Open Society Justice Initiative v. Central Intelligence Agency et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:19-cv-00234-PAE
District Judge Paul A. Engelmayer, presiding

Tags
Last Updated August 6, 2021 at 1:51 PM DT (2.6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Open Society Justice Initiative, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amrit Singh +1 212 548 0660 +1 212 548 4662 amrit.singh@opensocietyfoundations.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Debevoise & Plimpton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space CATHERINE AMIRFAR +1 212 909 6000 camirfar@debevoise.com
Space Matthew Forbes +1 212 909 6886 mforbes@debevoise.com
v.
United States Central Intelligence Agency United States Central Intelligence Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "Central Intelligence Agency"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Natasha Waglow Teleanu +1 212 637 2528 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.teleanu@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Max Aronoff +1 212 637 2697 +1 212 637 2686 peter.aronoff@usdoj.gov
Space David Stuart Jones +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2686 david.jones6@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Defense United States Department of Defense, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Defense"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Max Aronoff +1 212 637 2697 +1 212 637 2686 peter.aronoff@usdoj.gov
Space David Stuart Jones +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2686 david.jones6@usdoj.gov
Space Natasha Waglow Teleanu +1 212 637 2528 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.teleanu@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Justice"
United States Department of State United States Department of State, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of State"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Max Aronoff +1 212 637 2697 +1 212 637 2686 peter.aronoff@usdoj.gov
United States National Security Agency United States National Security Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "National Security Agency"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Max Aronoff +1 212 637 2697 +1 212 637 2686 peter.aronoff@usdoj.gov
Space David Stuart Jones +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2686 david.jones6@usdoj.gov
Space Natasha Waglow Teleanu +1 212 637 2528 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.teleanu@usdoj.gov
Office Of The Director Of National Intelligence Office Of The Director Of National Intelligence, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Max Aronoff +1 212 637 2697 +1 212 637 2686 peter.aronoff@usdoj.gov
Space David Stuart Jones +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2686 david.jones6@usdoj.gov
Space Natasha Waglow Teleanu +1 212 637 2528 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.teleanu@usdoj.gov
Office Foley Square
Filed 1/9/2019
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County NewYork
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
119-cv-00234-PAE
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags ECF,LEAD
  Entries (143) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 8/6/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 6/8/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 6/8/2021, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 6/8/2021, Entered: None Reconsideration
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 6/8/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 6/8/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 6/8/2021, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 6/8/2021, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 6/8/2021, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 9/18/2020, Entered: None Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: None Stay
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: 8/13/2019 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting (93) Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 1:19-cv-00234-PAE. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/13/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (jca)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Order of Dismissal
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: 8/13/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER: At yesterday's conference, the Court set the following deadlines: 1. By August 26, 2019, the parties shall file a joint letter reporting on the outcomes of the State Department's test of certain search terms and setting out their respective views as to this subject. 2. Also by August 26, 2019, the parties shall file a joint letter reporting on the State Department's efforts to prioritize processing of documents consistent with Plaintiff's preferences. 3. The next status conference is scheduled for September 27, 2019 at 9 a.m. The parties are to file a joint status letter three days prior to the conference. (Status Conference set for 9/27/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/13/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(jwh)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/10/2019, Entered: 8/10/2019, Terminated: 8/13/2019 Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                          LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages /Letter Motion Requesting Permission to File Overlength Letter (Docket No. 91 in 19-cv-234 and 75 in 19-cv-1329) addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Catherine Amirfar dated August 10, 2019. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Attachments: # (1) Three-Page Letter from C. Amirfar to the Hon. Paul A. Engelmayer, # (2) Exhibit A - Letter from N. Teleanu to OSJI Counsel, July 19, 2019, # (3) Exhibit B Intentionally Left Blank, # (4) Exhibit C - Letter from N. Teleanu to OSJI Counsel, July 30, 2019, # (5) Exhibit D - Letter from C. Amirfar to Govts Counsel, Aug. 1, 2019, # (6) Exhibit E - Letter from S. Weetman to A. Singh, June 28, 2019, # (7) Exhibit F - Letter from S. Weetman to A. Singh, July 31, 2019, # (8) Exhibit G - Letter from N. Teleanu to OSJI Counsel, June 27, 2019)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Amirfar, Catherine)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: 8/9/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Peter Aronoff dated 8/9/2019 re: response to plaintiff's letter. Document filed by Department of Defense, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Aronoff, Peter)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: 8/9/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Catherine Amirfar dated August 9, 2019 re: August 12, 2019 conference. