Milton Thomas v. City of Philadelphia
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit, Case No. 16-3156

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 11, 2019 at 2:19 AM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3150 - Overpayments & Enforcement of Judgments
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012586582 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MANDATE ISSUED, filed. (CLW) [Entered: 04/07/2017 10:50 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012564363 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    JUDGMENT, ORDERED and ADJUDGED by this Court that the judgment of the District Court entered July 7, 2016, be and the same is hereby vacated and the matter remanded. Costs will not be taxed. All of the above in accordance with the opinion of this Court. (CLW) [Entered: 03/16/2017 10:08 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012564349 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      NOT PRECEDENTIAL PER CURIAM OPINION Coram: AMBRO, KRAUSE and NYGAARD, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 7. (CLW) [Entered: 03/16/2017 10:03 AM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012563312 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        SUBMITTED (Pro Se - 3rd Cir. LAR 34.1 (a)) on Wednesday, March 15, 2017. Panel: AMBRO, KRAUSE, NYGAARD, Circuit Judges. (PM) [Entered: 03/15/2017 11:04 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012552305 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          CALENDARED for Wednesday, 03/15/2017. (PM) [Entered: 03/02/2017 08:57 AM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012492739 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Pro Se REPLY BRIEF on behalf of Appellant Mr. Milton Thomas, Sr., filed. Pages: 7. Certificate of Service dated 12/19/2016 by US mail. (RM) [Entered: 12/20/2016 10:01 AM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Appellant Mr. Milton Thomas, Sr. verbally granted an extension of time to file reply brief until 12/19/2016 pursuant to Third Cir. LAR 31.4. (CLW) [Entered: 12/01/2016 04:13 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012473434 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ORDER (Clerk) granting Motion by Appellees for Leave to File Supplemental Appendix with filing as of November 16, 2016, filed. [See attachment for complete text of Order] (EAF) [Entered: 11/28/2016 01:29 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellees City of Philadelphia and Philadelphia School District - Supplemental Appendix. Copies: 4. Volumes: 1 (GPK) [Entered: 11/21/2016 03:21 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellees City of Philadelphia and Philadelphia School District - Brief. Copies: 7. (GPK) [Entered: 11/21/2016 03:20 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 13 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?