Discover Bank-v-nguyen
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino, Case No. CIVDS1800596

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 18, 2018 at 8:05 PM ST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Discover Bank Discover Bank, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zwicker And Associates Pc +1 626 793 9703
v.
No Logo Tony Nguyen, Defendant
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request For Entry Of Default And Request For Clerk's/court Judgment Filed On Tony Nguyen.
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 15 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Default Entered On Complaint (limited Jurisdiction) Filed 01/12/2018 Of Discover Bank As To Tony Nguyen.
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Dismissal Filed On Complaint (limited Jurisdiction) Filed 01/12/2018 Of Discover Bank As To Does Only
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Pla Exhibits In Support Of Judgment Filed.
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Judgment On Complaint (limited Jurisdiction) Filed 01/12/2018 Of Discover Bank Filed
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 11 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Vacate Oscsvc Hearing Scheduled For 07/13/18 At 08:30 In Department S17.
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Proof Of Sub-service Of Summons And Comp/pet As To Tony Nguyen Served On 02/17/18 With Fees Of $68.00.
                Request RequestSpace
                Blank 9 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Plaintiff Discover Bank First Paper Fee Previously Paid In Full.
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Notice Imaged
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Certificate Of Assignment Received.
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Blank 6 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Prayed For Amount And/or Damages In The Amount Of $8,463.35
                        Blank 5 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Filing Fee Paid By Discover Bank For 1st App Fee
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Complaint Filed
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Summons Issued And Filed
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed.
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Blank 1 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Case Assigned For All Purposes To Department S17

                                  Space Space

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?