United States v. Rafiekian
Criminal Case Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cr-00457-AJT

Tags
Last Updated February 5, 2019 at 8:32 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Thomas Gibbs +1 202 353 3469 +1 202 307 0224 john.gibbs@usdoj.gov
Space James P. Gillis +1 703 299 3897 +1 703 299 3982 james.p.gillis@usdoj.gov
Space Evan Nathaniel Turgeon +1 202 353 0176 evan.turgeon@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Bijan Rafiekian, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by TROUT CACHERIS, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
also known as
Bijan Kian Robert P. Trout +1 202 464 3300 +1 202 463 3319 rtrout@troutcacheris.com
Space Robert P. Trout +1 202 464 3300 +1 202 463 3319 rtrout@troutcacheris.com
No Logo Kamil Ekim Alptekin, Defendant

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Bijan Rafiekian (1)
Office Alexandria
Filed 12/12/2018
County Alexandria City
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371 Conspiracy to Act as an Agent of a Foreign Government and to Make False Statements and Willful Omissions in a FARA Filing
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 951.F
Offense Level 4
18951 Acting in the United States as an Agent of a Foreign Government
Defendant Custody Status Released
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 34 Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER that the hearing on Deft Bijan Rafiekian's 32 Motion in Support of a September Trial Date and Deft's 29 Motion for a Bill of Particulars, currently scheduled for Thursday, 02/07/19 at 10:00 a.m. be, and the same hereby is, CONTINUED to Friday, 02/08/19 at 2:00 p.m.. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 01/30/19. (pmil, ) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Memorandum in Support by Bijan Rafiekian as to Bijan Rafiekian, Kamil Ekim Alptekin re 32 MOTION to Continue Motion to Set a September Trial Date (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Trout, Robert) (Entered: 01/22/2019)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      MOTION to Continue Motion to Set a September Trial Date by Bijan Rafiekian as to Bijan Rafiekian, Kamil Ekim Alptekin. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Trout, Robert) (Entered: 01/22/2019)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER that the trial date of 02/11/19, be, and the same hereby is, VACATED, with all other filing dates and hearings remaining as presently scheduled, with a new trial date to be set following the Court's consideration of the anticipated motions and filings referenced herein. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 01/22/19. (pmil, ) (Entered: 01/22/2019)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Memorandum in Support by Bijan Rafiekian as to Bijan Rafiekian, Kamil Ekim Alptekin re 29 MOTION for Bill of Particulars (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Trout, Robert) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTION for Bill of Particulars by Bijan Rafiekian as to Bijan Rafiekian, Kamil Ekim Alptekin. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Trout, Robert) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document 28 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Subpoenas issued (pmil, ) (Entered: 01/16/2019)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER granting 25 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Bijan Rafiekian (1). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 01/15/19. (pmil, ) (Entered: 01/15/2019)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting 24 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Bijan Rafiekian (1). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 01/15/19. (pmil, ) (Entered: 01/15/2019)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Stacey Hamilton Mitchell and Certification of Local Counsel Robert P. Trout (Filing fee $ 75 receipt number 0422-6443755.) by Bijan Rafiekian. (Trout, Robert) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark Joseph MacDougall and Certification of Local Counsel Robert P. Trout (Filing fee $ 75 receipt number 0422-6443632.) by Bijan Rafiekian as to Bijan Rafiekian, Kamil Ekim Alptekin. (Trout, Robert) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document 23 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE John T. Gibbs appearing for USA. (Gibbs, John) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MOTION to Continue by USA as to Bijan Rafiekian, Kamil Ekim Alptekin. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gillis, James) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ORDER with respect to classified information. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 1/4/2019. (dzir) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga: Status Conference as to Bijan Rafiekian held on 1/3/2019. U.S. appeared through James Gillis, Evan Turgeon, and John Gibbs. Defendant appeared with counsel Robert Trout, Mark MacDougall, and Stacey Mitchell. Parties discuss the exchange of Discovery materials. The Court will leave the trial date as set and requests a formal motion for continuance to explain the need for continuing trial be filed by 1/21/2019. The Motion will be heard on 2/7/2019 at 10:00 a.m. The Court also instructs parties to file any necessary Ex Parte requests. Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Defendant continued on same terms and conditions of release. (Court Reporter R. Montgomery)(dzir) (Entered: 01/03/2019)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/3/19 (Status Conference), before Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Court reporter/transcriber Rhonda Montgomery, Telephone number 703-299-4599. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 2/4/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/5/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/3/2019.(montgomery, rhonda) (Entered: 01/03/2019)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER with respect to Jury Trial. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 12/18/2018. (dzir) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None transcriptCourt Filing
