Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Pension Fund, Medical Fund, Training Fund, Industry Promotion Fund, Communications and Productivity Fund, Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund v. Engineering Contractors, Inc.

Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 8:10-cv-01444
District Judge George Jarrod Hazel, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge George Jarrod Hazel
Last Updated January 11, 2019 at 1:27 AM EST (6.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Plaintiff

Represented by International Union of Operating Engineers

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Randall Richard Hopp +1 202 778 2641 +1 202 778 2641 rhopp@iuoe.org
No Logo Trustees of the Heating, Piping & Refrigeration Pension Fund, Medical Fund, Training Fund, Industry Promotion Fund, Communications and Productivity Fund, Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund, Plaintiff

Represented by International Union of Operating Engineers

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Randall Richard Hopp +1 202 778 2641 +1 202 778 2641 rhopp@iuoe.org
No Logo Trustees of the International Training Fund, Plaintiff

Represented by International Union of Operating Engineers

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Randall Richard Hopp +1 202 778 2641 +1 202 778 2641 rhopp@iuoe.org
v.
No Logo ECI of Washington, LLC, Defendant

Represented by The Law Practice of Ken C. Gauvey, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kenneth Christopher Gauvey +1 410 385 5264 +1 866 487 1154 kgauvey@gauveylaw.com
No Logo Engineering Contractors, Inc., Defendant

Represented by The Law Practice of Ken C. Gauvey, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kenneth Christopher Gauvey +1 410 385 5264 +1 866 487 1154 kgauvey@gauveylaw.com
Other Parties
No Logo Old Line Bank, Interested Party

