Coker v. Gore
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-00444

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 3, 2021 at 5:04 PM DT (2.2 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jamie Lee Coker, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jamie Lee Coker
v.
No Logo Brian Collier, Defendant
No Logo Cheryld Egan, Defendant
No Logo Dennis C Gore, Defendant
No Logo Director of TDCJ CID Lorie Davis, Defendant
No Logo Don C Bosco, Defendant
No Logo Donald E Muntz, Defendant
No Logo Marcus E. Hinkle, M.D., Defendant
No Logo Melverick Player, Defendant
No Logo Norris D Jackson, Defendant
No Logo Officer Kimbrough, Defendant
No Logo Officer Kimgrough� John Doe, Defendant
No Logo Olugbenga Ojo, Defendant
No Logo Texas Department Of Criminal Justice, Defendant
No Logo University Of Texas Medical Branch, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (45) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: None Reinstate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: None Reinstate
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: None USCA Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: None Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (PRIVATE PDF)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: None Appeal In Forma Pauperis
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/23/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/23/2021, Entered: None Clerks Memo to Prisoner (FORM, noticing) - Civil
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/11/2021, Entered: None extension of time
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/10/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/10/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/10/2021, Entered: None extension of time
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/9/2021, Entered: None Notice of Non-Compliance (FORM, noticing) - Civil
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/28/2021, Entered: None Staying Case
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: None Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal (FORM,noticing) - Civil
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Certified Mail Receipt Returned
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/7/2021, Entered: None Service on TX Attorney General
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/6/2021, Entered: None Transfer Case (to a different court)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: None Memorandum and Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: None More Definite Statement
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/18/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/12/2019, Entered: None Notice of Reassignment (FORM, noticing) - Civil
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: None More Definite Statement
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: None More Definite Statement
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/11/2019, Entered: None Memorandum
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/11/2019, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: None Request for Production of Documents
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: 12/28/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jamie Lee Coker, filed. (agould, 3)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: 12/28/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jamie Lee Coker, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/18/2019. (agould, 3)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: 12/28/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Jamie Lee Coker, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/18/2019. (agould, 3)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: 12/28/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (agould, 3)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: 12/28/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Jamie Lee Coker.(agould, 3)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                            This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                            Space
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                             
                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                            Need Password Help?