IBEW LOCAL NO. 351 v. CENTENNIAL INSURANCE, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-01560-JHR-AMD

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo IBEW LOCAL UNION NO. 351 EMPLOYEE BENEFIT FUNDS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MICHAEL T SCARAGGI +1 973 364 1200 michaelscaraggi@netscape.net
v.
No Logo CENTENNIAL INSURANCE COMPANY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space SAMUEL JOSEPH ARENA, JR. +1 856 482 7898

Toggle Switch Represented by Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN J. MURPHY, III +1 856 321 2400 jmurphy@stradley.com
No Logo WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE, Arbitrator

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
Office Camden
Filed 4/7/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Atlantic
Terminated 4/15/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BP, CLOSED, SCHEDO
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by pltf. and deft. CENTENNIAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (js)
    LREF
    Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: 4/15/2004 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
    ORDER DISMISSING CASE (SETTLED) WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT COSTS. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 4/15/2004. (ln, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 Certificate of Cash Deposit
      Clerk's Certificate of Cash Deposit to cover costs of filing demand for trial denovo in the amount of $ 150.00, Receipt Number 322487 filed by deft. CENTENNIAL INSURANCE COMPANY (SA, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/2/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 Request for Trial De Novo
        REQUEST for Trial De Novo by deft. CENTENNIAL INSURANCE COMPANY (SA, )
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/18/2004 Set/Reset Hearings
          Arbitration Hearing reset for 3/4/2004 10:00 AM. (AC, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 12 Filed: 1/27/2004, Entered: 1/27/2004 Order Referring Case to ArbitrationCourt Filing
            ORDER Appointing Arbitrator, WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE, ESQ.; Arbitration Hearing set for 2/19/2004 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge John W. Bissell on 01/27/2004. (AC, )
              LREF
              Blank 11 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/5/2003 Judgment*
              FINAL JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT for pltf. IBEW LOCAL NO. 351 against deft. GARNEY MORRIS, INC. for failure to appear, plead or otherwise defend in the amount of $29,307.53. (WILLIAM T. WALSH, CLERK) (js)
                LREF
                Blank 10 Filed: 11/20/2003, Entered: 11/24/2003 Affidavit
                AFFIDAVIT of Proof of Non-Military Service on behalf of pltf. IBEW LOCAL NO. 351 in support of [9-1] default request (js)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: 11/3/2003 Clerks Entry of Default*
                  DEFAULT ENTERED as to GARNEY MORRIS, INC. for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (ar1)
                    LREF
                    Blank 9 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: 11/3/2003 request for default
                    REQUEST to enter default by pltf. IBEW LOCAL NO. 351 AGAINST deft. GARNEY MORRIS, INC. for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (Certification Annexed) (ar1)
                      LREF
                      Blank 8 Filed: 10/30/2003, Entered: 10/30/2003 Summons Returned Executed
                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to GARNEY MORRIS, INC. 4/23/03 Answer due on 5/13/03. (ar1)
                        LREF
                        Blank 7 Filed: 10/30/2003, Entered: 10/30/2003 Summons Returned Executed
                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to CENTENNIAL INSURANCE 4/22/03 Answer due on 5/12/03. (ar1)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 10/15/2003, Entered: 10/16/2003 Status Conference
                          Status conference held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on October 15, 2003. (jm1)
                            LREF
                            Blank 6 Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                            SCHEDULING ORDER IN ARBITRATION CASE: setting Amending of pleadings on 8/15/03; Discovery cutoff 11/26/03; Status conference for 2:30pm on 10/15/03 and scheduling arbitration for a date in January, 2004. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio )(NM) (ar1)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: 7/8/2003 Scheduling Conference
                              Scheduling conference held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on JUly 1, 2003. (jm1)
                                LREF
                                Blank 5 Filed: 5/29/2003, Entered: 5/29/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER, setting scheduling conference for 11:00AM on 7/1/03. (signed by Magistrate Judge Ann M. Donio) (NM) (er)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 4 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 5/29/2003 Answer
                                  ANSWER to Complaint by CENTENNIAL INSURANCE, Certificate of mailing annexed. (er)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 3 Filed: 5/8/2003, Entered: 5/8/2003 Application and Clerk's Order to extend time to an
                                    APPLICATION by CENTENNIAL INSURANCE and Clerk's Order extending time to answer. Answer due 5/27/03 for CENTENNIAL INSURANCE. (er)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 2 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/16/2003 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                      NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. ( Camden - Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez - Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio) (NM) (gg)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/16/2003 Summons Issued
                                        SUMMONES issued for CENTENNIAL INSURANCE, GARNEY MORRIS, INC. (20 Days) (Mailed to Counsel) (gg)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/16/2003 Case Referred to Arbitration
                                          CASE REFERRED to arbitration (gg)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 1 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/16/2003 Complaint
                                            COMPLAINT filed FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 314770(Newark) (gg)
                                              LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 59 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?