Cisneros v. Texas Department of Criminal Justice
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-04743

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 17, 2019 at 6:30 PM DT (1.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Rodolfo Morales Cisneros, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by #01847058

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rodolfo Morales Cisneros
v.
No Logo Estelle Unit, Defendant
No Logo Prisoner Litigation Unit, Defendant
No Logo Texas Department Of Criminal Justice, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: None USCA Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: None Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: None Notice of Non-Compliance (FORM, noticing) - Civil
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: None Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal (FORM,noticing) - Civil
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: None Show Cause
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/20/2019, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: None Complaint
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Letter
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: 12/18/2018 Notice to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening (FORM, noticing)
                              NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (ltien, 4)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: 12/18/2018 case transferred in - district transfer
                                Case electronically transferred in from Utah. Case Number 2:18-cv-00931. (ltien, 4)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None DismissalCourt Filing
                                  ORDER Dismissing the case in this court and transferring action to USDC Southern District of TX. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 12/13/18 (alt) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Rodolfo Morales Cisneros. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 12/04/2018) (tlh) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?