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-Letter from N. Teleanu to OSJI Counsel, July 19, 2019, # (2) Exhibit B Intentionally Left Blank, # (3) Exhibit C-Letter from N. Teleanu to OSJI Counsel, July 30, 2019, # (4) Exhibit D Letter from C. Amirfar to Govts Counsel, Aug. 1, 2019, # (5) Exhibit E Letter from S. Weetman to A. Singh, June 28, 2019, # (6) Exhibit F Letter from S. Weetman to A. Singh, July 31, 2019, # (7) Exhibit G - Letter from N. Teleanu to OSJI Counsel, June 27, 2019)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Amirfar, Catherine)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 90 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: 8/6/2019 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                    OPINION & ORDER re: (61 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 47 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) MOTION for Reconsideration or modification of Court's processing orders as to DOD and State: For the reasons reviewed above, the Court denies the motions by the State Department and DOD for reconsideration of the monthly processing rates set by the Court. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to deny the motion pending at Dkt. 61. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/6/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(jwh)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/2/2019, Entered: 8/2/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (72 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE, 88 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Status Report, filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update and will take up any outstanding issues at the next conference. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/2/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(cf)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 88 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: 8/1/2019 Status report
                                                                                        STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: 8/1/2019 Order on Motion to Adjourn ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting (86) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference in case 1:19-cv-00234-PAE; granting (70) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference in case 1:19-cv-01329-PAE: Granted. The status conference currently scheduled for August 8, 2019 is hereby adjourned to August 12, 2019 at 10:00. (Status Conference set for 8/12/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/1/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (jwh)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: 8/1/2019, Terminated: 8/1/2019 Motion to Adjourn ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Matthew D. Forbes dated August 1, 2019. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Forbes, Matthew)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/19/2019, Entered: 7/19/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (84 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 68 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Status Report, filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update and the parties' ongoing efforts to discuss technologies that would make FOIA productions more relevant and efficient. The Court does not require a supplement to this letter before the next scheduled bi-weekly update unless the parties believe they have reached an impasse on an issue that requires the Court's attention. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 7/19/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(anc)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/18/2019, Entered: 7/18/2019 Status report
                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: 7/16/2019 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 7/8/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: 7/16/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 7/8/2019 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/6/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/16/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2019.(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/9/2019, Entered: 7/9/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER: At today's conference, the Court set the following dates and deadlines: 1. The parties shall provide the Court with joint bi-weekly status updates, beginning July 18, 2019, and continuing every other Thursday thereafter; 2. The next status conference is scheduled for August 8, 2019 at 2:30 p.m. SO ORDERED., Status Conference set for 8/8/2019 at 02:30 PM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 7/8/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(rj)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer: Status Conference held on 7/8/2019. Amrit Singh & Matthew Forbes present for Plaintiff. Natasha Teleanu & Peter Aronoff present for Defendants. Court reporter present. (ajs)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/3/2019, Entered: 7/3/2019 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Eric F. Stein in Support re: (61 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 47 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) MOTION for Reconsideration or modification of Court's processing orders as to DOD and State.. Document filed by Department of State, Department of State. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/3/2019, Entered: 7/3/2019 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (61 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 47 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) MOTION for Reconsideration or modification of Court's processing orders as to DOD and State. . Document filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Department of State. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/3/2019, Entered: 7/3/2019 Status report
                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: 7/2/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting [76] Motion for Matthew D. Forbes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 7/02/2019) (ama)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                      >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (76 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 62 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) MOTION for Matthew D. Forbes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(jc)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: 7/1/2019, Terminated: 7/2/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                        MOTION for Matthew D. Forbes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee of $200.00 paid, receipt no. ANYSDC-17176407. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Matthew D. Forbes in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # (2) Matthew D. Forbes Certificates of Good Standing, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Forbes, Matthew) Modified on 7/2/2019 (jc).
