Stephen v. Palestine Police Department
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:18-cv-00652

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 25, 2020 at 5:28 PM DT (8.6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jonathan Dewayne Stephen, Jr, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Anderson County Jail

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Dewayne Stephen, Jr
v.
No Logo FNU Rodriguez, Defendant
No Logo Palestine Police Department, Defendant
No Logo Unknown Officers, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: None Reconsideration
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None Judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: None Acknowledgment of Receipt
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/14/2019, Entered: None Witness List
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/14/2019, Entered: None Exhibit
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/6/2019, Entered: None Witness List
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/6/2019, Entered: None Exhibit
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/22/2019, Entered: None Acknowledgment of Receipt
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/17/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/15/2019, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/15/2019, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/15/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/18/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/18/2019, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/18/2019, Entered: None Acknowledgment of Receipt
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/30/2019, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/23/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/19/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None Appoint Counsel
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: None Answer
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None Answer
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/5/2019, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Acknowledgment of Receipt
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: 1/10/2019 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER FOR SERVICE AND SUMMONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 1/10/2019. (rlf)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: 1/10/2019 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER Re Collection and Payment of Full Filing Fee: Plaintiff to pay remaining balance of initial partial filing fee. The agency having custody of the Plaintiff shall deduct 20% of each deposit made to the Plaintiff's inmate trust account and forward payments to the Court on a regular basis. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 1/10/2019. (rlf)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: 12/26/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER for Initial Partial Filing Fee of $2.15 within 30 days from receipt of Order, granting motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Dkt. # 3 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 12/26/2018. (rlf)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: 12/21/2018 Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with account report by Jonathan Dewayne Stephen, Jr. (mjc, )
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: 12/21/2018 case referred to magistrate judgeCourt Filing
                                                                                CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. (mjc, )
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: 12/21/2018 Complaint
                                                                                  COMPLAINT against Palestine Police Department, FNU Rodriguez, Unknown Officers, filed by Jonathan Dewayne Stephen, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mjc, )
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Partial Filing fee paid per court order: $ 2.15, receipt number TXE 6-45358. (rlf)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Notice of Magistrate Availability
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. Consent form mailed to Plaintiff. (mjc, )
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                        This case has been viewed 10 times.

                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                        Space
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                         
                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                        Need Password Help?