DIRECTV, LLC v. Wright
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Western District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-00474-FPG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 23, 2018 at 11:33 PM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECISION AND ORDER: Defendant Theresa Wright's Motion for an Extension of Time to Find an Attorney 34 is DENIED. SO ORDERED. A Copy of this NEF and Decision and Order have been mailed to the pro se Defendants. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 10/5/2017. (AFM)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    DECISION AND ORDER: Paul Wright's motions to dismiss 30 25 are both DENIED. Paul Wright is directed to file an answer to the complaint on or before July 31, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 06/29/2017. A copy of this decision and order (along with NEF) has been sent via US Mail to Paul Wright at his address of record. (ZS)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ORDER. Theresa Wright's motion to dismiss 12 is DENIED. Paul Wright's motion to dismiss 13 is DENIED in part. The Court requests further briefing on the 18 U.S.C. § 2511 claim and the tort claims in accordance with the discussion in Part II.D and Part II.F. DirecTV's brief is due within 30 days of the date of this Order, and Paul Wright may submit a response within 30 days of the day in which DirecTV submits its brief. The supplemental briefs shall not exceed 25 pages. For now, the Court reserves judgment on whether to dismiss the § 2511 claim and the tort claims. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 6/3/16. (BD)
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 0 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?