Ohr v. International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-08414

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 13, 2020 at 11:17 AM ST (1.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by International Union of Operating Engineers

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melinda S Hensel +1 708 579 6663 +1 708 588 1647 mhensel@local150.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles R Kiser +1 708 579 6663 +1 708 588 1647 ckiser@local150.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert A Paszta +1 708 579 6663 rpaszta@local150.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Dale D. Pierson +1 708 579 6663 +1 708 588 1647 dpierson@local150.org
No Logo National Labor Relations Board, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Peter Robb, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Peter Sung Ohr, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by National Labor Relations Board

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Mark McCormick +1 312 353 7594 kevin.mccormick@nlrb.gov
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 790 - Labor: Other
  Entries (52) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/5/2019, Entered: None order on motion to set a briefing schedule
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/2/2019, Entered: None Briefing Schedule
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Quash
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/15/2019, Entered: None memorandum opinion and order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/15/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: None Quash
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: None Quash
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: None Quash
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/20/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Discovery
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: None Discovery
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo:Plaintiff's motion to try petition for preliminary injunction under Section 10(I) of the National Labor Relations Act on basis of the administrative law judge's hearing transcripts and exhibits 13, 14 is entered and continued to 1/30/2019 at 9:45 a.m. The status hearing is reset to 1/30/2019 at 9:45 a.m. The motion hearing and status hearing set for 1/23/2019 are stricken. (rao, ) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    CERTIFICATE of Service Local 150's Supplemental Responses to Mandatory Initial Disclosures by Dale D. Pierson on behalf of International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO (Pierson, Dale) (Entered: 01/15/2019)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      CERTIFICATE of Service Local 150's Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery by Dale D. Pierson on behalf of International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO (Pierson, Dale) (Entered: 01/14/2019)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) Notice of Service Initial Response MIDP, filed by Petitioner Peter Sung Ohr. (McCormick, Kevin) (Entered: 01/14/2019)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: 1/10/2019 Unknown Document Type
                                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo: Status hearing held on 1/10/2019 and continued to 1/23/2019 at 9:45 a.m. The parties are directed to proceed with the ALJ hearing on 1/16/2019. The parties are directed to make their initial disclosures by 1/14/2019. The Court will not allow discovery prior to the 1/16/2019 hearing. Petitioner's motion to try petition for preliminary injunction under Section 10(I) of the National Labor Relations Act on basis of the administrative law judge's hearing transcripts and exhibits 13, 14 is entered and continued to 1/23/2019 at 9:45 a.m. (rao, )
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 1/10/19 before the Honorable Ruben Castillo. Order Number: 33356. Court Reporter Contact Information: Kathleen_Fennell@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 1/31/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/11/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/10/2019. (Fennell, Kathleen) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Joint Status Report, filed by Petitioner Peter Sung Ohr. (McCormick, Kevin) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                RESPONSE by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIOin Opposition to MOTION by Petitioner Peter Sung OhrTo Try Petition for Preliminary Injunction for 10(l) on Administrative Law Judge's Transcripts and Exhibits 13, MOTION by Petitioner Peter Sung OhrTo Try Petition for Preliminary Injunction for 10(l) on Administrative Law Judge's Transcripts and Exhibits Brief in Support of Motion 14 (Pierson, Dale) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: 1/8/2019 Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Respondent/Counter-Plaintiff's ANSWER to Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM filed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO against Peter Sung Ohr, Peter Robb, National Labor Relations Board . by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO(Pierson, Dale)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    REPLY by Petitioner Peter Sung Ohr to complaint 1 Reply in Further Support of Petition for Preliminary Injunction Under Section 10(l) of the National Labor Relations Act (McCormick, Kevin) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by Kevin Mark McCormick for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 14, motion for miscellaneous relief 13 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 1/10/2019 at 10:00 AM. (McCormick, Kevin) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: 1/4/2019 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        MOTION by Petitioner Peter Sung OhrTo Try Petition for Preliminary Injunction for 10(l) on Administrative Law Judge's Transcripts and Exhibits Brief in Support of Motion (McCormick, Kevin)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: 1/4/2019 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          MOTION by Petitioner Peter Sung OhrTo Try Petition for Preliminary Injunction for 10(l) on Administrative Law Judge's Transcripts and Exhibits (McCormick, Kevin)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/31/2018, Entered: 12/31/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Amended Petition for Preliminary Injunction Under Section 10(l) of the National Labor Relations Act AMENDED complaint by Peter Sung Ohr against Peter Sung Ohr (McCormick, Kevin)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo:The status hearing set for 1/10/2019 will begin at 10:00 a.m. (Time change only) (rao, ) (Entered: 12/28/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo: Petitioner is given until 1/9/2019 to file a reply in further support of its Petition for Preliminary Injunction Under Section 10(I) of the National Labor Relations Act 1 . The parties are directed to file by 1/9/2019 a joint status report pursuant to this Court's standing order, indicating whether discovery is necessary and in what format, and the parties' positions on the nature and length of any anticipated evidentiary hearing. The Court will hold a status hearing in open court on 1/10/2019 at 9:45 a.m. (rao, ) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jh, ) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO by Robert A Paszta (Paszta, Robert) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO by Charles R Kiser (Kiser, Charles) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO by Melinda S. Hensel (Hensel, Melinda) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO by Dale D. Pierson (Pierson, Dale) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            RESPONSE by Respondent International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO to complaint 1 [in Opposition to Petition for Injunctive Relief] (Pierson, Dale) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff National Labor Relations Board by Kevin Mark McCormick (McCormick, Kevin) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                CIVIL Cover Sheet (McCormick, Kevin) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: 12/21/2018 Complaint
                                                                                                  COMPLAINT Petition for Preliminary Injunction under Section 10(l) of the National Labor Relations Act filed by National Labor Relations Board; (McCormick, Kevin)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    SUMMONS Issued as to Counter Defendants National Labor Relations Board, Peter Robb (daj, )
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      SUMMONS Issued as to Respondent International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO (jjr, )
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ruben Castillo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 24 times.

                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                           
                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                          Need Password Help?