Eric Murillo v. U-haul Co
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino, Case No. CIVDS1708544

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 22, 2018 at 4:35 AM ST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Eric Murillo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dordick Law Corporation
v.
No Logo U-haul Co. Of Arizona, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alston + Bird +1 213 576 1000
No Logo U-haul Co. Of Arizona, Inc, Defendant
No Logo U-haul Co. Of California, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alston + Bird +1 213 576 1000
No Logo U-haul Co. Of California, Inc, Defendant
No Logo U-haul Moving & Storage Of Downtown San, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alston + Bird +1 213 576 1000
  Entries (45) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Defendants U-haul Co. Of Arizona & California Sta Tus Conference Report Filed.
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Declaration Re: Thomas Mitchell In Support Of Response Filed By U-haul Co. Of Arizona, U-haul Co. Of California
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Declaration Re: Crisytn Chadwick In Support Of Response Filed By U-haul Co. Of Arizona, U-haul Co. Of California
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Reply To Supplemental Opposition To Motion Re: To Compel Set For Hearing On 02/20/18 Filed By U-haul Co. Of Arizona, U-haul Co. Of California. (imaged)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Opposition To Motion Re: To Compel Arbitration; Memo P&as In Opposition Set For Hearing On 02/20/18, Filed By Plaintiff Eric Murillo (imaged)
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 40 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Reporter's Transcript Re: Oral Proceedings 12/12/17 Filed
              Blank 39 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Fee Payment
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Proof Of Service Of Mtn To Compel, (2) Decs & Order By Personal . On 11/15/17 As To Dordick Law, Avrek Law Firm, Filed.
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Reply To // In Support Of // To Motion Re: To Compel Arbitration & Req For Order Staying... Set For Hearing On 12/12/17 Filed By U-haul Co. Of Arizona, U-haul Co. Of California. (imaged)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Evidentiary Objections To Declaration Of Jeanette Cabrera Filed.
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Response To Plas Evidentiary Objections To Declarations And Attached Exhibits Filed.
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Blank 34 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Filing Fee Paid By U-haul Co. Of Arizona, U-haul Co. Of California For Fax Fees
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          [proposed] Order Re: Plaintiffs Evidentiary Objections To Decs & Attached Exhibits... Filed.
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Plaintiffs Evidentiary Objections To Decs & Attached Exhibits Of T. Mitchell... Filed.
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Opposition To Motion Re: To Compel Arbitration/ & Order Staying Action Set For Hearing On 12/12/17, Filed By Plaintiff Eric Murillo (imaged)
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Opposition To Motion Re: Ex Parte Appl Set For Hearing On 11/22/17, Filed By Defendant U-haul Co. Of Arizona, U-haul Co. Of California (imaged)
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Opposition To Motion Re: Exparte Application To Continue Motion Set For Hearing On 11/22/17, Filed By Defendant U-haul Moving & Storage Of Downtown San, U-haul Co. Of Arizona (imaged)
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Declaration Of Torres In Response To Osc Filed
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Ex Parte Order Continuing Motion To Compel Arbitration... Filed.
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Blank 26 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Filing Fee Paid By Eric Murillo For Ex Parte
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Declaration Re: Andy Smith In Support Of Motion Filed By U-haul Co. Of Arizona, U-haul Co. Of California
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Proof Of Service Of Motion To Compel By Personal Service On 11/15/17 As To Avrek Law Firm, Filed.
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Declaration Re: Thomas Mitchell In Support Of Motion Filed By U-haul Co. Of Arizona, U-haul Co. Of California
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Blank 22 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Filing Fee Paid By U-haul Co. Of Arizona, U-haul Co. Of California For Motion
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Motion Re: To Compel Arbitration Set For Hearing On 12/12/17, Filed By Defendant U-haul Co. Of Arizona, U-haul Co. Of California (imaged)
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Answer Filed By U-haul Moving & Storage Of Downtown San, U-haul Co. Of Arizona, U-haul Co. Of California; Party Represented By Alston & Bird Llp.
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Filing Fee Paid By U-haul Moving & Storage Of Downtown San, U-haul Co. Of Arizona, U-haul Co. Of California For First Appearance Fees
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Notice Of Return Of Document(s)
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Answer Is Returned By Court For The Following Reason(s): Answer Indicates 3 Parties, But Atty Office Only Says Answering For 2 Parties/paying For 2.
                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            On Complaint (unlimited) Filed 05/04/2017 Of Eric Murillo, U-haul Co. Of California, Inc, U-haul Co. Of Arizona, Inc Removed As A Party.
                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              On Complaint (unlimited) Filed 05/04/2017 Of Eric Murillo, U-haul Co. Of Arizona, Inc Removed As A Party.
                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                On The Complaint (unlimited) Filed 05/04/2017 Of Eric Murillo, U-haul Co. Of Arizona, U-haul Co. Of California Is Added As A Defendants.
                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Proof Of Service Of Summons Is Returned By Court For The Following Reason(s): Duplicate Filing. Document Already Filed On 06/27/17. See Attached.
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Notice Of Return Of Document(s)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Proof Of Service Of Summons And Comp/pet On U-haul Co. Of Arizona, Inc; Defendant/respondent Served On 06/14/17 With Costs Of $195.00 Filed.
                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Proof Of Sub-service Of Summons And Comp/pet As To U-haul Moving & Storage Of Downtown San Served On 06/13/17 With Fees Of $130.00.
                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Proof Of Service Of Summons And Comp/pet On U-haul Co. Of California, Inc; Defendant/respondent Served On 06/08/17 With Costs Of $87.00 Filed.
                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Demand For Jury Trial Filed By Eric Murillo
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Notice Imaged
                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Certificate Of Assignment Received.
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Plaintiff Eric Murillo First Paper Fee Previously Paid In Full.
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Summons Issued And Filed
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed.
                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Case Assigned For All Purposes To Department S29
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Complaint And Party Information Entered
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace

                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                            This case has been viewed 181 times.

                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                            Space
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                             
                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                            Need Password Help?