Represented by McNamee, Hosea, Jernigan, Kim, Greenan & Lynch, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John Paul Lynch +1 301 441 2420 +1 301 982 9450 jlynch@mhlawyers.com
Attributes
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 1002
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Timeline
  Entries (68) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PAPERLESS correspondence CANCELLING the scheduling call on August 7, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. (am2s, Chambers) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STATUS REPORT (regarding Writ of Garnishment served on Law Office of Richard H. Gins, LLC) by Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Trustees of the Heating, Piping & Refrigeration Pension Fund, Medical Fund, Training Fund, Industry Promotion Fund, Communications and Productivity Fund, Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Hopp, Randall) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Trustees of the Heating, Piping & Refrigeration Pension Fund, Medical Fund, Training Fund, Industry Promotion Fund, Communications and Productivity Fund, Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund re 63 Writ of Garnishment (Line of Release) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Hopp, Randall) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER setting a scheduling call on August 7, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. If the parties resolve the case before that time they are directed to inform the Court. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 7/9/2015. (am2s, Chambers) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PAPERLESS correspondence scheduling a conference call on Thursday, July 9, 2015 at 9:30 a.m. Counsel for the Plaintiff is asked to initiate the call. Chambers phone number 301-344-0637. (am2s, Chambers) (Entered: 07/07/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Reassigned to Judge George Jarrod Hazel. Judge Alexander Williams, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Magistrate Judge William Connelly and Magistrate Judge Jillyn K Schulze no longer assigned to case. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Engineering Contractors, Inc.. Objections to Writ Answer due by 6/5/2015. (Gins, Richard) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Old Line Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit UCC-1 Financing Statement, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lynch, John) (Entered: 05/17/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REQUEST for Writ Of Garnishment Of Property Other Than Wages (Law Offices of Richard H. Gins, LLC). Responses due by 5/18/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(Hopp, Randall) (Entered: 05/01/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
[FILED IN ERROR - WRONG CASE] MEMORANDUM/ORDER directing the Clerk to docket the attached letter as a motion for Reduction of Sentence and the Government to respond within 60 days. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 9/3/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Motion for Reduction of Sentence)(kns, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 9/4/14) Modified on 9/4/2014 (kns, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 09/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
JUDGMENT in favor of Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Trustees of the Heating, Piping & Refrigeration Pension Fund, Medical Fund, Training Fund, Industry Promotion Fund, Communications and Productivity Fund, Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund against ECI of Washington, LLC, Engineering Contractors, Inc., Jointly and Serverally, in the Amount of $614,408.85; DIRECTING Defendants, within Sixty (60) Days of the Date this Order is Docketed to obtain Bond Coverage Naming Plaintiffs as Obligees in a Penalty Amount no less than $87,473.38 and to Maintain that Bond for the Duration of the Collective Bargaining Agreement; DIRECTING the Defendants, within Sixty (60) Days of the Date this Order is Docketed to Provide Plaintiffs Contribution Reports and Supporting Payroll Documentation for the Period from 1/1/2012 to the last Pay Period in March 2013; GRANTING 54 MOTION for Summary Judgment; and DIRECTING the Clerk to CLOSE this Case. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 4/9/2013. (rss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 4/9/2013. (rss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Trustees of the Heating, Piping & Refrigeration Pension Fund, Medical Fund, Training Fund, Industry Promotion Fund, Communications and Productivity Fund, Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund Responses due by 3/18/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Summary of Damages (Projected Hours), # 3 Summary of Damages (Payroll Hours), # 4 Appendix, # 5 Appendix pgs 1 to 30, # 6 Appendix pgs 31 to 59, # 7 Appendix pgs 60 to 82, # 8 Appendix pgs 83 to 105, # 9 Appendix pgs 106 to 130, # 10 Appendix pgs 131 to 150, # 11 Appendix pgs 151 to 172, # 12 Appendix pgs 173 to 198, # 13 Appendix pgs 199 to 220, # 14 Text of Proposed Order, # 15 Certificate of Service)(Hopp, R) Modified on 3/7/2013 (courtesy copy rec'd 3/7/13 rs) (rss, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 02/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STATUS REPORT by Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Trustees of the Heating, Piping & Refrigeration Pension Fund, Medical Fund, Training Fund, Industry Promotion Fund, Communications and Productivity Fund, Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Hopp, R) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 51 Defendants' Request to Extend the Deadline to Comply with Court Order. Hr. Hopp has informed the Court that Plaintiffs do not oppose the request for a brief extension. The deadline for Defendants to produce discovery responses is hereby EXTENDED to Tuesday, December 13, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Connelly on 12/07/11. (Connelly, William) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Court Order by ECI of Washington, LLC, Engineering Contractors, Inc. re: 49 ORDER GRANTING IN PART, HELD IN ABEYANCE IN PART & FOUND MOOT IN PART re 29 Local Rule 104.7 Certificate/Motion to Compel. Responses due by 12/23/2011 (Gauvey, Kenneth) Modified on 12/7/2011 to add linkage. (rss, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 12/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE in Opposition re 30 MOTION for Discovery Opposition to Motion to Compel Regarding Plaintffs Supplemental Motion for Relief filed by ECI of Washington, LLC, Engineering Contractors, Inc.. Replies due by 12/22/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Gauvey, Kenneth) Modified on 12/5/2011 to correct attachment titles(rss, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 12/04/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING IN PART, HELD IN ABEYANCE IN PART & FOUND MOOT IN PART re 29 Local Rule 104.7 Certificate/Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Connelly on 11/18/2011. (rss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Telephone Conference held on 11/17/2011 before Magistrate Judge William Connelly. (Peterson (FTR-3B) (esp, Deputy Clerk)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER SCHEDULING a telephone conference at 3:00 p.m. on Thursday, November 17, 2011 regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (ECF No. 29). Chambers will initiate the conference call. