U.F.C.W. LOCAL 56, et al v. A.M.D. THRIFTWAY, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-02597-JBS-JBR

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ANTHONY CINAGLIA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by O'BRIEN, BELLAND & BUSHINSKY, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space STEVEN J. BUSHINSKY +1 856 795 2181 +1 856 795 2182 sbushinsky@obbblaw.com
No Logo U.F.C.W. LOCAL 56 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by O'BRIEN, BELLAND & BUSHINSKY, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space STEVEN J. BUSHINSKY +1 856 795 2181 +1 856 795 2182 sbushinsky@obbblaw.com
No Logo U.F.C.W. LOCAL 56 RETAIL MEAT PENSION FUND, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by O'BRIEN, BELLAND & BUSHINSKY, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space STEVEN J. BUSHINSKY +1 856 795 2181 +1 856 795 2182 sbushinsky@obbblaw.com
v.
No Logo A.M.D. THRIFTWAY MARKET, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of LAURENCE E. ROSOFF

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LAURENCE E. ROSOFF +1 856 583 1274 lrosoff@ccmua.org
No Logo MEOHUG OK HAN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of LAURENCE E. ROSOFF

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LAURENCE E. ROSOFF +1 856 583 1274 lrosoff@ccmua.org
No Logo WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE, Arbitrator

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
Office Camden
Filed 5/30/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 720 - Labor: Labor/Management Relations
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Award of Arbitrator
County Camden
Terminated 7/9/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BG, ARBITRATION, CLOSED, SCHEDO
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 9 Filed: 12/21/2004, Entered: 12/21/2004 Substitution of Attorney
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney STEVEN J. BUSHINSKY and MARK E. BELLAND for ANTHONY CINAGLIA; U.F.C.W. LOCAL 56 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND and U.F.C.W. LOCAL 56 RETAIL MEAT PENSION FUND added. Attorney LAUREN R. BURDEN terminated.. (BELLAND, MARK)
    LREF
    Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: 11/1/2004 Substitution of Attorney
    Notice and Substitution of Attorney - Attorney LAUREN R. BURDEN for U.F.C.W. LOCAL 56 RETAIL MEAT PENSION FUND; ANTHONY CINAGLIA and U.F.C.W. LOCAL 56 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND added. Attorney P. JOSEPH NICOLA terminated. (Cert of Svc) (ar1, )
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: 7/9/2004 Terminated Case
      ***Civil Case Terminated. (ar1, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: 7/9/2004 Judgment on Arbitration AwardCourt Filing
        CIVIL JUDGMENT on Arbitration Award in favor of pltfs'. U.F.C.W. LOCAL 56 HEALTH AND WELFARE, U.F.C.W. LOCAL 56, LOCAL 56 RETAIL MEAT PENSION FUND AND ANTHONY CINAGLIA against A.M.D. THRIFTWAY MARKET, INC. in the amount of $67,648.58, with no finding against deft. MEHOUG OK HAN.Signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 7/8/04. (Attachments: # (1) Arbitration Award)(ar1, )
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/18/2004 Set/Reset Hearings
        Arbitration Hearing reset for 3/4/2004 02:00 PM. (AC, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/27/2004, Entered: 1/27/2004 Order Referring Case to ArbitrationCourt Filing
          ORDER Appointing Arbitrator, WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE, ESQ.; Arbitration Hearing set for 2/19/2004 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge John W. Bissell on 01/27/2004. (AC, )
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: 12/15/2003 Settlement Conference
            Settlement conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 12/11/03. (sb)
              LREF
              Blank 5 Filed: 10/17/2003, Entered: 10/20/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
              SCHEDULING ORDER in ARBITRATION CASE: setting Settlement conference for 4:00 on 11/25/03. (signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen)(NM) (db)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 10/15/2003, Entered: 10/21/2003 Scheduling Conference
                Scheduling conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 10/15/03. (er)
                  LREF
                  Blank 4 Filed: 8/6/2003, Entered: 8/6/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER, setting scheduling conference for 9:30 on 10/1/03 (signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen) (NM) (db)
                    LREF
                    Blank 3 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: 8/6/2003 Answer
                    ANSWER to Complaint by A.M.D. THRIFTWAY, MEOHUG OK HAN (db)
                      LREF
                      Blank 2 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                      NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. ( Camden - Judge Jerome B. Simandle - Magistrate Judge Joel B. Rosen) (NM) (mfs)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 Case Referred to Arbitration
                        CASE REFERRED to arbitration (mfs)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 Summons Issued
                          SUMMONS issued for A.M.D. THRIFTWAY, MEOHUG OK HAN ( 20 Days) (Mailed to Counsel) (mfs)
                            LREF
                            Blank 1 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 Complaint
                            COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $150.00; RECEIPT #299221 (mfs)
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 76 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?