Cach v. Hernandez
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino, Case No. CIVDS1108589

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 18, 2018 at 4:30 PM EST (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo CACH LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sipes, Michael K. +1 866 656 7080
v.
No Logo Ricardo Rivera, Defendant
No Logo Virginia Hernandez, Defendant
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Ex Parte Application To Set Aside Judgment & Dismiss Case Filed.
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Order Vacating Judgment And Dismissing Case - Filed (imaged)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Ex Parte Re: To Set Aside Judgment And Enter Dismissal Filed By Cach Llc (imaged)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Judgment On Complaint Filed 07/14/2011 Of Cach Llc Filed
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Declaration Re: Attny Fees Filed By Cach Llc
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Declaration Re: Request For Court Judgment Under Ccp 585d Filed.
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Declaration Re: Compliance With Ccp 1033 Filed By Cach Llc
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Declaration Re: Interest Calculation Filed By Cach Llc
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Request To Enter Default Against Virginia Hernandez, Ricardo Rivera Filed.
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Blank 11 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Default Entered On Complaint Filed 07/14/2011 Of Cach Llc As To Virginia Hernandez, Ricardo Rivera.
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Dismissal Filed On Complaint Filed 07/14/2011 Of Cach Llc As To Does Only
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Blank 9 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Default Packet Received
                          Blank 8 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Vacate Oscsvc Hearing Scheduled For 02/03/12 At 08:30 In Department S33.
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Proof Of Sub-service Of Summons And Comp/pet As To Ricardo Rivera Served On 09/06/11 With Fees Of $45.00.
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Proof Of Sub-service Of Summons And Comp/pet As To Virginia Hernandez Served On 09/06/11 With Fees Of $90.00.
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Summons Issued And Filed
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Blank 4 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Declaration Re: B&p Code 6322.1 Filed By Cach Llc
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed.
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Blank 2 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Case Assigned For All Purposes To Department S33
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Case And Party Information Added
                                          Request RequestSpace

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?