Pioneer Financial v. Scheinrock
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Riverside, Case No. RIC409544

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 23, 2018 at 3:06 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pioneer Financial LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nelson & Kennard
v.
No Logo Aliscia M Scheinrock, Defendant
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 51 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Writ Of Execution Issued; Los Angeles County
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Memorandum Of Credits Of $0.00.
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 49 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      --and Accrued Interest Of $1,540.20 And Costs After Judgment In The Sum Of $0.00 Filed.
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Notice Of Change Of Address Of Attorney For Pioneer Financial Llc By Pioneer Financial Llc. Filed.
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 47 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Abstract Of Judgment Issued
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Proof Of Service By Mail Of Notice/application For & Renewal Of Judgment On Aliscia M Scheinrock With A Mailing Date Of 08/13/14 Filed. (non-complaint)
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed.
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Memorandum Of Credits Of $822.93.
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 43 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  --and Accrued Interest Of $2,118.10 And Costs After Judgment In The Sum Of $225.00 Filed.
                    Blank 42 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Note: Proof Of Service Required Before Issuance Ofwrit/abstract (issue 30 Days After Service)
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Application For And Renewal Of Judgment Filed. Total Renewed Judgment Amount $3,737.07. Original Judgment Entered On 09/09/04.
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Notice Of Renewal Of Judgment Issued And Filed.
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Blank 39 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          On Complaint Filed 03/25/2004 Of Pioneer Financial Llc. As To Pioneer Financial Llc. Change Attorney Robert Scott Kennard To Attorney Nelson & Kennard.
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Final Return To Court - Writ Of Execution As To Riverside County Unsatisfied Filed.
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Blank 37 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Writ Of Execution Issued; Riverside County
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Memorandum Of Credits Of $822.93.
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Blank 35 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  --and Accrued Interest Of $1,216.47 And Costs After Judgment In The Sum Of $165.00 Filed.
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Final Return To Court - Writ Of Execution As To Riverside County Unsatisfied Filed.
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Blank 33 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Writ Of Execution Issued; Riverside County
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Memorandum Of Credits Of $810.02.
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Blank 31 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          --and Accrued Interest Of $1,120.00 And Costs After Judgment In The Sum Of $105.00 Filed.
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/25/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Return On Attachment/execution
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Blank 29 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Writ Of Execution Issued; Los Angeles County
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Memorandum Of Credits Of $7.30.
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  --and Accrued Interest Of $1,542.08 And Costs After Judgment In The Sum Of $80.00 Filed.
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Writ Of Execution Returned As To Sac County; Unsatisfied Filed.
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Writ Of Execution Issued; La County
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Memorandum Of Credits Of $0.00.
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          --and Accrued Interest Of $1,303.31 And Costs After Judgment In The Sum Of $23.00 Filed.
                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Paper Records Destroyed/digitally Archived. Paper Documents/file Destroyed In Accordance With Administrative Policy/records Management A.10.400.1, Paper Records Retention And Destruction Schedule.
                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Abstract Of Judgment Issued
                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Writ Of Execution Issued; Sac County
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Memorandum Of Credits Of $0.00.
                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    --and Accrued Interest Of $585.28 And Costs After Judgment In The Sum Of $23.00 Filed.
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Notice Of Change Of Address By Pioneer Financial Llc. Filed.
                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Abstract Of Judgment Issued
                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Abstract Of Judgment Issued
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Case Management Statement Filed By Pioneer Financial Llc.
                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Judgment By Default By Clerk Filed 09/09/04
                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Original Summons On Complaint Filed 03/25/2004 Of Pioneer Financial Llc. Returned And Filed.
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Request For Dismissal Of Does/roes On The Complaint Filed 03/25/2004 Of Pioneer Financial Llc. Filed.
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Request For Entry Of Default And Clerk's Judgment On The Complaint Filed 03/25/2004 Of Pioneer Financial Llc. As To Aliscia M Scheinrock Filed.
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Declaration Of Unavailability Of Orig Instrument; Computation Of Interest; Ccp 1033 And Cc 1717 Filed
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        Stipulation And Order For Appointment Of Judge Pro Tem.
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Proof Of Service (sub-served And Mailed) On Complaint Filed 03/25/2004 Of Pioneer Financial Llc. As To Aliscia M Scheinrock; Mailing Date Of 07/20/04 Filed.
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/13/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Attempted Service Of Summons & Complaint On Aliscia M Scheinrock Filed
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/13/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Attempted Service Of Summons & Complaint On Aliscia M Scheinrock Filed
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Non Proof Of Service Hearing Set For 6/04/04 At 8:00 In Dept Clerk
                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Directly Assigned To Department 02 For All Purposes
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Certificate Of Counsel Filed.
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      Limited Civil - General Civil Complaint Under $10,000 Filed. Summons Issued.
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?