Burke v. Bayer Pharma AG
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-12373

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 1, 2019 at 9:39 AM DT (1.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Krista Burke, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Ward PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christina T Natale +1 502 882 6000 christina@jonesward.com
v.
Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bayer OY, Defendant
No Logo Bayer Pharma AG, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332pi
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None Judgment - Clerk
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None Summons Issued
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None Summons Issued
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None Summons Issued
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/31/2018, Entered: 12/31/2018 Unknown Document Type
            STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:17-md-02767-PAE. Document filed by Krista Burke.(Natale, Christina)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/31/2018, Entered: 12/31/2018 Unknown Document Type
              CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Natale, Christina)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/31/2018, Entered: 12/31/2018 Unknown Document Type
                REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Krista Burke. (Natale, Christina)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/31/2018, Entered: 12/31/2018 Unknown Document Type
                  REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bayer OY, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Krista Burke. (Natale, Christina)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/31/2018, Entered: 12/31/2018 Unknown Document Type
                    REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bayer Pharma AG, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Krista Burke. (Natale, Christina)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/31/2018, Entered: 12/31/2018 Unknown Document Type
                      COMPLAINT against Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer OY, Bayer Pharma AG. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16120636)Document filed by Krista Burke.(Natale, Christina)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 7 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?