United States v. Davitian
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-02992

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 17, 2021 at 5:17 PM ST (2.6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Joseph Martineau +1 202 307 6483 +1 202 514 6866 michael.j.martineau@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Craig Davitian, Defendant
No Logo Sherlene Davitian, Defendant
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7401
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/17/2021, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/27/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/27/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/4/2020, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/15/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: None Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: None Meet and Confer Statement
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/5/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned as to private individual or business
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/5/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned as to private individual or business
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Civil Cover Sheet (USE ONLY IF INSTRUCTED)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: 12/18/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                              COMPLAINT Complaint For Federal Taxes against All Defendants (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons - Craig Davitian, # 3 Summons Summons - Sherlene Davitian)(Martineau, Michael)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?