                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/18/18 (Arraignment), before Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Court reporter/transcriber Rhonda Montgomery, Telephone number 703-299-4599. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 1/17/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/19/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/18/2019.(montgomery, rhonda) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None protective orderCourt Filing
                                      Protective Order as to Bijan Rafiekian. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 12/18/2018. (dzir) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None arraignmentCourt Filing
                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga: Arraignment as to Bijan Rafiekian (1) Counts 1, 2 held on 12/18/2018. U.S. appeared through Jim Gillis and Evan Turgeon. Defendant appeared with counsel, Robert Trout and Gloria Solomon. Defendant WFA, PNG, and demanded a Jury Trial. Motions due by 1/18/2019. MOTION HEARING set for 2/4/2019 at 09:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. JURY TRIAL set for 2/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. STATUS CONFERENCE BEFORE TRIAL set for 2/11/2019 at 09:00 AM before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. Status Hearing set for 1/3/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Defendant continued on same terms and conditions of release. (Court Reporter R. Montgomery)(dzir) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 order setting conditions of releaseCourt Filing
                                          ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Bijan Rafiekian (1) PR BOND. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 12/17/2018. (wgar, )
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 initial appearanceCourt Filing
                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson:Initial Appearance as to Bijan Rafiekian held on 12/17/2018. US appeared through: James Gillis and Evan Turgeon. Deft appeared with counsel: Robert Trout. Deft informed of rights, charges, and penalties. Gov't request this matter be unsealed - case unsealed. Gov't is not seeking detention. Deft placed on PR bond with conditions. Arraignment previously set for 12/18/18 at 9:30 a.m. (Tape #FTR.)(wgar, ) Modified on 12/17/2018 to correct arraignment time (wgar, ).
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Robert Powel Trout appearing for Bijan Rafiekian (wgar, )
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank  bond
                                                PR Bond Entered as to Bijan Rafiekian. (wgar, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank  Case Unsealed
                                                  Case unsealed as to Bijan Rafiekian, Kamil Ekim Alptekin. (wgar, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                    Set/Reset Hearings as to Bijan Rafiekian: Arraignment set for 12/18/2018 at 09:30 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. (dzir)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018 summons returned executed
                                                      Summons Returned Executed on 12/13/18 as to Bijan Rafiekian (pmil, )
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018 Summons issued
                                                        Summons Issued in case as to Bijan Rafiekian (pmil, )
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018 warrant issued
                                                          Arrest Warrant Issued in case as to Kamil Ekim Alptekin. (pmil, )
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018 Order on Motion to Seal Case +Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [6] Motion to Seal Case until the first deft makes his initial appearance in the Eastern District of Virginia at which time it shall be automatically unsealed as to Bijan Rafiekian (1), Kamil Ekim Alptekin (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 12/12/18. (pmil, )
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018, Terminated: 12/12/2018 Motion to Seal Case
                                                              MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Bijan Rafiekian, Kamil Ekim Alptekin. (pmil, )
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018 Redacted Criminal Case Cover Sheet
                                                                Redacted Criminal Case Cover Sheet (pmil, )
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018 Redacted Criminal Case Cover Sheet
                                                                  Redacted Criminal Case Cover Sheet (pmil, )
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018 Indictment (Sealed)
                                                                    SEALED INDICTMENT as to Bijan Rafiekian (1) count(s) 1, 2, Kamil Ekim Alptekin (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3-6. (pmil, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Reset Deadlines in case as to Bijan Rafiekian re: 32 MOTION to Continue Motion to Set a September Trial Date, 29 MOTION for Bill of Particulars . Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2019 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (pmil, )
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 83 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?