Clay v. TDCJ
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-04764

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 22, 2019 at 10:20 AM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Deante Clay, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deante Clay
v.
No Logo Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID, Defendant
No Logo Michael E Rutledge, Defendant
No Logo TDCJ, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: None Transfer Case (to a different court)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: None More Definite Statement
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None More Definite Statement
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Certified Mail Receipt Returned
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: 12/19/2018 Notice to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening (FORM, noticing)
                NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (rnieto, 1)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                    MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Deante Clay, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/8/2019. (Attachments: # 1 TDCJ IFP Data Sheet)(rnieto, 1) (Entered: 12/19/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights
                        Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against TDCJ, Michael E Rutledge, and Lorie Davis (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Deante Clay. (rnieto, 1) (Entered: 12/19/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 5 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?