United States v. Buljan
Criminal Case California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cr-00606

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 7, 2021 at 3:47 PM DT (1.7 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Ross E Weingarten +1 415 437 6747 Ross.Weingarten@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Christopher David Buljan, Defendant

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (48) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release from Custody
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Support
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Support
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/17/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/17/2021, Entered: None Release from Custody
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/30/2020, Entered: None Status Conference
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None Judgment
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: None Sentencing
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None PS8
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: None Sentencing Memorandum
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: None Sentencing Memorandum
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/28/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: None Plea Agreement
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: None Change of Plea Hearing
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/23/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/8/2019, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/20/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Order Setting Conditions of Release
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Financial Affidavit (CJA 23)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Detention Hearing
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Arraignment
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim: Initial Appearance as to Christopher David Buljan held on 12/20/2018, attorney Elizabeth Falk specially appear. Defendant remanded to custody. Arraignment set for 12/21/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Attorney Appointment Hearing set for 12/21/2018 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Status Conference re detention set for 12/21/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Government motion to unseal case granted.FTR Time 11:12-11:17. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2018) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            Order to Seal Case as to Christopher David Buljan. A copy of indictment and arrest warrant shall be provided to FBI, other law enforcement, employees of U.S. Attorney's Office. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 12/18/18. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2018) (lskS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/18/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              INDICTMENT as to Christopher David Buljan (1) count(s) 1, 2. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2018) (lskS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/20/2018: # 1 cover sheet) (lskS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/18/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                   
                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                  Need Password Help?