United States v. Martinez-Castillo
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cr-00910

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 18, 2019 at 12:55 PM DT (2.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kyle Adam Wirshba +1 212 637 2493 kyle.wirshba@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Darwin Alexander Martinez-Castillo, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by FEDERAL DEFENDERS OF THE MD GA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Annalisa Miron +1 212 417 8700 +1 212 517 0392 annalisa_miron@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None Judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: None Letter - Sentencing
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/6/2019, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/6/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None Letter
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Letter Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: 12/21/2018 indictment
                              INDICTMENT FILED as to Darwin Alexander Martinez-Castillo (1) count(s) 1. (jm)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ORDER FOR MEDICAL TREATMENT as to Darwin Alexander Martinez-Castillo.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 12/12/2018)(dif) [1:18-mj-09463-UA] (Entered: 12/13/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott: Initial Appearance as to Darwin Alexander Martinez-Castillo held on 12/12/2018., Deft Appears with Federal Defender Annalisa Miron with spanish interpreter and AUSA Kyle Wirshba for the government. Detention on Consent w/o Prejudice; ( Preliminary Hearing set for 12/26/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Unassigned.) (dif) [1:18-mj-09463-UA] (Entered: 12/13/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Darwin Alexander Martinez-Castillo. Annalisa Miron for Darwin Alexander Martinez-Castillo appointed.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 12/12/2018)(dif) [1:18-mj-09463-UA] (Entered: 12/13/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Darwin Alexander Martinez-Castillo. (Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge James L. Cott) (Federal Defender Annalisa Miron Appointed) (dif) [1:18-mj-09463-UA] (Entered: 12/13/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        COMPLAINT as to Darwin Alexander Martinez-Castillo (1). In Violation of 8 U.S.C. 1326 (a) & (b) (1) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger) (dif) [1:18-mj-09463-UA] (Entered: 12/13/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Case Designated ECF as to Darwin Alexander Martinez-Castillo. (jm)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 12/12/2018 as to Darwin Alexander Martinez-Castillo. (dif) [1:18-mj-09463-UA]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Arrest of Darwin Alexander Martinez-Castillo. (dif) [1:18-mj-09463-UA]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Sealed Legal Document  Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                SEALED ORAL ORDER as to Sealed Defendant 1. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 11/7/2018)(dif) [1:18-mj-09463-UA]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?