Vincent v. Municipal Software

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Riverside, Case No. RIC402465
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 23, 2018 at 12:04 AM EST (6.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Kevin W Vincent, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Johnson And Associates +1 310 792 1435
v.
No Logo Municipal Softwarecorp, Defendant
No Logo Municipal Softwareusa Inc, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dorsey & Whitney Llp +1 714 800 1400
No Logo Robert Bennett, Defendant
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Mail Returned By Post Office; Returned; Reason - To Sender, As To Insufficient Address.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 10 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Nt Of Removal To Federal Court Rec'd & Forwd To Dept. 11
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Removal To Federal Court By Municipal Softwareusa Inc
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Defenses And Affirmative Defenses Of Def Municipal Software Us Inc To Complaint
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
General Denial To Complaint Filed 10/29/2003 Of Kevin Vincent By Municipal Softwareusa Inc Represented By Dorsey & Whitney Llp Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Filed: Statement Reserving Right To Seek Punitive Damages
Request RequestSpace
Blank 5 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons Issued On Complaint Filed 10/29/2003 Of Kevin Vincent
Request RequestSpace
Blank 4 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Non Proof Of Service Hearing Set For 1/29/04 At 8:00 In Dept Clerk
Request RequestSpace
Blank 3 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Directly Assigned To Department 11 For All Purposes
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Certificate Of Counsel Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Complaint Filed Fast Track - Summons Issued.
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 0 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?