Pioneer v. Hanson
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Riverside, Case No. RIC409552

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 23, 2018 at 3:07 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pioneer Financial LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nelson & Kennard
v.
No Logo Patricia Hanson, Defendant
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 21 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Paper Records Destroyed/digitally Archived. Paper Documents/file Destroyed In Accordance With Administrative Policy/records Management A.10.400.1, Paper Records Retention And Destruction Schedule.
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Writ Of Execution Returned As To Sacramento County; Unsatisfied Filed.
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Writ Of Execution Returned; Unsatisfied/san Diego County
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/10/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Acknowledgment Of Full Satisfaction Of Judgment For Judgment Debtor, Patricia Hanson Filed.
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 17 Filed: 3/18/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Writ Of Execution Issued; Sacramento County
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Memorandum Of Credits Of $0.00.
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 15 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              --and Accrued Interest Of $186.09 And Costs After Judgment In The Sum Of $25.00 Filed.
                Blank 14 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Abstract Of Judgment Issued
                  Blank 13 Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  --and Accrued Interest Of $153.27 And Costs After Judgment In The Sum Of $25.00 Filed.
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Memorandum Of Credits Of $0.00.
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Blank 11 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Abstract Of Judgment Issued
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Request For Dismissal Of Does/roes On The Complaint Filed 03/25/2004 Of Pioneer Financial Llc Filed.
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Declaration Of Re Unavail Of Orig/comput Of Interest Filed
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Request For Entry Of Default And Clerk's Judgment On The Complaint Filed 03/25/2004 Of Pioneer Financial Llc As To Patricia Hanson Filed.
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Judgment By Default By Clerk Filed 06/23/04
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Original Summons On Complaint Filed 03/25/2004 Of Pioneer Financial Llc Returned And Filed.
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Proof Of Service On The Complaint Filed 03/25/2004 Of Pioneer Financial Llc Served On Patricia Hanson With Service Date Of 04/30/04 Filed.(personal Service)
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Blank 4 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Directly Assigned To Department 01 For All Purposes
                                      Blank 3 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Non Proof Of Service Hearing Set For 6/07/04 At 8:00 In Dept Clerk
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Certificate Of Counsel Filed.
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Limited Civil - General Civil Complaint Under $10,000 Filed. Summons Issued.
                                            Request RequestSpace

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?