California Casualty v. Sarim Duong
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino, Case No. CIVDS900070

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 8, 2019 at 7:56 PM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo California Casualty Indemnity Exchange, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rosenberg, Gary A. +1 818 883 9545
v.
No Logo Sarim Duong, Defendant
No Logo Tony Nguyen, Defendant
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Judgment On Complaint (limited Jurisdiction) Filed 01/07/2009 Of California Casualtyindemnity Exchange Filed
    Blank 12 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Declaration Of In Lieu Of Testimony Filed
      Blank 11 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Case Management Conference Statement Filed By California Casualtyindemnity Exchange.
        Blank 10 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Dismissal Filed On Complaint (limited Jurisdiction) Filed 01/07/2009 Of California Casualtyindemnity Exchange As To Does Only
          Blank 9 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          Request To Enter Default Already Entered. Request For Clerks/court Judgement Filed On Sarim Duong.
            Blank 8 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Dismissal Filed As To Tony Nguyen, Without Prejudice
              Blank 7 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Request To Enter Default Against Sarim Duong Filed.
                Blank 6 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Default Entered On Complaint (limited Jurisdiction) Filed 01/07/2009 Of California Casualtyindemnity Exchange As To Sarim Duong.
                  Blank 5 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Case Tracked To S38 For Hearing
                    Blank 4 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Vacate Oscsv Hearing Scheduled For 03/20/09 At 08:30 In Department S38.
                      Blank 3 Filed: 2/11/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Proof Of Service Of Summons And Comp/pet On Sarim Duong; Defendant/respondent Served On 01/27/09
                        Blank 2 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Case Assigned For All Purposes To Department S38
                          Blank 1 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Civil Case Initiated And Party Information Entered

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 1 time.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?