Zasloff v. Janssen Research & Development LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-14075

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 8, 2020 at 1:02 PM DT (7.4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Howard Zasloff, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Burns Charest - New Orleans

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED WARREN T BURNS +1 469 904 4551 +1 469 444 5002 wburns@burnscharest.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Henry Charest , +1 469 904 4550 +1 469 444 5002 dcharest@burnscharest.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amanda K. Klevorn +1 504 799 2845 aklevorn@burnscharest.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Spencer Morgan Lee Cox +1 469 904 4550 +1 469 444 5002 scox@burnscharest.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Korey Arthur Nelson +1 504 799 2845 knelson@burnscharest.com
v.
No Logo Bayer AG, Defendant
Bayer Corporation Bayer Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Bayer Healthcare AG, Defendant
Bayer Healthcare LLC Bayer Healthcare LLC, Defendant
No Logo Bayer Heathcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bayer Pharma AG, Defendant
No Logo Janssen Ortho, LLC, Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON Company JOHNSON & JOHNSON Company, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: 1/10/2019 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    PRETRIAL ORDERS #1 - #31. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon.(ADI)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: 1/8/2019 Unknown Document Type
      Summons Issued as to Bayer Heathcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Pharma AG. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(ss)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: 12/20/2018 Complaint
          COMPLAINT with jury demand against Bayer AG, Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare AG, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Heathcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7317317) filed by Howard Zasloff. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals LLC, # 3 Summons Bayer Pharma AG)Attorney Amanda K. Klevorn added to party Howard Zasloff(pty:pla).(Klevorn, Amanda)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Initial Case Assignment
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 8 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?