Palmerq v. HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-04761

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 31, 2019 at 2:46 PM DT (1.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo John William Palmer, Petitioner
v.
No Logo Assistant District Attorney Harris County, Respondent
No Logo Houston Police Department, Respondent
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: None Clerks Memo to Prisoner (FORM, noticing) - Civil
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: None Letter
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None DismissalCourt Filing
      ORDER OF ABATEMENT AND CLOSURE. Case closed on 12/21/2018 Any and all poending motions are denied as moot. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: 12/19/2018 Notice to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening (FORM, noticing)
        NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (bmendoza, 5)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (misc. case only)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (misc. case only)
            APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by John William Palmer.(bmendoza, 5) (Entered: 12/19/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights
                Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against Assistant District Attorney Harris County, HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT(J.P. Varela, Detective ), HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT(Unknown H.P.S. Officer - Bomb Squad) (Filing fee $ 400) filed by John William Palmer.(bmendoza, 5) (Entered: 12/19/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 6 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?