Washington v. The City of New York
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-12306

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 21, 2019 at 4:14 PM DT (1.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Davon Washington, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Emery Celli Brinckerhoff & Abady, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Doug Lieb +1 212 763 5000 dlieb@ecbalaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine R. Rosenfeld +1 212 763 5010 +1 212 763 5001 krosenfeld@ecbalaw.com
No Logo John Doe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Emery Celli Brinckerhoff & Abady, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Doug Lieb +1 212 763 5000 dlieb@ecbalaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine R. Rosenfeld +1 212 763 5010 +1 212 763 5001 krosenfeld@ecbalaw.com
No Logo Pariis Tillery, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Emery Celli Brinckerhoff & Abady, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Doug Lieb +1 212 763 5000 dlieb@ecbalaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine R. Rosenfeld +1 212 763 5010 +1 212 763 5001 krosenfeld@ecbalaw.com
No Logo Steven Espinal, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Emery Celli Brinckerhoff & Abady, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Doug Lieb +1 212 763 5000 dlieb@ecbalaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine R. Rosenfeld +1 212 763 5010 +1 212 763 5001 krosenfeld@ecbalaw.com
v.
No Logo "John" Colangione, Defendant
No Logo "John" Harris, Defendant
No Logo Anthony Degonza, Defendant
No Logo Anthony Torrisi, Defendant
No Logo Brian Sullivan, Defendant
No Logo County of Albany, Defendant
No Logo Craig D Apple, Sr., Defendant
No Logo Cynthia Brann, Defendant
No Logo Damien Anzalone, Defendant
No Logo Dan Poole, Defendant
No Logo Eugene Ratigan, Defendant
No Logo Frank Foe #13, Defendant
No Logo Frank Foe Shield #323, Defendant
No Logo Frank Foe Shield #99, Defendant
No Logo Frank Foes #1-12, Defendant
No Logo Frank Foes #14-16, Defendant
No Logo Frank Foes #17-18, Defendant
No Logo Frank Foes #19-21, Defendant
No Logo Frank Harris, Defendant
No Logo Jane Walker, Defendant
No Logo Jarred Jarosz, Defendant
No Logo John Williams, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Kelly, Defendant
No Logo Josiah Haley, Defendant
No Logo Kelly Thompson, Defendant
No Logo Mark Valvo, Defendant
No Logo Matthew Labombard, Defendant
No Logo Melissa "Missy" Mylroie, Defendant
No Logo Michael Beliveau, Defendant
No Logo Michael Grimes, Defendant
No Logo Michael Lyons, Defendant
No Logo Ryan Lawson, Defendant
No Logo The City of New York, Defendant
No Logo Thuan Ton, Defendant
No Logo Timothy Kehn, Defendant
No Logo Trent Shaver, Defendant
No Logo Vincent Adams, Defendant
No Logo William Reddy, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (166) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Order of Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Letter
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: None Stay
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: None Order Staying Case
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: None Letter
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 7/24/2019, Entered: None extension of time
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 7/17/2019, Entered: None Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 7/15/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 7/12/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 7/12/2019, Entered: None Letter
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 7/11/2019, Entered: None Letter
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 7/10/2019, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 7/10/2019, Entered: None Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 7/9/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 7/9/2019, Entered: None Response (non-motion)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 7/9/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 7/9/2019, Entered: None Response (non-motion)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 7/9/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 7/6/2019, Entered: None Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 7/5/2019, Entered: None Request to Participate
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 6/28/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 6/27/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 6/27/2019, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 6/27/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: None Stay
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 6/19/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 6/18/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 6/18/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 6/12/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/7/2019, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/6/2019, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Amended Summons
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/6/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: None Affirmation in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: None Intervene
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: None Case Management Plan
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Sever
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: None Response (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: None Certify Class
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/27/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/20/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/20/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None Sever
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: None Transfer Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/6/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/29/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/29/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/29/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: 12/28/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas Edward Lieb on behalf of John Doe, Steven Espinal, Pariis Tillery, Davon Washington. (Lieb, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: 12/28/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York, et al., re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by John Doe, Steven Espinal, Pariis Tillery, Davon Washington. (Rosenfeld, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: 12/28/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rosenfeld, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: 12/28/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against Vincent Adams, Damien Anzalone, Craig D Apple, Sr, Michael Beliveau, Cynthia Brann, "John" Colangione, County of Albany, Anthony Degonza, Frank Foe #13, Frank Foe Shield #323, Frank Foe Shield #99, Frank Foes #1-12, Frank Foes #14-16, Frank Foes #17-18, Frank Foes #19-21, Michael Grimes, Josiah Haley, "John" Harris, Frank Harris, Jarred Jarosz, Timothy Kehn, Joseph Kelly, Matthew Labombard, Ryan Lawson, Michael Lyons, Melissa "Missy" Mylroie, Dan Poole, Eugene Ratigan, William Reddy, Trent Shaver, Brian Sullivan, The City of New York, Kelly Thompson, Thuan Ton, Anthony Torrisi, Mark Valvo, Jane Walker, John Williams. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16116766)Document filed by Steven Espinal, Davon Washington, Pariis Tillery, John Doe.(Rosenfeld, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?