MANDAN et al v. TESLA, INC.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 3:19-cv-00157-MAS-LHG
Magistrate Judge Michael A. Shipp, presiding

Tags
Last Updated April 4, 2019 at 12:24 PM DT (2.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo NIRU MADAN, Plaintiff
No Logo RAJINDER MANDAN, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ERICA SINGER MEKLES +1 201 577 5175 +1 804 649 1762 erica.mekles@bowmanandbrooke.com
Office Trenton
Filed 1/4/2019
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand
Nature of Suit 350 - Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1446 Notice for Removal- Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County Somerset
Terminated
Origin 2
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case SOM-L1238-18[SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, SOMERSET COUNTY]
Defendant Custody Status
Flag ARBITRATION
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: 3/18/2019 Reply to Response to motion
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by TESLA, INC. re [3] MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (MEKLES, ERICA)
    LREF
    Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: 3/13/2019 response in opposition to motion
    RESPONSE in Opposition filed by NIRU MADAN, RAJINDER MADAN re [3] MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (mps)
      LREF
      Blank 8 Filed: 3/5/2019, Entered: 3/5/2019 OrderCourt Filing
      TEXT ORDER: Defendant filed a Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. [3]) on January 11, 2019, returnable February 4, 2019. Opposition to this motion was due by January 22, 2019. As of today's date, the Court has yet to receive Plaintiffs' opposition. If Plaintiffs do not respond to the motion by Friday, March 22, 2019, the Court will consider the motion unopposed. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 3/5/2019. *A copy of this Text Order has been mailed to pro se Plaintiffs.(gxh)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: 1/28/2019 Response in Support of Motion
        RESPONSE in Support filed by TESLA, INC. re [3] MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service Certification of Service)(MEKLES, ERICA)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
          Set Deadlines as to [3] MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Motion set for 2/4/2019 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
            LREF
            Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
            Set Deadlines as to [3] MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Motion set for 2/4/2019 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: 1/11/2019 Certificate of service
              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TESLA, INC. re [3] MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (service on Pro Se Plaintiffs) (MEKLES, ERICA)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: 1/11/2019 Exhibit
                Exhibit to [3] Motion to Dismiss Complaint (Text of Proposed Order) by TESLA, INC.. (MEKLES, ERICA)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: 1/11/2019 memorandum in support of motion
                  MEMORANDUM in Support filed by TESLA, INC. re [3] MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (MEKLES, ERICA)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: 1/11/2019 Motion to Dismiss
                    MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by TESLA, INC.. Responses due by 1/22/2019 (MEKLES, ERICA)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank  Add and Terminate Judges
                      Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jmh)
                        LREF
                        Blank  QC - Attorney Case Opening
                        CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: 1/4/2019 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                          Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tesla, Inc. identifying none as Corporate Parent.. (MEKLES, ERICA)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: 1/4/2019 notice of removal
                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tesla, Inc. from Superior Court of NJ, Law Division: Somerset County, case number SOM-L-123818. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9284108), filed by Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Certification with Exhibits, # (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(MEKLES, ERICA)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 63 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?