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Connelly on 11/10/11. (Connelly, William) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request for Conference (Hopp, R) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William Connelly for discovery. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 10/5/11. (jmw, Chambers) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Granting 36 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Trustees of the Heating, Piping & Refrigeration Pension Fund, Medical Fund, Training Fund, Industry Promotion Fund, Communications and Productivity Fund, Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 10/4/2011. (rss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 10/4/2011. (rss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Supplemental to 29 Local Rule, filed by Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Trustees of the Heating, Piping & Refrigeration Pension Fund, Medical Fund, Training Fund, Industry Promotion Fund, Communications and Productivity Fund, Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund Supplemental Request for Relief. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Hopp, R) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY to Response to Motion re 36 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to liability filed by Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Trustees of the Heating, Piping & Refrigeration Pension Fund, Medical Fund, Training Fund, Industry Promotion Fund, Communications and Productivity Fund, Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Hopp, R) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE in Opposition re 36 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by ECI of Washington, LLC, Engineering Contractors, Inc.. Replies due by 8/8/2011. (Gauvey, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER granting 39 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 39 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 36 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Unopposed. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 07/18/11. (gc, Chambers) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 36 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Unopposed by ECI of Washington, LLC, Engineering Contractors, Inc. Responses due by 8/4/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Gauvey, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER granting 37 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 37 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 36 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Unopposed Responses due by 7/25/2011. Replies due by 7/25/2011. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr. on July 8, 2011. (vj, Chambers) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 36 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Unopposed by ECI of Washington, LLC, Engineering Contractors, Inc. Responses due by 7/25/2011 (Gauvey, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Trustees of the Heating, Piping & Refrigeration Pension Fund, Medical Fund, Training Fund, Industry Promotion Fund, Communications and Productivity Fund, Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund Responses due by 7/14/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Signed Agreement of Assent), # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Hopp, R) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Trustees of the Heating, Piping & Refrigeration Pension Fund, Medical Fund, Training Fund, Industry Promotion Fund, Communications and Productivity Fund, Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Hopp, R) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Joint Correspondence re: to Judge Schulze regarding Settlement Conference procedures (Hopp, R) (Entered: 05/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Letter/ORDER scheduling settlement conference for June 9, 2011 at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jillyn K Schulze on 05/17/2011. (elts, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jillyn K Schulze for settlement. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 5/9/11. (jmw, Chambers) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Joint MOTION for Settlement Conference with Magistrate Judge by ECI of Washington, LLC, Engineering Contractors, Inc., Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Trustees of the Heating, Piping & Refrigeration Pension Fund, Medical Fund, Training Fund, Industry Promotion Fund, Communications and Productivity Fund, Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund Responses due by 5/16/2011 (Hopp, R) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Opposition to 29 Motion to Compel by ECI of Washington, LLC, Engineering Contractors, Inc. Responses due by 5/13/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration)(Gauvey, Kenneth) Modified on 11/18/2011 to correct doc title. (rss, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 12/5/2011 to add linkage. (rss, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 04/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Local Rule 104.7 Certificate. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G (Interrogatories), # 8 Exhibit G (Documents), # 9 Motion to Compel, # 10 Text of Proposed Order, # 11 Certificate of Service)(Hopp, R)(courtesy copy rec'd 4/29/11 rs) Modified on 4/29/2011 (rs, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 04/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STATUS REPORT (Joint Initial Report) by Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Trustees of the Heating, Piping & Refrigeration Pension Fund, Medical Fund, Training Fund, Industry Promotion Fund, Communications and Productivity Fund, Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Hopp, R) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by ECI of Washington, LLC, Engineering Contractors, Inc.. (Gauvey, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER to 11 Amended Complaint, by ECI of Washington, LLC, Engineering Contractors, Inc..(Gauvey, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/27/2011. Status Report due by 5/27/2011. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 1/12/2011. (kn, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Christopher Gauvey on behalf of ECI of Washington, LLC, Engineering Contractors, Inc. (Gauvey, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER denying 6 Motion for Entry of Default; denying 13 Motion for Entry of Default; denying 16 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 1/3/2011. (elts, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY to Response to Motion re 16 MOTION for Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense by Defendant ECI of Washington LLC, 13 MOTION for Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense to the First Amended Complaint by Defendant Engineering Contractors, Inc. filed by Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Trustees of the Heating, Piping & Refrigeration Pension Fund, Medical Fund, Training Fund, Industry Promotion Fund, Communications and Productivity Fund, Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Hopp, R) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to Motion re 16 MOTION for Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense by Defendant ECI of Washington LLC, 13 MOTION for Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense to the First Amended Complaint by Defendant Engineering Contractors, Inc. filed by ECI of Washington, LLC, Engineering Contractors, Inc.. Replies due by 1/7/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gauvey, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE in Opposition re 19 MOTION to Vacate Order of Default, RESPONSE to Motion re 19 MOTION to Vacate Order of Default ( Replies due by 12/16/2010.) filed by Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Trustees of the Heating, Piping & Refrigeration Pension Fund, Medical Fund, Training Fund, Industry Promotion Fund, Communications and Productivity Fund, Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Hopp, R) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