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: 7/1/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (74 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 60 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Status Report, filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 7/1/2019) (ks)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/28/2019, Entered: 6/28/2019 Status report
                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Aronoff, Peter)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/27/2019, Entered: 6/27/2019 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Catherine Amirfar in Opposition re: (61 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 47 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) MOTION for Reconsideration or modification of Court's processing orders as to DOD and State.. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Email from Amrit Singh to Natasha Teleanu, dated May 31, 2019, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Email from David Sandler to Natasha Teleanu, dated June 11, 2019, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Email from Amrit Singh to Natasha Teleanu and Peter Aronoff, dated June 24, 2019, # (4) Exhibit 4 - Letter from Department of State to Amrit Singh, dated December 21, 2018)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Amirfar, Catherine)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/27/2019, Entered: 6/27/2019 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (61 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 47 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) MOTION for Reconsideration or modification of Court's processing orders as to DOD and State. / Plaintiff OSJI's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the Government's Motion for Reconsideration. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Amirfar, Catherine)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/21/2019, Entered: 6/24/2019 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiff and the FBI, and their respective counsel, that: Plaintiff releases and discharges the FBI from any and all claims and causes of action that Plaintiff asserted - or could have asserted - in this litigation arising out of the FOIA request. This action is hereby dismissed with prejudice with respect to the FBI, and without costs or attorneys' fees to any party; and as further set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/21/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(anc) Modified on 6/25/2019 (anc).
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/21/2019, Entered: 6/24/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (54 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Status Report, filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/21/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(anc)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/21/2019, Entered: 6/24/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (53 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Letter filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Attorney David James Sandler terminated.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/21/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(anc)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/21/2019, Entered: 6/21/2019 Status report
                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: 6/17/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from David J. Sandler dated June 17, 2019 re: withdrawal as counsel for Plaintiff. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative.(Sandler, David)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: 6/17/2019 Proposed Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Sandler, David)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/14/2019, Entered: 6/14/2019 Status report
                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: 6/13/2019 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Eric F. Stein in Support re: (61 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 47 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) MOTION for Reconsideration or modification of Court's processing orders as to DOD and State.. Document filed by Department of Defense, Department of State. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Aronoff, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: 6/13/2019 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Mark H. Herrington in Support re: (61 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 47 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) MOTION for Reconsideration or modification of Court's processing orders as to DOD and State.. Document filed by Department of Defense, Department of State. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Aronoff, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: 6/13/2019 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (61 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 47 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) MOTION for Reconsideration or modification of Court's processing orders as to DOD and State. . Document filed by Department of Defense, Department of State. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Aronoff, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: 6/13/2019, Terminated: 8/6/2019 Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Reconsideration or modification of Court's processing orders as to DOD and State. Document filed by Department of Defense, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Aronoff, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/11/2019, Entered: 6/11/2019 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 6/4/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/11/2019, Entered: 6/11/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 6/4/2019 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/2/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/12/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/9/2019.(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: 6/10/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (56 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 44 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Status Report, filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update. The Court is cognizant of DOD's anticipated motion for reconsideration and authorizes the Government to attach a declaration in support. The Court reiterates, however, that unless and until the Court grants any motion for reconsideration, all Orders remain in effect. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/10/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(anc)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: 6/10/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (55 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 43 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Letter, filed by Department of Defense. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. The Court appreciates the parties' collective efforts to create clearer proposed language. The Court adopts the language herein as superseding paragraphs 2 and 3 of its June 5, 2019 Order. Dkt. 54. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/10/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(anc)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/7/2019, Entered: 6/7/2019 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/7/2019, Entered: 6/7/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  CONSENT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Peter Aronoff dated 6/7/2019 re: seeking limited clarification and/or modification of the Court's June 5, 2019 processing order as to DOD. Document filed by Department of Defense.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Aronoff, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: 6/5/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: At today's conference, the Court set the following deadlines: 1. The parties shall continue to provide the Court with joint weekly status updates, continuing June 7, 2019, and continuing every Friday thereafter; 2. The Department of Defense shall provide a proposed production schedule on June 17, 2019. It shall process 2,500 pages of responsive records by June 30, 2019, and thereafter process 5,000 pages per month; 3. The Department of Justice shall provide a proposed production schedule on June 5, 2019. It shall process responsive records at a rate of 5,000 pages per month; 4. The Department of State shall complete its search of classified and unclassified emails within 4.5 weeks; 5. The next status conference is scheduled for July 8, 2019 at 3:30 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 7/8/2019 at 03:30 PM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/5/2019) (mml)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer: Status Conference held on 6/4/2019. Amrit Singh & David Sandler present for Plaintiff. Natasha Teleanu & Peter Arnoff present for Defendants. Court reporter present. (ajs)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: 6/3/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (51 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 39 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Status Report, filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(anc)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: 6/3/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict, the Court reschedules the conference currently scheduled for June 4, 2019 at 3:30 p.m. to 4:30 p.m. that same day. