Lando v. New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Northern District Court, Case No. 9:18-cv-01472

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 31, 2021 at 2:27 PM DT (1.2 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Timothy E. Lando, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by 06-A-5781

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy E. Lando, Jr.
v.
No Logo Anthony J. Annucci, Defendant
No Logo Brian Reed, Defendant
No Logo Division of Parole, Defendant
No Logo Jason Rhodes, Defendant
No Logo Jay Moss, Defendant
No Logo Kenneth Gilbert, Defendant
No Logo Kenneth Palmer, Defendant
No Logo Margaret Montfort-Balfour, Defendant
No Logo New York State Department Of Corrections And Community Supervision, Defendant
No Logo Steven A. Claudio, Defendant
No Logo Tammy Gronau, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Scheduling Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: None Order on Report and Recommendations
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None Appoint Counsel
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/9/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: None Appoint Counsel
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: None Letter Request/Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/22/2020, Entered: None Letter Request/Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/16/2020, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: None Letter Request/Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/11/2020, Entered: None Order on Report and Recommendations
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: None Letter Request/Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: None Letter Request/Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: None Letter Request/Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: None Letter Request/Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: None Letter Request/Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: None Letter Request/Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None Appoint Counsel
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE: This action was administratively closed due to plaintiff's failure to comply with the filing fee requirements, and plaintiff was directed to respond to the Order if s/he wished to pursue this action. Plaintiff has now responded. The Clerk is directed to reopen this action and restore it to the Court's active docket. Authorized by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 12/26/18. {text order served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas, ) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM by Timothy E. Lando, Jr. (nas, ) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: 12/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                        MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Timothy E. Lando, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 cover letter; envelope) (nas, )
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: 12/21/2018 Order directing administrative closureCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement: ORDERED that because this action was not properly commenced, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this action. ORDERED that if plaintiff desires to pursue this action, he must so notify the Court WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS of the filing date of this Order and either (1) pay the full $400.00 filing fee for civil actions or (2) submit a completed and signed IFP Application that has been certified by an appropriate official at his facility and a signed Inmate Authorization Form. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 12/21/18. {order and blank forms served via regular mail on plaintiff|(nas, )
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: 12/20/2018 Complaint
                                                            COMPLAINT against Anthony J. Annucci, Steven A. Claudio, Division of Parole, Kenneth Gilbert, Tammy Gronau, Margaret Montfort-Balfour, Jay Moss, New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision, Kenneth Palmer, Brian Reed, Jason Rhodes filed by Timothy E. Lando, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 cover letter; civil cover sheet, # 2 envelope)(nas, )
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?