[FILED IN ERROR] MOTION to Vacate Order of Default by ECI of Washington, LLC, Engineering Contractors, Inc. Responses due by 11/29/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gauvey, Kenneth) Modified on 12/21/2010 (elts, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 11/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Heating, Piping & Refrigeration Pension Fund, Medical Fund, Training Fund, Industry Promotion Fund, Communications and Productivity Fund, Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Steamfitters Local Union No. 602. Engineering Contractors, Inc. served on 10/12/2010, answer due 11/2/2010., AFFIDAVIT of Service for First Amended Complaint served on Engineering Contractors, Inc. on 10/12/2010, filed by Trustees of the Heating, Piping & Refrigeration Pension Fund, Medical Fund, Training Fund, Industry Promotion Fund, Communications and Productivity Fund, Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund; Trustees of the International Training Fund; Steamfitters Local Union No. 602. (Hopp, R) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT of Service for First Amended Complaint served on Defendant Engineering Contractors, Inc. on 09/23/2010, filed by Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Trustees of the Heating, Piping & Refrigeration Pension Fund, Medical Fund, Training Fund, Industry Promotion Fund, Communications and Productivity Fund, Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through D)(Hopp, R) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense by Defendant ECI of Washington LLC by Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Trustees of the Heating, Piping & Refrigeration Pension Fund, Medical Fund, Training Fund, Industry Promotion Fund, Communications and Productivity Fund, Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund Responses due by 11/12/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Hopp, R) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Trustees of the Heating, Piping & Refrigeration Pension Fund, Medical Fund, Training Fund, Industry Promotion Fund, Communications and Productivity Fund, Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund re 11 Amended Complaint, served on Defendant Engineering Contractors, Inc. on 09/23/2010 (Hopp, R) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Heating, Piping & Refrigeration Pension Fund, Medical Fund, Training Fund, Industry Promotion Fund, Communications and Productivity Fund, Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Steamfitters Local Union No. 602. ECI of Washington, LLC served on 9/9/2010, answer due 9/30/2010. (Hopp, R) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense to the First Amended Complaint by Defendant Engineering Contractors, Inc. by Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Trustees of the Heating, Piping & Refrigeration Pension Fund, Medical Fund, Training Fund, Industry Promotion Fund, Communications and Productivity Fund, Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund Responses due by 10/4/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Hopp, R) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons Issued 21 days as to ECI of Washington, LLC. (elts, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Engineering Contractors, Inc., ECI of Washington, LLC, filed by Trustees of the Heating, Piping & Refrigeration Pension Fund, Medical Fund, Training Fund, Industry Promotion Fund, Communications and Productivity Fund, Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Steamfitters Local Union No. 602.(elts, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 9 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 08/23/2010. (elts, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Trustees of the Heating, Piping & Refrigeration Pension Fund, Medical Fund, Training Fund, Industry Promotion Fund, Communications and Productivity Fund, Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund Responses due by 8/19/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 First Amended Complaint, # 3 First Amended Complaint (LR 103.6(c) version), # 4 LR 106.3(d) Certificate, # 5 Summons (for ECI), # 6 Text of Proposed Order, # 7 Certificate of Service)(Hopp, R) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER "Granting" re 7 Status Report, filed by Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Trustees of the Heating, Piping & Refrigeration Pension Fund, Medical Fund, Training Fund, Industry Promotion Fund, Communications and Productivity Fund, Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 7/24/10 ( Williams, Alexander) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STATUS REPORT by Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Trustees of the Heating, Piping & Refrigeration Pension Fund, Medical Fund, Training Fund, Industry Promotion Fund, Communications and Productivity Fund, Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund. (Hopp, R) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense by Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Trustees of the Heating, Piping & Refrigeration Pension Fund, Medical Fund, Training Fund, Industry Promotion Fund, Communications and Productivity Fund, Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund Responses due by 8/2/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support, # 2 Proposed Entry of Default, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Hopp, R) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER directing the plaintiff file a motion for entry of default and a motion for default judgment or provide a report as to why schul motions are inappropriate. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 7/9/2010. (c/m 7/9/2010 rk) (ranks, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Heating, Piping & Refrigeration Pension Fund, Medical Fund, Training Fund, Industry Promotion Fund, Communications and Productivity Fund, Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Steamfitters Local Union No. 602. Engineering Contractors, Inc. served on 6/16/2010, answer due 7/7/2010. (Hopp, R) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons Issued 21 days as to Engineering Contractors, Inc. (ns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Pension Fund, Medical Fund, Training Fund, Industry Promotion Fund, Communications and Productivity Fund, Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund. (ns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
COMPLAINT against Engineering Contractors, Inc. (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 84637015710), filed by Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Pension Fund, Medical Fund, Training Fund, Industry Promotion Fund, Communications and Productivity Fund, Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Steamfitters Local Union No. 602. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 0 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?