Gomez v. United States of America
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-00637

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 4, 2019 at 5:35 PM DT (1.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Gerardo Gomez, Jr, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gerardo Gomez, Jr
v.
No Logo All US Senators, Defendant
No Logo Correct Care Solutions/Medical League Concepts, Defendant
No Logo Dallas B Jones, Defendant
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Defendant
Officially listed as "Dept of Health and Human Services"
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald Trump"
Unknown Role, Riviera Holdings Corp
Federal Bureau of Prisons Federal Bureau of Prisons, Defendant
No Logo Jeff Sessions, Defendant
No Logo Mike Pence, Defendant
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: None Mail Returned
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/9/2019, Entered: None Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/9/2019, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Mail Returned
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: None Acknowledgment of Receipt
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: 1/17/2019 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER for Initial Partial Filing Fee of $101.29 within 30 days. Upon receipt of the initial partial filing fee, the Court, as required by PLRA, will order the agency having custody of plaintiff, to make monthly withdrawals from his inmate account and forward them to the Court until the balance is paid. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 1/17/19. (mrp, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                  MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gerardo Gomez, Jr. (tkd, ) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                      28:1346 TORT CLAIM/28:1331 BIVENS COMPLAINT against All US Senators, Correct Care Solutions/Medical League Concepts, Dept of Health and Human Services, Federal Bureau of Prisons, Dallas B Jones, Mike Pence, Jeff Sessions, Donald Trump, United States of America, filed by Gerardo Gomez, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(tkd, ) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None case referred to magistrate judge
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None case referred to magistrate judge
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 62 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?