Pioneer Financial Llc v. Denna
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Riverside, Case No. RIC409238

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 23, 2018 at 2:59 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pioneer Financial LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nelson & Kennard
v.
No Logo Christina Denna, Defendant
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Paper Records Destroyed/digitally Archived. Paper Documents/file Destroyed In Accordance With Administrative Policy/records Management A.10.400.1, Paper Records Retention And Destruction Schedule.
    Blank 13 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Copies Made
      Blank 12 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Copies Made
        Blank 11 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Abstract Of Judgment Issued
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Judgment By Default By Clerk Filed 06/23/04
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Original Summons On Complaint Filed 03/18/2004 Of Pioneer Financial Llc Returned And Filed.
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Request For Entry Of Default And Clerk's Judgment On The Complaint Filed 03/18/2004 Of Pioneer Financial Llc As To Christina Denna Filed.
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Declaration Of Re Unavail Of Org Instr/comp Of Interest Filed
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Request For Dismissal Of Does/roes On The Complaint Filed 03/18/2004 Of Pioneer Financial Llc Filed.
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Proof Of Service On The Complaint Filed 03/18/2004 Of Pioneer Financial Llc Served On Christina Denna With Service Date Of 04/19/04 Filed.(personal Service)
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Blank 4 Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Non Proof Of Service Hearing Set For 6/01/04 At 8:00 In Dept Clerk
                        Blank 3 Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Directly Assigned To Department 01 For All Purposes
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Certificate Of Counsel Filed.
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Limited Civil - General Civil Complaint Under $10,000 Filed. Summons Issued.
                              Request RequestSpace

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 0 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?