MUNOZ v. ARPAIO
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-02768

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 25, 2019 at 12:37 PM DT (2.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo RENATO TREJO MUNOZ, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by #97904694

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RENATO TREJO MUNOZ
v.
No Logo JOSEPH MICHAEL ARPAIO, Defendant
No Logo UNKNOWN JUDGE AND GOVERNMENT, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Mail Returned
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Denied
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None Order Dismissing Pro Se Case
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/31/2018. (zsb)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 11/16/2018. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 4 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?