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 6/4/2019 at 04:30 PM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/3/2019) ***Pursuant to instructions from Chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(anc)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: 5/31/2019 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/30/2019, Entered: 5/30/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (32 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE, 44 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Letter, filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. ENDORSEMENT: Having reviewed the parties' competing letters, the Court's judgment is that a processing rate of 5,000 pages per month, beginning June 2019, appropriately balances the urgency of this particular request with the State Department's concerns regarding the burdens of making FOTA productions. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/30/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(anc)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/29/2019, Entered: 5/30/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (36 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE, 48 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Letter, filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update. The Court adjourns State's May 29 and May 30 deadlines. The parties should confer and provide the Court new deadlines by June 4, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/29/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(rro)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: 5/24/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Natasha W. Teleanu dated 5/24/2019 re: weekly status update. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: 5/22/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (31 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE, 43 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Status Report, filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/22/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(mro)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: 5/22/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (45 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 33 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Letter, filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. The Court will accept the over-length letter on the consent of all parties. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/21/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(mro)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: 5/21/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from David J. Sandler dated 5/21/19 re: parties' consent to the over-length letter (Dkt. 44) and requesting the court to accept the over-length letter. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Sandler, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: 5/20/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from David J. Sandler dated May 20, 2019 re: opposition to the 5/13/19 DOS letter requesting the Court to approve States proposed processing rate of only 300 pages per month.. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Sandler, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: 5/17/2019 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Aronoff, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 42 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: 5/13/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (41 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 27 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Status Report, filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/10/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(anc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 41 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: 5/10/2019 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 40 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: 5/6/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (25 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE, 39 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Status Report, filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update and approves the parties' proposed letter briefing schedule. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 5/13/2019. Responses due by 5/20/2019) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/6/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(ne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 39 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: 5/3/2019 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT. (joint) and proposal for letter-briefing schedule regarding State's processing rate Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Aronoff, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: 4/29/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (23 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE, 37 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Status Report, filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 4/29/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/26/2019, Entered: 4/26/2019 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT. (joint) Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Aronoff, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/26/2019, Entered: 4/26/2019 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Office of the Director of National Intelligence served on 1/16/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. Service was made by certified mail. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/26/2019, Entered: 4/26/2019 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. National Security Agency served on 1/16/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. Service was made by certified mail. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/26/2019, Entered: 4/26/2019 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Service was made by certified mail and Also on the U. S. Attorney General. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/26/2019, Entered: 4/26/2019 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Central Intelligence Agency served on 1/16/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. Service was made by certified mail. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: 4/24/2019 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 4/19/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: 4/24/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 4/19/2019 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Surina, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/15/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/28/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/23/2019.(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 30 Filed: 4/23/2019, Entered: 4/23/2019 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: The above-captioned actions having been consolidated, see ECF No. 23 in 19 Civ. 234, absent further order of the Court, all filings in these matters going forward shall be made under the docket number 19 Civ. 234. The parties shall negotiate in good faith to narrow the scope of the search or exclude categories of non-substantive records identified by Defendants. On April 26, 2019, and every Friday thereafter until directed by the Court, the Parties shall update the Court in a joint letter on the status of discussions between the Parties and Defendants' responses to Plaintiffs Requests; and as further set forth herein. Status Conference set for 6/4/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 1305, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 4/22/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(anc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Pretrial Conference - Initial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/22/2019. Amrit Singh & David Sandler present for Plaintiff. Natasha Teleanu & Peter Aronoff present for Defendants. Court reporter present. (ajs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 29 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (28 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 17 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Letter, filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court hereby adjourns this conference to noon on Friday, April 19, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 4/19/2019 at 12:00 PM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 4/18/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(anc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CONSENT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Peter Aronoff dated 4/18/2019 re: requesting initial conference be moved to 1pm on 4/19/2019. