SES AMERICOM, INC. v. BROADCAST AMERICA, et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-05807-FLW
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Ses Americom, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space STEPHEN V. FALANGA +1 973 535 0500 sfalanga@connellfoley.com
v.
No Logo Broadcast America Partnership, Ltd., Defendant

Represented by Saiber Schlesinger Satz & Goldstein, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JAMES HENRY FORTE +1 973 622 3333 +1 973 622 3349 jhf@saiber.com
No Logo BROADCAST AMERICA, INC., Defendant

Represented by Saiber Schlesinger Satz & Goldstein, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JAMES HENRY FORTE +1 973 622 3333 +1 973 622 3349 jhf@saiber.com
No Logo John Does, Defendant
Attributes
Office Camden
Filed 12/6/2002
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Mercer
Terminated 6/30/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BQ, CLOSED, SCHEDO
Timeline
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/2/2004, Entered: 7/7/2004 Judgment*Court Filing
CONSENT ORDER AND JUDGMENT in favor of pltf. SES AMERICOM, INC. against defts. BROADCAST AMERICA PARTNERSHIP, LTD. AND BROADCAST AMERICA, INC. in the amount of $332,902.97 on Count One of the complaint asserting a claim for breach of contract. Dismissing with prejudice Count Two. All other relief sought in the complaint not expressly granted herein is denied. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 7/2/04. (ar1, )
LREF
Legal Document 17 Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: 6/30/2004 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE as settled without prejudice and without costs. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/30/04. (ar1, )
LREF
Legal Document 16 Filed: 4/21/2004, Entered: 4/22/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/29/2004 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Joel B. Rosen. Discovery due by 6/1/2004. Motions due by 6/18/2004. Signed by Judge Joel B. Rosen on 4/21/04. (sb)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/20/2004 Status Conference
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joel B. Rosen : Status Conference held on 4/19/2004. (bb, )
LREF
Legal Document 15 Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/19/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 4/19/2004 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Joel B. Rosen. Discovery due by 4/30/2004. Motions due by 5/16/2004. Signed by Judge Joel B. Rosen on 02/18/04. (db)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: 2/18/2004 Status Conference
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joel B. Rosen : Status Conference held on 2/17/2004. (bb, )
LREF
Blank 14 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: 11/19/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff on 2/27/04; Telephone Status conference for 11:30 on 2/10/04; Dispositive Motion due on or before 4/1/04. (signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen)(NM) (db)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: 11/20/2003 Settlement Conference
Settlement conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 11/17/03. (js)
LREF
Blank 13 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: 6/10/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 12/30/03; Status conference 2:00 11/17/03. (signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen)(NM) (sb)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: 6/13/2003 Status Conference
Phone/Status conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 6/10/03. (js)
LREF
Blank 12 Filed: 4/21/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003 Amended Answer to Complaint
AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by BROADCAST AMERICA : amends [8-1] answer (Cert of Serv) (sb)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 4/21/2003, Entered: 4/21/2003 Status Conference
Status conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 04/14/03. (db)
LREF
Blank 11 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 4/15/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference 11:00 6/10/03 (signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen)(NM) (sb)
LREF
Blank 10 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER reassigning action from Judge Mary L. Cooper to Judge Freda L. Wolfson and reallocated from Trenton to Camden (signed by Chief Judge John W. Bissell) (NM) (lk)
LREF
Blank 9 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/7/2003 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BROADCAST AMERICA of [8-1] answer (DS)
LREF
Blank 8 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/7/2003 Answer
ANSWER to Complaint by BROADCAST AMERICA (DS)
LREF
Blank 7 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER, setting scheduling conference for 2:30 3/27/03 (signed by Mag. Judge John J. Hughes) (NM) (lk)
LREF
Blank 6 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003 Answer
ANSWER to Complaint by BROADCAST AMER. INC. (lk)
LREF
Blank 5 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/23/2003 Summons Returned Executed
RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to BROADCAST AMERICA 12/13/02; Answer due on 1/2/03. (DS)
LREF
Blank 4 Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 Application and Clerk's Order to extend time to an
APPLICATION by BROADCAST AMERICA and Clerk's Order extending time to answer to 1/21/03 (DH) Modified on 01/08/2003
LREF
Blank 3 Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: 1/6/2003 Summons Returned Executed
RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to BROADCAST AMERICA 12/16/02; Answer due on 1/6/03. (DS)
LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 12/9/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. (TRENTON - Judge MARY L. COPPER - Magistrate Judge FREDA L. WOLFSON) (NM) (ck)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 12/9/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002 Summons Issued
SUMMONSES issued for all named dfts. (20 Days) (Mailed to Counsel) (ck)
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002 Complaint
COMPLAINT filed (FILING FEE $150.00 RECEIPT # 322089) (ck)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 47 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?