JOHNSON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-03062

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 14, 2021 at 12:26 PM DT (3.3 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DUANE JOSEPH JOHNSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by R09202-007

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DUANE JOSEPH JOHNSON
v.
No Logo BARRY FREUNDELL, Defendant
No Logo JANE DOES 1-25, Defendant
No Logo JIMMIE ALLEN, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOES 1-25, Defendant
No Logo SAMUEL WHITTAKER, Defendant
No Logo DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, 2255

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Leeson Sroka +1 202 252 7113 +1 202 514 9155 scott.sroka@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, 2255
Officially listed as "U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Leeson Sroka +1 202 252 7113 +1 202 514 9155 scott.sroka@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: None Mail Returned
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None Withdraw
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: None Withdraw
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/3/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/26/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/26/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/27/2021, Entered: None Entry of Default
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/31/2020, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: None Entry of Default
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/4/2020, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to DC Government Defendant
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to DC Attorney General
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to Mayor for DC
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/15/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/17/2019, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/14/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/29/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Notice to Counsel/Party
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: 12/21/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL from SUPERIOR COURT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, case number 2018 CA 008108 B filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Sroka, Scott)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?