United States v. James
Criminal Case Missouri Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:18-cr-00563

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 27, 2021 at 4:31 PM ST (3.4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (52) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/27/2021, Entered: None Memorandum and Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: None Continue
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: None Continue
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: None Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None A Notice of Compliance with Local Rule 12.07
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None SOR/PersID/Reason for AmdJgm
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None Judgment
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/18/2019, Entered: None Sentencing Letter
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: None Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: None Seal Document
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: None Presentence Investigation Report
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: None Objection to Presentence Investigation Report
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: None Sentencing Document (by Government)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: None Acceptance to Presentence Investigation Report
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: None Warrant Returned Executed
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: None Order (rule motion and set or satisfy schedule)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/6/2019, Entered: None Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec & Stip Supplement
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/6/2019, Entered: None Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec & Stip
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/6/2019, Entered: None Waiver of Indictment
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/6/2019, Entered: None Superseding Information
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: None Order (rule motion and set or satisfy schedule)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: None Order (rule motion and set or satisfy schedule)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: None Warrant Returned Executed
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: None Order (rule motion and set or satisfy schedule)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: None Rule 5 Papers
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/18/2019, Entered: None Order Cancelling Deadline
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None Order to Continue per 18:3161 - Ends of Justice (Speedy Trial Order)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None Continue
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/11/2019, Entered: None Order (rule motion and set or satisfy schedule)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: None Order Regarding Pretrial Motion Status
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: None Waiver of Filing Pretrial Motions
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: None Continue
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Continue
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Continue
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Disclosure of Arguably Suppressible Evidence
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Request for Discovery
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Response to Discovery
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Order Concerning Pretrial Motions
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None warrant returned executed
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Request for Discovery
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None order setting conditions of release
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None bond
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Order Appointing Public Defender
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Rule 5 Papers
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Financial Affidavit (CJA 23)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None A Docket Text Order with Schedules
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Bond Hearing
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Bond Hearing
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None initial appearance
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                           
                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                          Need Password Help?