Midamines Sprl Ltd. v. KBC Bank N v.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-08226

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 15, 2019 at 2:41 PM DT (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Judgment - AO450
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE of Motion by Alvin Young Lee for presentment of motion to dismiss 20 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 1/9/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Lee, Alvin) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: 1/4/2019 Unknown Document Type
          MOTION by Defendant KBC Bank NV to dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lee, Alvin)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: 12/27/2018 Amended Complaint
            AMENDED complaint by Midamines Sprl Ltd. against KBC Bank N.V. (Abbas, Hassan)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: 12/27/2018 Amended Complaint
              AMENDED complaint by Midamines Sprl Ltd. against All Defendants (Abbas, Hassan)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Presentment of Plaintiff's motion for remand 7 and motion for attorney's fees 14 are reset to 1/9/19 at 9:00 a.m. No hearing in this case will be conducted on 12/27/18. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE of Motion by Hassan Ali Abbas for presentment of motion for attorney fees 14 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 12/27/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Abbas, Hassan) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE of Motion by Hassan Ali Abbas for presentment of (Abbas, Hassan) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: 12/20/2018 Attorney Fees
                      MOTION by Plaintiff Midamines Sprl Ltd. for attorney fees under 28 USC 1447(c) relative to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand To State Court (Abbas, Hassan)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE of Motion by Alvin Young Lee for presentment of motion to consolidate cases 12 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 1/9/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Lee, Alvin) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: 12/20/2018 Consolidate Cases
                          MOTION by Defendants KBC Bank N.V., KBC Group N.V. to consolidate cases (Lee, Alvin)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE of Motion by Alvin Young Lee for presentment of motion to dismiss 10 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 1/9/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Lee, Alvin) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: 12/20/2018 Dismiss
                              MOTION by Defendants KBC Group N.V., KBC Bank N.V. to dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lee, Alvin)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendants KBC Bank N.V., KBC Group N.V. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Lee, Alvin) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE of Motion by Hassan Ali Abbas for presentment of motion to remand 7 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 12/27/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Abbas, Hassan) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: 12/18/2018 Remand*
                                    MOTION by Plaintiff Midamines Sprl Ltd. to remand to state court - Cook County, Illinois - Law Division - Case No. 2018L012435 (Hon. Diane M. Shelley) (Midamines Sprl Ltd. v KBC Bank) (Abbas, Hassan)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, ) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (sxb, ) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Attorney Appearance for Midamines Sprl Ltd. - Hassan A. Abbas by Midamines Sprl Ltd. (Abbas, Hassan) (Entered: 12/16/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            OBJECTIONS by Midamines Sprl Ltd. to notice of removal, 1 and motion for remand to state court of state court action in Cook County Law Division No. 2018L012435 (Abbas, Hassan) (Entered: 12/16/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              CIVIL Cover Sheet (Lee, Alvin) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois., case number (2018-L-012435) filed by KBC Bank N.V., KBC Group N.V. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15281251. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit State Court Documents)(Lee, Alvin) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Michael T. Mason. Case assignment: Direct assignment. (jjr, )
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?