Pioneer Financial V Fuller
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Riverside, Case No. RIC418301

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 23, 2018 at 2:23 PM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pioneer Financial LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nelson & Kennard
v.
No Logo Tony C Fuller, Defendant
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 41 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Abstract Of Judgment Issued
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Proof Of Service By Mail Of Application For & Renewal Of Judgment On Tony C Fuller With A Mailing Date Of 10/29/14 Filed. (non-complaint)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed.
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Application For And Renewal Of Judgment Filed. Total Renewed Judgment Amount $13,322.40. Original Judgment Entered On 12/17/04.
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Notice Of Renewal Of Judgment Issued And Filed.
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 36 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Note: Proof Of Service Required Before Issuance Ofwrit/abstract (issue 30 Days After Service)
              Blank 35 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              --and Accrued Interest Of $6,783.31 And Costs After Judgment In The Sum Of $226.50 Filed.
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Memorandum Of Credits Of $2,663.65.
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Final Return To Court - Writ Of Execution As To Los Angeles County Unsatisfied Filed.
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Blank 32 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Writ Of Execution Issued; Los Angeles County
                      Blank 31 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      --and Accrued Interest Of $5,522.34 And Costs After Judgment In The Sum Of $92.00 Filed.
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Memorandum Of Credits Of $2,663.65.
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Blank 29 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Returned Document: Writ Of Execution Submitted By Pioneer Financial Llc.
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Memorandum Of Credits Of $2,663.65.
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Blank 27 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              --and Accrued Interest Of $3,030.63 And Costs After Judgment In The Sum Of $92.00 Filed.
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/27/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Writ Of Execution Returned; Sacramento County
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Blank 25 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Writ Of Execution Issued; La County
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Memorandum Of Credits Of $2,663.65.
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Blank 23 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      --and Accrued Interest Of $3,721.86 And Costs After Judgment In The Sum Of $92.00 Filed.
                                        Blank 22 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Paper Records Destroyed/digitally Archived. Paper Documents/file Destroyed In Accordance With Administrative Policy/records Management A.10.400.1, Paper Records Retention And Destruction Schedule.
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Writ Of Execution Returned As To Sac County; Partially Satisfied Filed.
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Blank 20 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Writ Of Execution Issued; Sac County
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Notice Change Of Address By Pioneer Financial Llc Filed.
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Memorandum Of Credits Of $2,663.65.
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  --and Accrued Interest Of $1,327.60 And Costs After Judgment In The Sum Of $92.00 Filed.
                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Writ Of Execution Issued; Sac County
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Memorandum Of Credits Of $0.00.
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        --and Accrued Interest Of $83.30 And Costs After Judgment In The Sum Of $0.00 Filed.
                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Rejected Document: Writ Of Execution/check #74095 Submitted By Pioneer Financial Llc.
                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Rejected Document: Memorandum Of Costs Submitted By Pioneer Financial Llc.
                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Abstract Of Judgment Issued
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Judgment By Default By Clerk Filed 12/17/04
                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Request For Dismissal Of Does/roes On The Complaint Filed 09/09/2004 Of Pioneer Financial Llc Filed.
                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Declaration Of Re:unavail Orig/comp Of Interest/noti Purs 1033 Filed
                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Request For Entry Of Default And Clerk's Judgment On The Complaint Filed 09/09/2004 Of Pioneer Financial Llc As To Tony C Fuller Filed.
                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Original Summons On Complaint Filed 09/09/2004 Of Pioneer Financial Llc Returned And Filed.
                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Proof Of Service (sub-served And Mailed) On Complaint Filed 09/09/2004 Of Pioneer Financial Llc As To Tony C Fuller; Mailing Date Of 10/16/04 Filed.
                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Non Proof Of Service Hearing Set For 11/22/04 At 8:00 In Dept Clerk
                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Directly Assigned To Department 06 For All Purposes
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Certificate Of Counsel Filed.
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Limited Civil - General Civil Complaint Under $10,000 Filed. Summons Issued.
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?