Gwitchyaa Zhee Corporation v. Alexander
Federal Civil Lawsuit Alaska District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-00016-HRH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 16, 2021 at 1:40 PM EST (1.9 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Gwichyaa Zhee Gwich'in Tribal Government, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Lee Colin Baxter +1 907 263 6300 +1 907 263 6345 lee.baxter@hklaw.com
No Logo Gwitchyaa Zhee Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Lee Colin Baxter +1 907 263 6300 +1 907 263 6345 lee.baxter@hklaw.com
v.
No Logo Clarence Alexander, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , James M. Hackett +1 907 456 3626 +1 907 451 7590 jhackettlaw@aol.com
No Logo Dacho Alexander, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , James M. Hackett +1 907 456 3626 +1 907 451 7590 jhackettlaw@aol.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1446
Nature of Suit Real Property: Other
  Entries (189) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 11/16/2021, Entered: None USCA Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 4/20/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Bond
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 4/1/2021, Entered: None Bond
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None USCA Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 2/24/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 2/17/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 2/15/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 2/9/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 2/9/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None Objections to Bill of Costs
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 1/27/2021, Entered: None USCA Scheduling Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 1/27/2021, Entered: None USCA Case Number
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 1/6/2021, Entered: None Stay
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 12/27/2020, Entered: None Stay
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 12/23/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: None Judgment
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 10/27/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 10/12/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 10/12/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: None Memorandum
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: None Memorandum
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: None Memorandum
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: None Memorandum
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: None Memorandum
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 9/24/2020, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 9/24/2020, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 9/24/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 9/24/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 9/24/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 9/23/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 8/17/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 7/30/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 6/24/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 6/23/2020, Entered: None Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 6/22/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 6/17/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 6/17/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 6/8/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 6/3/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: None USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 2/3/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 1/23/2020, Entered: None USCA Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 1/23/2020, Entered: None USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 1/9/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 1/9/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 1/9/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 12/31/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 12/26/2019, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 12/26/2019, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 12/26/2019, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 11/23/2019, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: None Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: None Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: None Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 8/12/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 8/8/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 8/5/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 8/2/2019, Entered: None Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 8/2/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 8/2/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 7/30/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying 61 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 1/3/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 81 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiffs may serve and file their proposed amended complaint by 1/14/19. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 1/3/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion forJoinderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying 27 Motion for Joinder. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 8/30/18. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Answer to Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion forJoinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for extension of time to answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Unissued Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None Initial Case Status Report Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None order on motion to remandCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying 11 Motion to Remand; granting 16 Motion for Judicial Notice. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 7/3/18. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None order on motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None order on motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE TO ORDER State Court Documents by Dacho Alexander. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Hackett, James) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE TO ORDER Service List by Dacho Alexander. (Hackett, James) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days.(LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Civil Cover Sheet. (LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION by Gwitchyaa Zhee Corporation, Gwichyaa Zhee Gwich'in Tribal Government, Dacho Alexander, Clarence Alexander from Superior Court, Fourth District at Fairbanks, case number 4FA-18-01506 CI. ( Filing fee $ 400, fbk 001534), filed by Gwitchyaa Zhee Corporation, Gwichyaa Zhee Gwich'in Tribal Government, Dacho Alexander, Clarence Alexander. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A)(LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?