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Aronoff, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: 4/15/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Natasha W. Teleanu dated 4/15/2019 re: Initial Conference. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: 4/15/2019 Notice of Appearance of Pro Bono Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF PRO BONO COUNSEL by David James Sandler on behalf of Open Society Justice Initiative Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Sandler, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: 3/22/2019 Order for Initial Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/19/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1305, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer; and as further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/19/2019) (anc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: 3/18/2019 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to [1] Complaint,. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence.(Teleanu, Natasha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: 2/27/2019 Order on Motion to consolidate casesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting (22) Letter Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting (22) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer in case 1:19-cv-00234-PAE. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 2/27/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (anc) Modified on 2/27/2019 (anc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Central Intelligence Agency answer due 3/18/2019; Department of Defense answer due 3/18/2019; Department of Justice answer due 3/18/2019; Department of State answer due 3/18/2019; National Security Agency answer due 3/18/2019; Office of the Director of National Intelligence answer due 3/18/2019. (anc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: 2/22/2019, Terminated: 2/27/2019 Motion to consolidate casesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Consolidate Cases 19-cv-1329 and this action given identical FOIA requests addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Peter Aronoff dated 2/22/2019., CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: [1] Complaint, to set a uniform answer date of March 18, 2019 for all defendants addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Peter Aronoff dated 2/22/2019. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence.(Aronoff, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: 2/14/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Natasha Waglow Teleanu on behalf of Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Teleanu, Natasha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: 1/22/2019 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [17] Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/22/2019) (js) Modified on 7/1/2019 (js).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: 1/18/2019 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Central Intelligence Agency served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019; Department of Defense served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019; National Security Agency served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019; Office of the Director of National Intelligence served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019. Service was accepted by Lisa Ahearn, Civil Clerk Supervisor. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: 1/18/2019 Notice of change of address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Amrit Singh on behalf of Open Society Justice Initiative. New Address: Open Society Justice Initiative, 224 W. 57th St, New York, New York, 10019, 2125480660. (Singh, Amrit)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: 1/18/2019, Terminated: 1/22/2019 MOTION for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time tolling answer deadline until 30 days from first business day following Justice Department funding restoration addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from David S. Jones dated January 18, 2019. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit standing order staying certain civil cases affected by lapse in appropriations)(Jones, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Judge John G. Koeltl is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: 1/11/2019 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (dnh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: 1/11/2019 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to National Security Agency. (dnh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: 1/11/2019 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of Defense. (dnh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: 1/11/2019 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Central Intelligence Agency. (dnh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: 1/10/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amrit Singh on behalf of Open Society Justice Initiative. (Singh, Amrit)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: 1/10/2019 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence, re: [1] Complaint,. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: 1/10/2019 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Security Agency, re: [1] Complaint,. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: 1/10/2019 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Defense, re: [1] Complaint,. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: 1/10/2019 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Central Intelligence Agency, re: [1] Complaint,. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Catherine M. Amirfar to RE-FILE Document No. [3] Request for Issuance of Summons, [4] Request for Issuance of Summons, [5] Request for Issuance of Summons, [6] Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the name of the party for whom the summons is being requested must be the first name that appears in the 'To' field on the summons request PDF; any name that follows the name of the party to be served must include 'c/'o', 'via', or 'attn'; party name in the 'To' field must exactly match party name as it appears on pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Case Designated ECF. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Case Designation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: 1/9/2019 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Open Society Institute for Open Society Justice Initiative. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative.(Amirfar, Catherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: 1/9/2019 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence, re: [1] Complaint,. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine) Modified on 1/10/2019 (pne).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: 1/9/2019 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Security Agency, re: [1] Complaint,. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine) Modified on 1/10/2019 (pne).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: 1/9/2019 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Defense, re: [1] Complaint,. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine) Modified on 1/10/2019 (pne).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: 1/9/2019 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Central Intelligence Agency, re: [1] Complaint,. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine) Modified on 1/10/2019 (pne).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: 1/9/2019 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Amirfar, Catherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: 1/9/2019 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16163411)Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Plaintiffs FOIA requests)(Amirfar, Catherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 59 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?