CAMPUZANO-GOMEZ v. DEROSA, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-01854-JBS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo EDUARDO LUIS CAMPUZANO-GOMEZ, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EDUARDO LUIS CAPUZANO-GOMEZ
v.
No Logo C. J. DEROSA, Defendant
No Logo Immigration & Naturalization Service, Defendant
Office Camden
Filed 4/25/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Lack of Jurisdiction
County Burlington
Terminated 8/27/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BP, CLOSED
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 10/8/2003, Entered: 10/14/2003 Remark
Mail (Receipt) returned by the U.S. Postal Service as undeliverable. (db)
    LREF
    Blank 7 Filed: 9/5/2003, Entered: 9/5/2003 Remark
    Mail (Opinion and Order returned by the U.S. Postal Service as undeliverable as to plaintiff GOMEZ (db)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: 8/27/2003 Terminated Case
      Case closed (db)
        LREF
        Blank 6 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 8/27/2003 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER that the complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of juridiction. (signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle) (NM) (db)
          LREF
          Blank 5 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 8/27/2003 OrderCourt Filing
          OPINION. (signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle) (NM) (db)
            LREF
            Blank 3 Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003, Terminated: 8/27/2003 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
            NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. ( Camden - Judge Jerome B. Simandle - Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio) (NM) (gg)
              LREF
              Blank 2 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003 Application/Petition
              APPLICATION to proceed in forma pauperis by EDUARDO LUIS CAMPUZANO-GOMEZ (gg)
                LREF
                Blank 2 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003 Complaint
                COMPLAINT filed FILING FEE $ 150.00 paid (gg)
                  LREF
                  Blank 1 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: 5/12/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                  Partial payment fee as to EDUARDO LUIS CAMPUZANO-GOMEZ Receipt No. 325920 Amount Paid Today $150.00 Total Amount Paid to Date $150.00 (SA)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/28/2003 Complaint Received
                    Complaint Received under 42 U.S.C. 1983 with an application to proceed IFP. (gg)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 19 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?