BILIOVSCHI SMITH v. POMPEO
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-03065

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 20, 2020 at 2:30 PM ST (6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MIHAELA BILIOVSCHI SMITH, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KATOR, PARKS & WEISER, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Juliette Markham Niehuss +1 202 898 4800 jniehuss@katorparks.com
v.
Pompeo, Michael Richard Pompeo, Michael Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "MICHAEL RICHARD POMPEO"
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/21/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/21/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/21/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/21/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/21/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/19/2020, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: None Large Additional Attachment(s)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: None Large Additional Attachment(s)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: None Large Additional Attachment(s)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/23/2020, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/16/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/16/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/16/2020, Entered: None Withdrawal of Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/10/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/7/2020, Entered: None Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/22/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: None Meet and Confer Statement
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/8/2019, Entered: None Answer
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: 12/21/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                        COMPLAINT against MICHAEL RICHARD POMPEO with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5854281) filed by MIHAELA BILIOVSCHI SMITH. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for Michael Richard Pompeo, Secretary, Department of State, # 3 Summons for USAO Civil Process Clerk, # 4 Summons for Acting Attorney General Matthew G. Whitaker)(Niehuss, Juliette)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?