Ford Motor v. Torres
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Riverside, Case No. RIC402217

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 22, 2018 at 11:58 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ford Motor Credit Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Myers & Ehrlich, Ltd. +1 949 756 8114
v.
No Logo Willie C Torres, Defendant
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Renewal Of Judgment Issued And Filed.
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 24 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Note: Proof Of Service Required Before Issuance Ofwrit/abstract (issue 30 Days After Service)
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Memorandum Of Credits Of $0.00.
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 22 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        --and Accrued Interest Of $4,131.92 And Costs After Judgment In The Sum Of $0.00 Filed.
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Application For And Renewal Of Judgment Filed. Total Renewed Judgment Amount $8,414.90. Original Judgment Entered On 08/05/04.
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Writ Of Execution Returned; Riverside County
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 19 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Paper Records Destroyed/digitally Archived. Paper Documents/file Destroyed In Accordance With Administrative Policy/records Management A.10.400.1, Paper Records Retention And Destruction Schedule.
                Blank 18 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Writ Of Execution Issued; Riverside County
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Memorandum Of Credits Of $0.00.
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Blank 16 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    --and Accrued Interest Of $2,318.84 And Costs After Judgment In The Sum Of $0.00 Filed.
                      Blank 15 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Abstract Of Judgment Issued
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/5/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Judgment By Default By Court Filed 08/05/04
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/5/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Declaration Of Use Of Imaged Documents In Lieu Of Originals Filed
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Blank 12 Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Default Judgment Rec'd & Forwd To Dept. Legal Research
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Case Management Statement Filed By Ford Motor Credit Company
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Blank 10 Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Default Judgment Rec'd & Forwd To Dept. Legal Research
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Original Summons On Complaint Filed 01/01/2003 Of Ford Motor Credit Company Returned And Filed.
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Request For Dismissal Of Does/roes On The Complaint Filed 01/01/2003 Of Ford Motor Credit Company Filed.
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Request For Entry Of Default And Court Judgment On The Complaint Filed 01/01/2003 Of Ford Motor Credit Company As To Willie C Torres Filed.
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Declaration In Lieu Of Testimony Pursuant To Ccp 585 Filed.
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/20/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Proof Of Service (sub-served And Mailed) On Complaint Filed 01/01/2003 Of Ford Motor Credit Company As To Willie C Torres; Mailing Date Of 11/17/03 Filed.
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Blank 4 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Non Proof Of Service Hearing Set For 1/23/04 At 8:00 In Dept Clerk
                                              Blank 3 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Directly Assigned To Department 03 For All Purposes
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Certificate Of Counsel Filed.
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Limited Civil - General Civil Complaint Under $10,000 Filed. Summons Issued.
                                                    Request RequestSpace

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?