Edgar Monserratt v. Tesla Inc, et al
State Civil Lawsuit County Court in and for Broward County, Florida, Case No. CACE19000422

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Monserratt, Edgar, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Constantino, James, Defendant
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (46) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 46 Filed: 9/10/2019, Entered: 9/10/2019
Certificate of No Objection
    Legal Document 45 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: 9/4/2019
    Notice of Service
      Legal Document 44 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: 9/4/2019
      Response to Affirmative Defenses
        Legal Document 43 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: 8/30/2019
        Response to Request for Production
          Legal Document 42 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: 8/30/2019
          Notice of Service
            Legal Document 41 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: 8/27/2019
            Response to Request to Produce
              Legal Document 40 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: 8/27/2019
              Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
                Legal Document 39 Filed: 7/26/2019, Entered: 7/26/2019
                Request for Copies
                  Legal Document 38 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: 7/25/2019
                  Notice of Production From Non-Party
                    Legal Document 37 Filed: 7/23/2019, Entered: 7/23/2019
                    Notice of Hearing
                      Legal Document 36 Filed: 7/22/2019, Entered: 7/22/2019
                      Notice of Hearing
                        Legal Document 35 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: 7/16/2019
                        Notice of Propounding Interrogatories
                          Legal Document 34 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: 7/16/2019
                          Notice of Propounding Interrogatories
                            Legal Document 33 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: 7/16/2019
                            Request for Production
                              Legal Document 32 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: 7/16/2019
                              Request for Production
                                Legal Document 31 Filed: 6/18/2019, Entered: 6/18/2019
                                Certificate of No Objection
                                  Legal Document 30 Filed: 6/18/2019, Entered: 6/18/2019
                                  Request for Copies
                                    Legal Document 29 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: 6/5/2019
                                    Notice of Production From Non-Party
                                      Legal Document 28 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: 5/17/2019
                                      Response to Request for Production
                                        Legal Document 27 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: 5/17/2019
                                        Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
                                          Legal Document 26 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: 4/12/2019
                                          Order Granting Motion: FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC NCE OF PHILIP HARNETT CORBOY, JR
                                            Legal Document 25 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: 4/5/2019
                                            Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
                                              Legal Document 24 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: 3/28/2019
                                              Reply to Answer
                                                Legal Document 23 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: 3/21/2019
                                                Order Granting Motion: For Admission Pro Hac Vice of Vicent Galvin
                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: 3/12/2019
                                                  Pro Hac Vice: Payor: BETSY VANDRELL ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A037168; ;
                                                    Legal Document 21 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: 3/11/2019
                                                    Answer to Complaint
                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: 3/11/2019
                                                      Notice of Service of Interrogs
                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: 3/11/2019
                                                        Request to Produce
                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: 3/11/2019
                                                          Request to Produce
                                                            Legal Document 17 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: 3/11/2019
                                                            Notice: OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS
                                                              Legal Document 16 Filed: 3/8/2019, Entered: 3/8/2019
                                                              Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                Legal Document 15 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: 3/4/2019
                                                                Reply: TO DEFENDANT, HALSTON LOYD'S, ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAI T AND MOTION TO STRIKE CERTAIN AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
                                                                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: 3/4/2019
                                                                  Reply: TO DEFENDANT, TESLA, INC. a/k/a TESLA FLORIDA, INC.'S, ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE CERTAIN AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
                                                                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: 2/15/2019
                                                                    Notice of Appearance: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES
                                                                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: 2/12/2019
                                                                      Answer to Amended Complaint: Defendant Tesla Inc
                                                                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: 2/12/2019
                                                                        Answer to Amended Complaint: Defendant, Halston Loyd
                                                                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: 1/18/2019
                                                                          Amended Complaint: FIRST
                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: 1/8/2019
                                                                            Pro Hac Vice: Payor: SLOPA ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A004417; ; Amount: $100.00
                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: 1/8/2019
                                                                              Summons Issued Fee: Payor: SLOPA ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A004417; ; Amount: $10.00
                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: 1/8/2019
                                                                                Summons Issued Fee: Payor: SLOPA ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A004417; ; Amount: $10.00
                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: 1/8/2019
                                                                                  Filing Fee: Payor: SLOPA ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A004417; ; Amount: $401.00
                                                                                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: 1/8/2019
                                                                                    Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice: PURSUANT TO FLA. R. JUD. ADMIN. 2.510 Party: Plaintiff Monserratt, Edgar
                                                                                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: 1/8/2019
                                                                                      eSummons Issuance: JAMES CONSTANTINO
                                                                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: 1/8/2019
                                                                                        eSummons Issuance: TESLA, INC
                                                                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: 1/8/2019
                                                                                          Complaint (eFiled)
                                                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: 1/8/2019
                                                                                            Civil Cover Sheet

                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                              This case has been viewed 295 times.

                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                              Space
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                               
                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                              Need Password Help?