Johnson v. State of Ohio
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-02970

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 22, 2020 at 10:48 AM DT (7.6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Dontez Johnson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by #693393

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dontez Johnson
v.
No Logo Adam M. Chaploupka, Defendant
No Logo Allison Breneman, Defendant
No Logo Cuyahoga Clerk of Courts, Defendant
No Logo Jaye M. Schlachet, Defendant
No Logo John Dlugloniski, Defendant
No Logo Kelly Mason, Defendant
No Logo Mary Eileen Kilbane, Defendant
No Logo Patricia Ann Blackmon, Defendant
No Logo Scott Moran, Defendant
No Logo Sean C. Gallagher, Defendant
No Logo Second District Police Department, Defendant
No Logo Shirley Strickland Saffold, Defendant
No Logo State of Ohio, Defendant
No Logo Thomas Klamert, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: None Reconsideration
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend Complaint
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: None Amend Complaint
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/10/2019, Entered: None Amend Complaint
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: None Amend Complaint
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: None Amend Complaint
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/13/2019, Entered: None Leave
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: None Reconsideration
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: None Judgment
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: None memorandum opinion and order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: 12/27/2018 Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                          Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Dontez Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of prisoner)(S,SR)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: 12/27/2018 Complaint
                            Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Dontez Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 USM-285, # 4 envelope, # 5 cover letter, # 6 various documents) (S,SR)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case, (S,SR)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (S,SR)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?