Pioneer Financial Llc v. Pena
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Riverside, Case No. RIC410297

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 23, 2018 at 3:26 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pioneer Financial LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nelson & Kennard
v.
No Logo Betsy Pena, Defendant
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 40 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Returned Document: Application For & Renewal Of Judgment Submitted By Pioneer Financial Llc.
    Blank 39 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Writ Of Execution Issued; Los Angeles County
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Memorandum Of Credits Of $0.00.
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 37 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        --and Accrued Interest Of $7,079.19 And Costs After Judgment In The Sum Of $55.00 Filed.
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Final Return To Court - Writ Of Execution As To Los Angeles County Unsatisfied Filed.
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 35 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Writ Of Execution Issued; Los Angeles County
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Memorandum Of Credits Of $0.00.
                Request RequestSpace
                Blank 33 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                --and Accrued Interest Of $5,323.02 And Costs After Judgment In The Sum Of $0.00 Filed.
                  Blank 32 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Paper Records Destroyed/digitally Archived. Paper Documents/file Destroyed In Accordance With Administrative Policy/records Management A.10.400.1, Paper Records Retention And Destruction Schedule.
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Writ Of Execution Returned As To La County; Unsatisfied Filed.
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Blank 30 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Writ Of Execution Issued; La County
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Notice Of Change Of Address Of Attorney For Plaintiff By Pioneer Financial Llc Filed.
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Memorandum Of Credits Of $0.00.
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Blank 27 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            --and Accrued Interest Of $2,026.35 And Costs After Judgment In The Sum Of $0.00 Filed.
                              Blank 26 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Abstract Of Judgment Issued
                                Blank 25 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Rejected Document: Abstract Submitted By Pioneer Financial Llc.
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Declaration Of Re Unavailability Of Original Filed
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Request For Dismissal Of Does Filed
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Amended Request For Entry Of Default Clerks Judgment Filed By Pioneer Financial Llc
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        Amended Judgement By Default By Clerk Filed 042705
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Notice Of Date Time & Place Of Status Conference By Pioneer Financial Llc Filed.
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Blank 19 Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Rejected Document: Notice Of Case Management Conference Submitted By Pioneer Financial Llc.
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              Stipulation And Order For Appointment Of Judge Pro Tem.
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Declaration Re Costs Pursuant To C.c.p. 1033 Filed By Pioneer Financial Llc
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Judgment By Default By Clerk Filed 03/17/05
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Request For Entry Of Default And Clerk's Judgment On The Complaint Filed 03/23/2004 Of Pioneer Financial Llc As To Betsy Pena Filed.
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Request For Dismissal Of Does/roes On The Complaint Filed 03/23/2004 Of Pioneer Financial Llc Filed.
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Case Management Statement By Pioneer Financial Llc Filed Untimely Pursuant To Crc 212(g)(1)
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Notice Date, Time And Place Of Cmc By Pioneer Financial Llc Filed.
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Rejected Document: Clerks Judgment Submitted By Pioneer Financial Llc.
                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Attempted Service Of Summons And Complt On Betsy Pena Filed
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Original Summons On Complaint Filed 03/23/2004 Of Pioneer Financial Llc Returned And Filed.
                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Proof Of Attempted Service As To Betsy Pena
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Case Management Statement Filed By Pioneer Financial Llc
                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 9/15/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Rejected Document: Request For Entry Of Default Clerks Judgment Submitted By Pioneer Financial Llc.
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Proof Of Service On The Complaint Filed 03/23/2004 Of Pioneer Financial Llc Served On Betsy Pena With Service Date Of 07/12/04 Filed.(personal Service)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Non Proof Of Service Hearing Set For 6/21/04 At 8:00 In Dept Clerk
                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Directly Assigned To Department 04 For All Purposes
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Certificate Of Counsel Filed.
                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Limited Civil - General Civil Complaint Under $10,000 Filed. Summons Issued.
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace

                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                  This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                  Space
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                   
                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                  Need Password Help?