motion for summary judgment. (js)
                      LREF
                      Blank 16 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 12/3/2002 Certification
                      CERTIFICATION of Christopher J. Kelly on behalf of deft. NATL HEALTHCARE SVC in support of [10-1] dispositive motion for summary judgment (js)
                        LREF
                        Blank 15 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 12/3/2002 Certification
                        CERTIFICATION of Wendy Teti on behalf of deft. NATL HEALTHCARE SVC in support of [10-1] dispositive motion for summary judgment (js)
                          LREF
                          Blank 14 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 12/3/2002 Certification
                          CERTIFICATION of William Carroll on behalf of deft. NATL HEALTHCARE SVC in support of [10-1] dispositive motion for summary judgment (js)
                            LREF
                            Blank 13 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 12/3/2002 Certification
                            CERTIFICATION of Jill Adams on behalf of deft. NATL HEALTHCARE SVC in support of [10-1] dispositive motion for summary judgment (js)
                              LREF
                              Blank 12 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 12/3/2002 Certification
                              CERTIFICATION of Joseph Cinaglia on behalf of deft. NATL HEALTHCARE SVC in support of [10-1] dispositive motion for summary judgment (js)
                                LREF
                                Blank 11 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 12/2/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                DEFENDANT'S STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS (js)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 10 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 12/2/2002, Terminated: 4/29/2003 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                  Notice of MOTION for summary judgment by deft. NATL HEALTHCARE SVC, Motion set for 12/20/02 on [9-1] dispositive motion notice for summary judgment .(All Briefs PO Submitted pursuant to the disp. motion practice) (Cert.Ser.annexed) (ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED) (js) Modified on 12/03/2002
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 9 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/13/2002 Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion
                                    Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion for summary judgment by deft. NATL HEALTHCARE SVC (js)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 8 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 2/28/2002 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                      SCHEDULING ORDER setting Amending of pleadings on 5/31/02; Discovery cutoff 8/1/02; Pretrial conference at 2:45pm on 1/16/03; Dispositive Motion due on or before 12/2/02. n.m. (signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler) (js)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 7 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER, setting scheduling conference for 9:30am on 2/26/02 . n.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (js)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 6 Filed: 1/22/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 Answer
                                          ANSWER to Complaint by deft. NATL HEALTHCARE SVC. (js)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 5 Filed: 1/10/2002, Entered: 1/10/2002 Waiver of Service Executed
                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED as to NATL HEALTHCARE SVC 11/20/01 Answer deadline projected for 1/19/02 for NATL HEALTHCARE SVC (sb)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 4 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 Waiver of Service Executed
                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED as to NATL HEALTHCARE SVC 11/20/01; Answer deadline projected for 1/19/02 for NATL HEALTHCARE SVC (js)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 3 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: 12/10/2001 Application and Clerk's Order to extend time to an
                                                APPLICATION by NATL HEALTHCARE SVC and Clerk's Order extending time to answer. Answer due 12/26/01 for NATL HEALTHCARE SVC (sb)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 11/19/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001, Terminated: 4/29/2003 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                  NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate Judge Robert B. Kugler (gg)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 11/15/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 Complaint
                                                    COMPLAINT filed; jury demand FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 296324 (gg)
                                                      LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 51 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?